# Welcome back

## Find a book, put up your feet, stay awhile

Sign in with Facebook

Sorry, we are unable to log you in via Facebook at this time. Please try again later.

or

Welcome to Scribd. Sign in or start your free trial to enjoy unlimited e-books, audiobooks & documents.Find out more

Download

Standard view

Full view

of .

Look up keyword

Like this

Share on social networks

32Activity

×

0 of .

Results for: No results containing your search query

P. 1

Maths TrickRatings: (0)|Views: 305|Likes: 44

Published by martin_sea

See more

See less

https://www.scribd.com/doc/22345552/Maths-Trick

10/10/2013

text

original

Multiply Up to 20X20 In Your Head

In just FIVE minutes you should learn to quickly multiply up to 20x20 in your head.

With this trick, you will be able to multiply any two numbers from 11 to 19 in your headquickly, without the use of a calculator.I will assume that you know your multiplication table reasonably well up to 10x10.Try this:

•

Take 15 x 13 for an example.

•

Always place the larger number of the two on top in your mind.

•

Then draw the shape of Africa mentally so it covers the 15 and the 3 from the 13 below. Those covered numbers are all you need.

•

First add 15 + 3 = 18

•

Add a zero behind it (multiply by 10) to get 180.

•

Multiply the covered lower 3 x the single digit above it the "5" (3x5= 15)

•

Add 180 + 15 = 195.

That is It! Wasn't that easy? Practice it on paper first!

Square 2 Digit Number: UP-DOWN Method

Square a 2 Digit Number, for this example 37:

•

Look for the nearest 10 boundary

•

In this case up 3 from 37 to 40.

•

Since you went UP 3 to 40 go DOWN 3 from 37 to 34.

•

Now mentally multiply 34x40

•

The way I do it is 34x10=340;

•

Double it mentally to 680

•

Double it again mentally to 1360

•

This 1360 is the FIRST interim answer.

•

37 is "3" away from the 10 boundary 40.

•

Square this "3" distance from 10 boundary.

•

3x3=9 which is the SECOND interim answer.

•

Add the two interim answers to get the final answer.

•

Answer: 1360 + 9 = 1369With practice this can easily be done in your head.

Square a 2 Digit Number Ending in 5

For this example we will use 25

•

Take the "tens" part of the number (the 2 and add 1)=3

•

Multiply the original "tens" part of the number by the new number (2x3)

•

Take the result (2x3=6) and put 25 behind it. Result the answer 625.Try a few more 75 squared ... = 7x8=56 ... put 25 behind it is 5625.55 squared = 5x6=30 ... put 25 behind it ... is 3025. Another easy one! Practice it onpaper first!

The 11 Rule

You likely all know the 10 rule (to multiply by 10, just add a 0 behind the number) butdo you know the 11 rule? It is as easy! You should be able to do this one in you head forany two digit number. Practice it on paper first!To multiply any two digit number by 11:

•

For this example we will use 54.

•

Separate the two digits in you mind (5__4).

•

Notice the hole between them!

•

Add the 5 and the 4 together (5+4=9)

•

Put the resulting 9 in the hole 594. That's it! 11 x 54=594The only thing tricky to remember is that if the result of the addition is greater than 9,you only put the "ones" digit in the hole and carry the "tens" digit from the addition.For example 11 x 57 ... 5__7 ... 5+7=12 ... put the 2 in the hole and add the 1 from the 12to the 5 in to get 6 for a result of 627 ... 11 x 57 = 627Practice it on paper first!

The 11 Rule Expanded

You can directly write down the answer to any number multiplied by 11.

•

Take for example the number 51236 X 11.

•

First, write down the number with a zero in front of it.051236The zero is necessary so that the rules are simpler.

•

Draw a line under the number.

•

Bear with me on this one. It is simple if you work through it slowly. To do this,all you have to do this is "Add the neighbor". Look at the 6 in the "units"position of the number. Since there is no number to the right of it, you can't addto its "neighbor" so just write down 6 below the 6 in the units col.

•

For the "tens" place, add the 3 to the its "neighbor" (the 6). Write the answer: 9below the 3.

•

For the "hundreds" place, add the 2 to the its "neighbor" (the 3). Write theanswer: 5 below the 2.

•

For the "thousands" place, add the 1 to the its "neighbor" (the 2). Write theanswer: 3 below the 1.

•

For the "ten-thousands" place, add the 5 to the its "neighbor" (the 1). Write theanswer: 6 below the 5.

•

For the "hundred-thousands" place, add the 0 to the its "neighbor" (the 5).Write the answer: 5 below the 0.That's it ... 11 X 051236 = 563596Practice it on paper first!

Square a 2 Digit Number Ending in 5

For this example we will use 25

•

Take the "tens" part of the number (the 2 and add 1)=3

•

Multiply the original "tens" part of the number by the new number (2x3)

•

Take the result (2x3=6) and put 25 behind it. Result the answer 625.Try a few more 75 squared ... = 7x8=56 ... put 25 behind it is 5625.55 squared = 5x6=30 ... put 25 behind it ... is 3025. Another easy one! Practice it onpaper first!

Finger Math: 9X Rule

To multiply by 9,try this:(1) Spread your two hands out and place them on a desk or table in front of you.(2) To multiply by 3, fold down the 3rd finger from the left. To multiply by 4, it wouldbe the 4th finger and so on.(3) the answer is 27 ... READ it from the two fingers on the left of the folded downfinger and the 7 fingers on the right of it.This works for anything up to 9x10!

You've already reviewed this. Edit your review.

1 thousand reads

1 hundred reads

anadinath liked this

nadeemyaiman liked this

nadeemyaiman liked this

Tabish Khan liked this

lholzman liked this

rbhellohello802 liked this

findout_420 liked this

findout_420 liked this

- Read and print without ads
- Download to keep your version
- Edit, email or read offline

© Copyright 2015 Scribd Inc.

Language

Choose the language in which you want to experience Scribd:

Sign in with Facebook

Sorry, we are unable to log you in via Facebook at this time. Please try again later.

or

Password Reset Email Sent

Join with Facebook

Sorry, we are unable to log you in via Facebook at this time. Please try again later.

or

By joining, you agree to our

read free for two weeks

Unlimited access to more than

one million books

one million books

Personalized recommendations

based on books you love

based on books you love

Syncing across all your devices

Join with Facebook

or Join with emailSorry, we are unable to log you in via Facebook at this time. Please try again later.

Already a member? Sign in.

By joining, you agree to our

to download

Unlimited access to more than

one million books

one million books

Personalized recommendations

based on books you love

based on books you love

Syncing across all your devices

Continue with Facebook

Sign inJoin with emailSorry, we are unable to log you in via Facebook at this time. Please try again later.

By joining, you agree to our

Are you sure?

This action might not be possible to undo. Are you sure you want to continue?

CANCEL

OK

You've been reading!

NO, THANKS

OK

scribd