AUSL/NLU Lesson Plan Template

Name: Glorya Suk Time: 12:30pm - 1:45pm Subject/Topic: Mathematics Date: January 21, 2014 (Tuesday)

Objective
CCSS: CCSS.Math.Content.4.NBT.A.1 Recognize that in a multi-digit whole number, a digit in one place represents ten times what it represents in the place to its
right. For example, recognize that 700 ÷ 70 = 10 by applying concepts of place value and division.
CCSS.Math.Content.4.NBT.B.5 Multiply a whole number of up to four digits by a one-digit whole number, and multiply two two-digit numbers, using strategies
based on place value and the properties of operations. Illustrate and explain the calculation by using equations, rectangular arrays, and/or area models.
Objective (SWBAT): Multiply 2-digit numbers by 2-digits and 3-digits using multiple methods.
Assessment / Exit Ticket:NA
Vocabulary/Key Concepts/Word Wall: Lattice grid, 2-digit by 2-digit and 3 digit
Materials / Technology: calculators, lattice sheets, 3.2 packet
Modifications / Accommodations: Visual support, peer support, teacher support


Do Now (3-5 minutes)
Silent, short, pen to paper, complete w/out teacher direction, preview or review

Explain the steps to solving:
12 x 70


Opening (3-5 minutes)
The Hook, Preview Objective, Connection to Prior Knowledge.

Today I am going to teach you how to multiply numbers by 2-digits and 3-digits using different methods. By the end of the lesson, you will know how to solve
multiplication using 2 and 3 digit numbers. Let’s get started.

Pass out calculators.


Middle (IWY)
I Do – Direct Instruction (5 minute limit)
We Do - Guided Practice
You Do – Independent Application by students



Teacher will . . . Student will . . . CFU
I do (5 minute limit):

PART I: Packet p. 90
* Cold call student to read problem.
* Explain each step

PART II: Lattice Grid Model
* I am going to show you another way to multiply 2-digit numbers by 2-digits and 3-
digits. You have to pay really close attention. Check answers on calculators

* 12 x 86
* 49 x 22
* 34 x 55
* 83 x 24
* 321 x 45
* 208 x 12
* 462 x 73
* 847 x 29
* 837 x 283
* 339 x 213
* 402 x 542
* 267 x 584

I do:

Following along with packets

* Board to paper practicing lattice grids



* Following
directions

* Participation

* Asking
questions if
necessary

* Board to paper
We do (guided practice):

PART III: Practice
Table captains, come up and bring a white board and markers for your table.

* Keep your answers to yourselves!
* I am going to put a problem up on the board. You need to solve the problem.

Ready? Let’s get started. (15 minutes)

* 7 tens x 4 = _____ tens
- How many tens? ______
- How many ones? ______

* 8 tens x 4 = ___ tens
- how many hundreds
- how many tens
* 964 x 8 = 7,712
* 682 x 5 = 3,410
* 1,685 x 3 = 5,055
* 3,270 x 3 = 9,810
* 912 x 3 = 2,736
* 605 x 5 = 3,025
* 6,920 x 4 = 27,680
* 92 x 12
* 46 x 23
* 21 x 75
* 81 x 32
* 56 x 45
* 234 x 10
* 829 x 27
* 391 x 732


We do (guided practice):

* Working problems out on white boards

* Solving multiplication problems with 1-digits, 2-digits,
and 3-digits



* Participation


* Answering
correctly on
white boards

* Asking
questions if
ncessary
You do (@ Bats):



You do (@ Bats): Exit Ticket



End
Summarize & review content. Preview next day’s lesson. Homework
For homework, you are to finish packet 3.2.

Great work today! I see growing Math Scholars!

Now take out your student agenda and get ready to write in your homework for tonight.