## Are you sure?

This action might not be possible to undo. Are you sure you want to continue?

Addition of numbers close to multiples of ten (e.g. 19, 29, 38, 59 etc.)

This technique is useful for Mental calculations 116 + 39 (Here we can write this 39 as 40-1) = 116 + (40 - 1) = 116 + 40 - 1 = 156 - 1 (Instead of adding 39 to 116, we just add 40 to 116 (because we can do this without using pen and paper) and later we subtract one from it) = 155 Try this.. This is very useful tip while doing calculations. Now lets try another example. 116 + 97 = 116 + (100 - 3) = 116 + 100 - 3 (Here, instead of adding 97 to 116, we are just adding a 100 to 116 and then subtracting 3 from it :) = 216 - 3 = 213 Addition of decimals 12.5 + 6.25 = (12 + 0.5) + (6 + 0.25) = 12 + 6 + 0.5 + 0.25 (Here we just added the rounded numbers first and later we added the decimal numbers :) = 18 + 0.5 + 0.25 = 18.75

SUBTRACTION BY NUMBERS CLOSE TO 100, 200, 300, 400, ETC. 250 - 96 = 250 - (100 - 4) (here, instead of subtracting 96 from 250, we are just subtracting 100 from 250 and then adding 4) = 250 - 100 + 4 (Why adding? because the actual amount we have to subtract from 250 is 96. but we are subtracting 100. That means, we are subtracting 4 numbers more than we actually deserve. so our 250 will feel bad. so we should add that 4 to it:) = 150 + 4 = 154

196 = 250 .(200 .9 ??) = 47 . Lets see. How about writing this 39 as 40 -1 ?) = 116 + (40 .9 .1 18.9 = 37.2 + 0.4) = 250 . In order to subtract 196.200 + 4 (here also same...3 = 17.1 = 155 Subtraction of decimals 47 .9 = 38 .61 (Here i found it difficult to subtract 61 from 216) = 216 .(9 + 0.8 = 18 + 0.8) + 0.0.(100 .3 .5 . see here. = 47 .0.3 .0. 216 . just practice this method and you will come to know how easy and efficient method it is :) = 156 .39) (So i just decided to subtract 100 to it and later will subtract the extra 39) = 216 . we subtract 200 and adding 4) = 50 + 4 = 54 Note : We can use this logic for any number.0.9 (How about dividing this 9.8 = (18 .1) (dont be confused.0.9) we can write this as.250 .9.9 as 9 + 0. According to our convenience.100 + 39 (Hey.3 = 17.

12 x 15 (Here we can write this 15 as 5x3) = 12 x 5 x 3 (now 12x5 becomes 60) = 60 x 3 (For this you just calculate 3x6.3) = (12 x 50) . here.. Please avoid using Pen/Pencil and Paper. I mean just add a zero at the end :P) = 214 x 10 = 2140 (This is our result) . that is 18 and add one Zero to it.(12 x 3) (we have discussed this rule earlier) = 600 . multiplying 12 with 17 is same as multiplying 12 with 10 and 7 separately and then adding the results) so.. You should do calculations in your mind only. Multiplication using multiples Assume that we should find out the result of 12X15. we can write it as = (12 x 10) + (12 x 7) = 120 + 84 = 204 Multiplication by "giving and taking" 12 x 47 (Here its little difficult for us to calculate the multiplication of 12 and 47 mentally.. Confused? Its very simple step actually.. 428 x 5 (Now just divide the number with 2) = 428 x 1/2 = 214 (Now multiply it with 10.Shortcuts in Multiplications NOTE : These techniques are for Mental Maths. how simple it is?) Multiplication by distribution Assume that we should find out the result of 12x17 12 x 17 (Here we can divide this 17 as 10+7. so just check for the ROUNDED number nearer to 47. just divide the number with 2 and then multiply the result with 10. so... = 12 x (50 . that is 180) = 180 (see.. Yes it is 50.36 = 564 Multiplication by 5 * If we have to multiply a number with 5.

so here X becomes X/2. So it will become 10x / 2 * Now cancel it with 2.50 + Rs1 = 350 Hey one more thing.Whats the logic behind this step? Very simple. * Lets say the number is X. Which we have used for multiplication with 5.9 = 159 169. * And then we are multiplying it with 10. Here we should add an extra zero. Thats it 18 x 50 = (18/2) = 9 = 9 x 100 = 900 Multiplication by 100 -------. Here you can use another technique too.Divide by 4 and multiply by 100 36 x 25 . this is also same process as we did for 5.) Multiplication by 10 -----------.use the analogy Rs 1 = 4 x 25 Paise 25 x 14 (just divide the 14 as 10+4) = (25 x 10) + (25 x 4) = 250 + 100 ---> Rs2.93 = 169.divide with 2 and then multiply by 100 Well. Thats it . so it becomes 10x / 2 = 5X = 5 multiplied by X.divide with two and multiply with 1000 21 x 500 = 21/2 x 1000 = 10.5 x 1000 = 10500 Multiplication by 25 ---------.just move the decimal point one place to the right 16 x 10 = 160 5. * Now we are dividing the number with 2.3 (Need an explnation for this too??? :P) Multiplication by 50 -----.move the decimal point two places to the right 45 x 100 = 4500 Multiplication by 500-------. Multiplication by 25 ----------.

so. it is Less than 10. first use 5 and then add 1 to the first term 8.= (36/4) x 100 = 9 x 100 = 900 Multiplication by 11 (if sum of digits is less than 10) 72 x 11 = 7+2 =9. which gives you the answer = 957 Multiplication of numbers ending in 5 with the same first terms (square of a number) 25 x 25 first term = (2 + 1) x 2 = 6 last term = 25 answer = 625 ---> square of 25 75 x 75 first term = (7 + 1) x 7 = 56 last term = 25 answer = 5625 ---> 75 squared . = place this term 9 between 7 &2 = 792 (That's the answer) Multiplication by 11 (if sum of digits is greater than 10) 87 x 11 => 8 + 7 = 15 because here 15 is greater than 10.

- number systems
- Envisions and Investigations
- Laws of Indices
- eureka mathtips for parentsgrade 3 module 3
- Vedic Mathematics
- Meaning Ops
- observation 7 field experience
- Structured Arrangement Supporting The Development Of Splitting Level In Doing Multiplication By Number Up To 20 – Meryansumayeka – Darmawijoyo - Ratu Ilma - Jaap den Hertog(3)
- c03IndexLaws WEB
- Whole Numbers
- uv 2014-15 weebly toc u1 integeroperations
- keywords4wordprobs
- weekly20overview410reviewweek2
- Multiplications Tables
- eureka mathtips for parentsgrade 3 module 3
- Rancangan pengajaran Harian
- 1.5a Multiplying by Tens, Hundreds or Thousands
- Jack o Lantern Printables Pack
- Year 3 Yearly Plan
- weekly20overview49janegoodall
- Subtraction of Minutes and Seconds
- multiplication trick - edited-ok
- Here Are the Rules Which Will Make Your Process Easy
- unit one standards
- Dll Mathematics 6 q1 w2
- multiplication methods
- cmcdealingdownmathproject
- Structured Curriculum Lesson Plan Day
- Master Formula to Calculate Square in 10 Seconds
- tls 493 engage ny lesson 11

Skip carousel

- Implementation of Vedic Multiplier in Image Compression Using Discrete Wavelet Transform (DWT) Algorithm
- Design and Implementation of a Programmable Truncated Multiplier
- Design Approach of High Performance Arithmetic Logic Unit Using Pipelined Multiplier Based on Vedic Mathematics
- Evaluating Broadband Adoption
- Stealing Keys from PCs using a Radio
- Design and Simulation of Radix-8 Booth Encoder Multiplier for Signed and Unsigned Numbers
- Design of 16 X 16 Vedic Multiplier
- tmpB208.tmp
- Video Math Tutor
- Design of Efficient High Speed Vedic Multiplier
- Compare "Urdhva Tiryakbhyam Multiplier" and "Hierarchical Array of Array Multiplier"
- High Speed Multiplier Design with Column/Row Bypass Method and Tabulation Multiplication
- tmp1295.tmp
- Video Math Tutor
- UT Dallas Syllabus for cs6305.501 05s taught by Ivor Page (ivor)
- IEEE-754 compliant Algorithms for Fast Multiplication of Double Precision Floating Point Numbers
- Implementation and Performance Analysis of a Vedic Multiplier Using Tanner EDA Tool
- Tmp 4047

Sign up to vote on this title

UsefulNot usefulClose Dialog## Are you sure?

This action might not be possible to undo. Are you sure you want to continue?

Close Dialog## This title now requires a credit

Use one of your book credits to continue reading from where you left off, or restart the preview.

Loading