## Are you sure?

This action might not be possible to undo. Are you sure you want to continue?

If a number ends in 5 then its square always ends in 25. To get the rest of the product take the

left digit and multiply it by one more than itself.

35x35 ends in 25. We get the rest of the product by multiplying 3 by one more than 3. So, 3x4 =

12 and that's the rest of the product. Thus, 35x35 = 1225.

To calculate 65x65, notice that 6x7 = 42 and write down 4225 as the answer.

85x85: Calculate 8x9 = 72 and write down 7225.

Multiplying together 2-digit numbers where the first digits are the same and the last digits

sum to 10

Let's say you want to multiply 42 by 48. You notice that the first digit is 4 in both cases. You

also notice that the other digits, 2 and 8, sum to 10. You can then use this trick: multiply the first

digit by one more than itself to get the first part of the answer and multiply the last digits

together to get the second (right) part of the answer.

An illustration is in order:

To calculate 42x48: Multiply 4 by 4+1. So, 4x5 = 20. Write down 20.

Multiply together the last digits: 2x8 = 16. Write down 16.

The product of 42 and 48 is thus 2016.

Notice that for this particular example you could also have noticed that 42 and 48 differ by 6 and

have applied technique number 4.

Another example: 64x66. 6x7 = 42. 4x6 = 24. The product is 4224.

A final example: 86x84. 8x9 = 72. 6x4 = 24. The product is 7224

Squaring other 2-digit numbers

Let's say you want to square 58. Square each digit and write a partial answer. 5x5 = 25. 8x8 = 64.

Write down 2564 to start. Then, multiply the two digits of the number you're squaring together,

5x8=40.

Double this product: 40x2=80, then add a 0 to it, getting 800.

Add 800 to 2564 to get 3364.

This is pretty complicated so let's do more examples.

32x32. The first part of the answer comes from squaring 3 and 2.

3x3=9. 2x2 = 4. Write down 0904. Notice the extra zeros. It's important that every square in the

partial product have two digits.

Multiply the digits, 2 and 3, together and double the whole thing. 2x3x2 = 12.

Add a zero to get 120. Add 120 to the partial product, 0904, and we get 1024.

56x56. The partial product comes from 5x5 and 6x6. Write down 2536.

5x6x2 = 60. Add a zero to get 600.

56x56 = 2536+600 = 3136.

One more example: 67x67. Write down 3649 as the partial product.

6x7x2 = 42x2 = 84. Add a zero to get 840.

67x67=3649+840 = 4489.

- The Unwinding
- Yes Please
- Sapiens
- Dispatches from Pluto
- Elon Musk
- The Innovators
- Devil in the Grove
- John Adams
- The Emperor of All Maladies
- A Heartbreaking Work Of Staggering Genius
- Grand Pursuit
- This Changes Everything
- The Prize
- The New Confessions of an Economic Hit Man
- Team of Rivals
- The World Is Flat 3.0
- Smart People Should Build Things
- The Hard Thing About Hard Things
- Rise of ISIS
- Angela's Ashes
- Steve Jobs
- How To Win Friends and Influence People
- Bad Feminist

- The Light Between Oceans
- Extremely Loud and Incredibly Close
- The Sympathizer
- The Silver Linings Playbook
- Leaving Berlin
- You Too Can Have a Body Like Mine
- The Incarnations
- The Love Affairs of Nathaniel P.
- Life of Pi
- Bel Canto
- The Master
- A Man Called Ove
- Brooklyn
- The Flamethrowers
- The Rosie Project
- The Blazing World
- We Are Not Ourselves
- The First Bad Man
- The Wallcreeper
- The Art of Racing in the Rain
- Wolf Hall
- Beautiful Ruins
- The Kitchen House
- Interpreter of Maladies
- The Perks of Being a Wallflower
- The Bonfire of the Vanities
- Lovers at the Chameleon Club, Paris 1932
- The Cider House Rules
- A Prayer for Owen Meany
- Mislaid

- Formulas.docx
- Algebra
- Formula 1
- maths.docx
- Basic Identities
- Maths Question and Answers
- Average Formula
- Two Times Tables
- Average formula.docx
- Maths
- Important Math Formulas
- Pythagorean Identities
- Quadratic Equations
- Maths Formulas
- Count
- Maths
- Networking Questions
- Networking Faq
- FAQ
- Veritas Netbackup 6.x to 6.5 Differences
- V Sphere
- Linux
- Maths Tips
- Environmental Science
- Get Addtional Marks in Weak Areas
- Maths Faq
- Tsm Admin Guide
- Multiplying by 5
- Maths Tips

Sign up to vote on this title

UsefulNot usefulClose Dialog## Are you sure?

This action might not be possible to undo. Are you sure you want to continue?

Loading