You are on page 1of 2

4 125 ÷ 25 x 9

=
45 x 9 - 109 =
985 - 450 + 130 =
8 743 - 4 682 + 1357 =
45 + 37 - 53 =
1 296 ÷ 27 x 8 =
4 365 - 50 x 19 =
495 + 109 -276 =
7 236 + 1 973 - 4 179 =
98 - 75 + 29 =
2 600 ÷ 8 x 13 =
128 x 14 - 1 259 =
369 + 468 - 531 =
4 123 + 5 512 - 6 001 =
83 - 34 + 29 =
3 132 ÷ 36 x 10 =
4 896 ÷ 12 + 509 =
852 - 471 + 258 =
7 491 - 3 695 - 1 695 =

466 + 343 = 8 765 .1 369 + 4 569 = 87 + 36 .58 + 25 .4 567 + 3 261 = 96 .56 = .659 +345 = 6 547 .43 = 3 280 x 10 ÷ 20 = 1 876 + 945 ÷ 5 = 957 .56 + 34 = 765 x 12 ÷ 9 = 83 749 + 50 886 ÷ 9 = 857 .