# Welcome back

## Find a book, put up your feet, stay awhile

Sign in with Facebook

Sorry, we are unable to log you in via Facebook at this time. Please try again later.

or

Welcome to Scribd, the world's digital library. Read, publish, and share books and documents. See more

Download

Standard view

Full view

of .

Look up keyword

Like this

Share on social networks

12Activity

×

0 of .

Results for: No results containing your search query

P. 1

36912739-203-Maths-TricksRatings: (0)|Views: 140|Likes: 12

Published by Pranshu Jaiswal

See more

See less

https://www.scribd.com/doc/62223434/36912739-203-Maths-Tricks

07/08/2013

text

original

Being able to perform arithmetic quickly and mentally can greatly boost your self-esteem,especially if you don’t consider yourself to be very good at Math. And, getting comfortable witharithmetic might just motivate you to dive deeper into other things mathematical.This article presents nine ideas that will hopefully get you to look at arithmetic as a game, one inwhich you can see patterns among numbers and pick then apply the right trick to quickly doingthe calculation.The tricks in this article all involve multiplication.Don’t be discouraged if the tricks seem difficult at first. Learn one trick at a time. Read thedescription, explanation, and examples several times for each technique you’re learning. Thenmake up some of your own examples and practice the technique.As you learn and practice the tricks make sure you check your results by doing multiplication theway you’re used to, until the tricks start to become second nature. Checking your results iscritically important: the last thing you want to do is learn the tricks incorrectly.

1. Multiplying by 9, or 99, or 999

Multiplying by 9 is really multiplying by 10-1.So, 9×9 is just 9x(10-1) which is 9×10-9 which is 90-9 or 81.Let’s try a harder example: 46×9 = 46×10-46 = 460-46 = 414.One more example: 68×9 = 680-68 = 612.To multiply by 99, you multiply by 100-1.So, 46×99 = 46x(100-1) = 4600-46 = 4554.Multiplying by 999 is similar to multiplying by 9 and by 99.38×999 = 38x(1000-1) = 38000-38 = 37962.

2. Multiplying by 11

To multiply a number by 11 you add pairs of numbers next to each other, except for the numberson the edges.Let me illustrate:To multiply 436 by 11 go from right to left.First write down the 6 then add 6 to its neighbor on the left, 3, to get 9.

Write down 9 to the left of 6.Then add 4 to 3 to get 7. Write down 7.Then, write down the leftmost digit, 4.So, 436×11 = is 4796.Let’s do another example: 3254×11.The answer comes from these sums and edge numbers: (3)(3+2)(2+5)(5+4)(4) = 35794.One more example, this one involving carrying: 4657×11.Write down the sums and edge numbers: (4)(4+6)(6+5)(5+7)(7).Going from right to left we write down 7.Then we notice that 5+7=12.So we write down 2 and carry the 1.6+5 = 11, plus the 1 we carried = 12.So, we write down the 2 and carry the 1.4+6 = 10, plus the 1 we carried = 11.So, we write down the 1 and carry the 1.To the leftmost digit, 4, we add the 1 we carried.So, 4657×11 = 51227 .

3. Multiplying by 5, 25, or 125

Multiplying by 5 is just multiplying by 10 and then dividing by 2. Note: To multiply by 10 justadd a 0 to the end of the number.12×5 = (12×10)/2 = 120/2 = 60.Another example: 64×5 = 640/2 = 320.And, 4286×5 = 42860/2 = 21430.

To multiply by 25 you multiply by 100 (just add two 0’s to the end of the number) then divide by4, since 100 = 25×4. Note: to divide by 4 your can just divide by 2 twice, since 2×2 = 4.64×25 = 6400/4 = 3200/2 = 1600.58×25 = 5800/4 = 2900/2 = 1450.To multiply by 125, you multipy by 1000 then divide by 8 since 8×125 = 1000. Notice that 8 =2×2x2. So, to divide by 1000 add three 0’s to the number and divide by 2 three times.32×125 = 32000/8 = 16000/4 = 8000/2 = 4000.48×125 = 48000/8 = 24000/4 = 12000/2 = 6000.

4. Multiplying together two numbers that differ by a small even number

This trick only works if you’ve memorized or can quickly calculate the squares of numbers. If you’re able to memorize some squares and use the tricks described later for some kinds of numbers you’ll be able to quickly multiply together many pairs of numbers that differ by 2, or 4,or 6.Let’s say you want to calculate 12×14.When two numbers differ by two their product is always the square of the number in betweenthem minus 1.12×14 = (13×13)-1 = 168.16×18 = (17×17)-1 = 288.99×101 = (100×100)-1 = 10000-1 = 9999If two numbers differ by 4 then their product is the square of the number in the middle (theaverage of the two numbers) minus 4.11×15 = (13×13)-4 = 169-4 = 165.13×17 = (15×15)-4 = 225-4 = 221.If the two numbers differ by 6 then their product is the square of their average minus 9.12×18 = (15×15)-9 = 216.17×23 = (20×20)-9 = 391.

5. Squaring 2-digit numbers that end in 5

You've already reviewed this. Edit your review.

1 hundred reads

Mradul Yadav liked this

Mradul Yadav liked this

pavanahonakeri liked this

pavanahonakeri liked this

Carn Joseph liked this

jewon liked this

Nitin Chouksey liked this

Larry Garcia liked this

me_rajeshpardhi liked this

- Read and print without ads
- Download to keep your version
- Edit, email or read offline

© Copyright 2015 Scribd Inc.

Language

Choose the language in which you want to experience Scribd:

Sign in with Facebook

Sorry, we are unable to log you in via Facebook at this time. Please try again later.

or

Password Reset Email Sent

Join with Facebook

Sorry, we are unable to log you in via Facebook at this time. Please try again later.

or

By joining, you agree to our

read free for two weeks

Unlimited access to more than

one million books

one million books

Personalized recommendations

based on books you love

based on books you love

Syncing across all your devices

Join with Facebook

or Join with emailSorry, we are unable to log you in via Facebook at this time. Please try again later.

Already a member? Sign in.

By joining, you agree to our

to download

Unlimited access to more than

one million books

one million books

Personalized recommendations

based on books you love

based on books you love

Syncing across all your devices

Continue with Facebook

Sign inJoin with emailSorry, we are unable to log you in via Facebook at this time. Please try again later.

By joining, you agree to our

Are you sure?

This action might not be possible to undo. Are you sure you want to continue?

CANCEL

OK

You've been reading!

NO, THANKS

OK

scribd