This action might not be possible to undo. Are you sure you want to continue?

Addition of numbers close to multiples of ten (e.g. 19, 29, 38, 59 etc.)

This technique is useful for Mental calculations 116 + 39 (Here we can write this 39 as 40-1) = 116 + (40 - 1) = 116 + 40 - 1 = 156 - 1 (Instead of adding 39 to 116, we just add 40 to 116 (because we can do this without using pen and paper) and later we subtract one from it) = 155 Try this.. This is very useful tip while doing calculations. Now lets try another example. 116 + 97 = 116 + (100 - 3) = 116 + 100 - 3 (Here, instead of adding 97 to 116, we are just adding a 100 to 116 and then subtracting 3 from it :) = 216 - 3 = 213 Addition of decimals 12.5 + 6.25 = (12 + 0.5) + (6 + 0.25) = 12 + 6 + 0.5 + 0.25 (Here we just added the rounded numbers first and later we added the decimal numbers :) = 18 + 0.5 + 0.25 = 18.75

SUBTRACTION BY NUMBERS CLOSE TO 100, 200, 300, 400, ETC. 250 - 96 = 250 - (100 - 4) (here, instead of subtracting 96 from 250, we are just subtracting 100 from 250 and then adding 4) = 250 - 100 + 4 (Why adding? because the actual amount we have to subtract from 250 is 96. but we are subtracting 100. That means, we are subtracting 4 numbers more than we actually deserve. so our 250 will feel bad. so we should add that 4 to it:) = 150 + 4 = 154

8 = 18 + 0.250 .0.3 = 17. In order to subtract 196.39) (So i just decided to subtract 100 to it and later will subtract the extra 39) = 216 . just practice this method and you will come to know how easy and efficient method it is :) = 156 .9 ??) = 47 .61 (Here i found it difficult to subtract 61 from 216) = 216 .9 . According to our convenience.8) + 0..100 + 39 (Hey.9 (How about dividing this 9.4) = 250 .3 = 17. = 47 .9 as 9 + 0.0. Lets see..(100 . How about writing this 39 as 40 -1 ?) = 116 + (40 .1) (dont be confused.9) we can write this as.3 . 216 .5 .200 + 4 (here also same.9. we subtract 200 and adding 4) = 50 + 4 = 54 Note : We can use this logic for any number.3 .1 = 155 Subtraction of decimals 47 .0.9 = 38 .2 + 0.0.(9 + 0. see here.1 18.9 = 37.0.196 = 250 .(200 .8 = (18 .

multiplying 12 with 17 is same as multiplying 12 with 10 and 7 separately and then adding the results) so. we can write it as = (12 x 10) + (12 x 7) = 120 + 84 = 204 Multiplication by "giving and taking" 12 x 47 (Here its little difficult for us to calculate the multiplication of 12 and 47 mentally. 12 x 15 (Here we can write this 15 as 5x3) = 12 x 5 x 3 (now 12x5 becomes 60) = 60 x 3 (For this you just calculate 3x6. how simple it is?) Multiplication by distribution Assume that we should find out the result of 12x17 12 x 17 (Here we can divide this 17 as 10+7.. I mean just add a zero at the end :P) = 214 x 10 = 2140 (This is our result) .. just divide the number with 2 and then multiply the result with 10..(12 x 3) (we have discussed this rule earlier) = 600 .Shortcuts in Multiplications NOTE : These techniques are for Mental Maths. = 12 x (50 . Yes it is 50. Multiplication using multiples Assume that we should find out the result of 12X15. so.. so just check for the ROUNDED number nearer to 47.36 = 564 Multiplication by 5 * If we have to multiply a number with 5. that is 180) = 180 (see. that is 18 and add one Zero to it. Please avoid using Pen/Pencil and Paper... here. Confused? Its very simple step actually. You should do calculations in your mind only.. 428 x 5 (Now just divide the number with 2) = 428 x 1/2 = 214 (Now multiply it with 10.3) = (12 x 50) .

Here we should add an extra zero.5 x 1000 = 10500 Multiplication by 25 ---------.93 = 169.just move the decimal point one place to the right 16 x 10 = 160 5. * Lets say the number is X. Multiplication by 25 ----------.divide with two and multiply with 1000 21 x 500 = 21/2 x 1000 = 10. Thats it 18 x 50 = (18/2) = 9 = 9 x 100 = 900 Multiplication by 100 -------. this is also same process as we did for 5.) Multiplication by 10 -----------. Thats it . Here you can use another technique too.use the analogy Rs 1 = 4 x 25 Paise 25 x 14 (just divide the 14 as 10+4) = (25 x 10) + (25 x 4) = 250 + 100 ---> Rs2.Divide by 4 and multiply by 100 36 x 25 .Whats the logic behind this step? Very simple.9 = 159 169.move the decimal point two places to the right 45 x 100 = 4500 Multiplication by 500-------. So it will become 10x / 2 * Now cancel it with 2.50 + Rs1 = 350 Hey one more thing.3 (Need an explnation for this too??? :P) Multiplication by 50 -----. Which we have used for multiplication with 5. so here X becomes X/2. * Now we are dividing the number with 2. * And then we are multiplying it with 10. so it becomes 10x / 2 = 5X = 5 multiplied by X.divide with 2 and then multiply by 100 Well.

which gives you the answer = 957 Multiplication of numbers ending in 5 with the same first terms (square of a number) 25 x 25 first term = (2 + 1) x 2 = 6 last term = 25 answer = 625 ---> square of 25 75 x 75 first term = (7 + 1) x 7 = 56 last term = 25 answer = 5625 ---> 75 squared . so. = place this term 9 between 7 &2 = 792 (That's the answer) Multiplication by 11 (if sum of digits is greater than 10) 87 x 11 => 8 + 7 = 15 because here 15 is greater than 10.= (36/4) x 100 = 9 x 100 = 900 Multiplication by 11 (if sum of digits is less than 10) 72 x 11 = 7+2 =9. it is Less than 10. first use 5 and then add 1 to the first term 8.

Sign up to vote on this title

UsefulNot useful- Cstr Exampleby natalia_campelo
- Abū al-Ḥasan Ahmad, Ibrāhim al-Uqlīdisī (auth.)-The Arithmetic of Al-Uqlīdisī_ The Story of Hindu-Arabic Arithmetic as told in Kitāb al-Fuṣūl fī al-Ḥisāb al-Hindī-Springer Netherlands (1978).pdfby msolahuddin
- Turbocharge Design - Calculation sampleby isudirman
- How to Study Mathby tlguay

- A Hand Book of General Instruction for Mechanics Containing Useful 1000117634
- Introducing Multiplication & Division
- Rapid.calculations
- No 4
- Mathematics K to 10
- Term 4 Week 4 2013.docx
- Subtraction Worksheets
- Black Lines Grade 4 Math
- Brunswiga
- Mathematics 2 Lesson Log
- Moment Distribution
- Form 1
- 64 main for solar input port Reese_Justin_M_200712_MAST
- Vedic Multiplier 2
- Int Phase Booklet 2013.pdf
- xss_Cntr
- Draft
- Lifting Clamp
- Lesson Plan Fil-5
- 77 Applications of the Dot and Cross Product
- 1 - BEATCALC - Squaring Numbers
- SolutionsNPMaAVT97
- Brunsviga 13 RM
- Binary Number Operation
- Cstr Example
- Abū al-Ḥasan Ahmad, Ibrāhim al-Uqlīdisī (auth.)-The Arithmetic of Al-Uqlīdisī_ The Story of Hindu-Arabic Arithmetic as told in Kitāb al-Fuṣūl fī al-Ḥisāb al-Hindī-Springer Netherlands (1978).pdf
- Turbocharge Design - Calculation sample
- How to Study Math
- Internship_Report_EGAT2014-Ratana.pdf
- Field Theory Notes
- Additions Shortcuts

Are you sure?

This action might not be possible to undo. Are you sure you want to continue?

We've moved you to where you read on your other device.

Get the full title to continue

Get the full title to continue reading from where you left off, or restart the preview.