# Amazing Math Trick

234X234+1234-875=??? Trick! Trick!

The 7-11-13 trick!

This trick makes you look like your brain is a mega fast calculator! Ask a friend to write down ANY three digit number such as 231 or 884. Ask them to multiply the number by x7 x 11 x 13 ...but even if your friend has used a calculator, you will have written down the answer ages ago! It's fiendish! THE SECRET: all you do is write out the starting number twice! So 231 will become 231231 and 884 will become 884884. You don't believe it? Well try it on this calculator and see for yourself! You work this calculator by clicking the mouse on the buttons. Go on, put in ANY three digit number then x7 x11 x 13 and see what you get!

but it looks far more miraculous! Get a friend to pick any 2 digit number e.g. 249158 This one takes practice. but unlike the others. 747474 then divide it by three. It's harder to do.g.The 3367 trick:
This trick is similar to the 7-11-13 trick. it's very hard to see how it's done!
. 74 x 3367 To work out the final answer you have to imagine the original number written out three times e.

g.g.. 7-3-1-8 Even though you haven't seen any numbers. Ask a friend to secretly write down ANY number (at least four digits long).g. If you check our example 7+8+3+1+8 = 27 which does divide by nine. After your friend has added up the digits and subtracted them. the answer will ALWAYS divide by 9. or cover your eyes in some way so that you can't see what your friend is writing. they will also divide by 9.The MISSING DIGIT trick!
Here it is! Go and hide in a cupboard. e. and then subtract the answer from the first number. he then reads out the digits that are left..23 = 78318 Your friend then crosses out ONE digit from the answer. you can say what the missing digit is! EIGHT THE SECRET This great trick relies on the power of 9.e. If a number divides by nine. When your friend crosses a digit out. e. 78341 Ask the friend to add up the digits. 7x318 Your friend then reads out what digits are left ..g. 78341 . then when you add the digits up. You add them up.g. 7+8+3+4+1 = 23 . This is the number that was crossed out!
. e. So you need to add on EIGHT.. (It can be any digit except a zero) e. In the example we had 7+3+1+8 = 19 All you do now is see what you have to add on to your answer to get the next number that divides by nine! The next number to divide by 9 after 19 is 27.

For example. Subtract 554 6. Divide by 2 7. Multiply by 5 9. Add only the last two digits of your birth year 12.Birthday Trick
This math trick will determine your birthday. Multiply by 25 3. If the answer is not right. an answer of 123199 means that you were born on December 31. Subtract 32940 to get your birthday! The answer's format is: month/day/year. Just follow the steps with a calculator and press equal after each step. Multiply by 8 5. Add 18 to your birth month 2.
. Go ahead and try the trick without cheating! For a simple. online JavaScript calculator. Add 692 10. Multiply by 20 11. Subtract 333 4. Add your birth date 8. you followed the directions incorrectly or lied about your birthday. 1999. 1. click on the calculator button.

Either n or (3n+1) must be even.
. therefore the whole expression must be divisible by 24. then subtract 1. 112 = 121 then 121 .The "24" Mystery!
A Murderous Math fan called OBAID pointed out that if you square ANY prime number bigger then 3. WHY? If you understand algebra. the answer always divides by 24! E. therefore the whole expression must be divisible by 24. (6n-1)2 = 36n-12n+1.1 = 120 and yes 120 does divide by 24. (6n+1)2 = 36n+12n+1.g. So (6n-1)2 -1 = 36n-12n. So (6n+1)2 -1 = 36n+12n. This factories to 12n(3n-1). Either n or (3n-1) must be even. This factories to 12n(3n+1). (and you've read The Phantom X ) then you'll know that all prime numbers can be written as (6n+1) or (6n-1).

but they must not tell you what it is.
For example.
. if you want to try the trick with the prime number 2801... (In other words multiply the prime number by itself. Ask your friends to pick any prime number bigger than 5.and that's the answer! Now find a new prime number and try it.. you can still tell them: There will be a remainder of 6.) Add 17 Divide by 12 Without knowing which prime number your friends picked.The Prime Number Trick
Using prime numbers.. you can amaze your friends with a prime prediction. here's what to push: 2801 * 2801 = + 17 = / 12 = . Square it.

THE AMAZING MATH TRICK OF 1999
1. The second two digits are your age !!!
This is the only year it will ever work. Multiply this number by 2. so spread the fun around while it lasts . If you have already had your birthday this year . You should now have a three digit number: The first digit of this was your original number (i. . Add 5. 5. First of all. how many times you want to go out to eat each week). Last step: Subtract the four digit year that you were born. . 6.e.
. . . . . add 1748. 2. 4. pick the number of days a week that you would like to eat out. Multiply it by 50. If you have NOT had your birthday yet this year . 3. add 1749.

Grab a calculator. Multiply by 80 4. Add 1 5. Divide number by 2 Do you recognize the answer ??????
. 8. 1. Add the last 4 digits of your phone number again. Subtract 250 9.Phone Number Trick
Here is a math trick so unbelievable that it will stump you. Personally I would like to know who came up with this and why that person is not running the country. Multiply by 250 6. (you won't be able to do this one in your head) 2. Add the last 4 digits of your phone number 7. Key in the first three digits of your phone number (NOT the area code) 3.

Multiply it by 5. Pick another different number between 1 and 100. Divide the number by 10 rounding to the nearest decimal. Write down the number on the other side of the piece of paper. .Joker s Math Trick 1
complete this amazing Math Trick just follow the instruction below and complete the steps.
. Add the number in your family and subtract your age. Add your age minus the number in family. You'll be surprised with the results! All you'll need is a pen or pencil and some paper! Pick a number between 1 and 100. Write down the number on one side of a piece of paper. Divide the number by 10 rounding to the nearest decimal. Multiply by 1998.

Now using both your hands. Find a bin/drawer and place the sheets in it. Now fold the second page.sheet one in your left hand and sheet two in your right hand.. Fold the first page in half. Slap yourself around the head while repeating: "I'm a stupid person who wastes too much time on junk like this. Multiply by 365. Write the number on a new sheet of paper."
. Now pick up the two sheets . Place them side by side.Joker s Math Trick 2
Take the first 2 digits of your home phone number and add them to the last 2 digits of your phone number..

so we get 4 + 1 = 5 Then multiply this answer. 4 5 X 4 = 20 So what you have is 20 and Everyone knows = 25 right? Well it does. so what you have to do is split up the numbers. 5.5 squared shortcut Trick 1
Here is a really quick way to square any number with a 5 on the end Lets take Ok. This is what makes it easy. giving you and Forget about the for the moment and do this: Always add 1. by the original first number. adding 1 to the 4. Put the two answers together and that's the answer! 2025
.

forget about the Add 1 to 8 8+1=9 Multiply 9 by the first number. Try . Give it a try with another number. it isn't difficult. put all the numbers together. Split the numbers apart: 8 and Again. which was 8 9 X 8 =72 Now.5 squared shortcut Trick 2
This works for any number ending in but when the numbers get over 100 it tends to get a little trickier with the multiplication. 72 and = 25
.

25 + 8 = 33 (25 plus second digit).Squaring a 2-digit number beginning with 5
Take a 2-digit number beginning with 5. The last part of the answer is 09 _ _ 0 9 So 53 × 53 = 2809. The last part of the answer is 64 _ _ 6 4 So 58 × 58 = 3364. multiply 5 × 5 = 25 (square the first digit). Add this number to the second number to find the first part of the answer.
. multiply 5 × 5 = 25 (square the first digit). See the pattern? For 53 × 53. Example: If the number is 58. The first part of the answer is 28 2 8 _ _ 3 × 3 = 9 (square second digit). Square the second digit: this is the last part of the answer. 25 + 3 = 28 (25 plus second digit). Square the first digit. The first part of the answer is 33 3 3 _ _ 8 × 8 = 64 (square second digit).

6 × 7 = 42 (first digit times next number): 4 2 _ _.Squaring a 2-digit number ending in 5
Choose a 2-digit number ending in 5. So 35 × 35 = 1225. Example: If the number is 35. 3 × 4 = 12 (first digit times next number). 1 2 _ _ The last part of the answer is always 25: _ _ 2 5. Multiply the first digit by the next consecutive number. The last part of the answer is always 25: _ _ 2 5. The product is the first two digits: XX _ _. So 65 × 65 = 4225. See the pattern? For 65 × 65. The last part of the answer is always 25: _ _ 2 5.
.

.Squaring numbers made up of sixes
Choose a a number made up of sixes. The square is made up of:
one fewer 4 than there are repeating 6's 3 same number of 5's as 4's 6
Example: If the number to be squared is 666 The square of the number has: 4's (one less than digits in number) 44 3 3 5's (same number as 4's) 55 6 6 So 666 × 3666333 = 443556. See the pattern? If the number to be squared is 66666 The square of the number has: 4's (one less than digits in number) 4444 3 3 5's (same number as 4's) 5555 6 6 So 66666 × 66666 = 4444355556.

without the use of a calculator. I will assume that you know your multiplication table reasonably well up to 10x10. Then draw the shape of Africa mentally so it covers the 15 and the 3 from the 13 below. That is It! Wasn't that easy? Practice it on paper first!
.Multiply Up to 20X20 In Your Head
In just FIVE minutes you should learn to quickly multiply up to 20x20 in your head. Those covered numbers are all you need. First add 15 + 3 = 18 Add a zero behind it (multiply by 10) to get 180. Multiply the covered lower 3 x the single digit above it the "5" (3x5= 15) Add 180 + 15 = 195. Always place the larger number of the two on top in your mind. you will be able to multiply any two numbers from 11 to 19 in your head quickly. Try this: Take 15 x 13 for an example. With this trick.

just add a 0 behind the number) but do you know the 11 rule? It is as easy! You should be able to do this one in you head for any two digit number..The 11 Rule
You likely all know the 10 rule (to multiply by 10.. 11 x 57 = 627 Practice it on paper first!
... 5+7=12 . you only put the "ones" digit in the hole and carry the "tens" digit from the addition.. Separate the two digits in you mind (5__4). That's it! 11 x 54=594 The only thing tricky to remember is that if the result of the addition is greater than 9.. For example 11 x 57 . put the 2 in the hole and add the 1 from the 12 to the 5 in to get 6 for a result of 627 . Notice the hole between them! Add the 5 and the 4 together (5+4=9) Put the resulting 9 in the hole 594.. 5__7 . Practice it on paper first! To multiply any two digit number by 11: For this example we will use 54..

READ it from the two fingers on the left of the folded down finger and the 7 fingers on the right of it.Finger Math: 9X Rule
To multiply by 9.. To multiply by 4. (2) To multiply by 3. fold down the 3rd finger from the left.try this: (1) Spread your two hands out and place them on a desk or table in front of you.. This works for anything up to 9x10!
. (3) the answer is 27 . it would be the 4th finger and so on.

So. It is 0. Now it is 4. Again add 1 into 3. Write down the first digit. Then write down 3.425 x 11 First number = 4 4 + 2 = 6. 9 + 0 = 9. Add the first and second digits. Write down the last digit. Here's a simple way of multiplying large numbers by 11 too. add 1 into 5.5890 x 11 First number = 5. Let's try. Add the second and third digits. 5 + 8 = 13. 2 + 5 = 7 Last number = 5 The answer is 4675. Write it. 8 + 9 = 17. Now we can't write 13. Example 2 . Answer : 64790
. After that write down 7.Multiplication Tricks
Multiply by 11 The eleven times table has always been very easy to learn up to 9 x 11. Then write down last digit. Example 1 . Write it. Again and again do this.

Divide by your original number. say 17. Add. Add the result to your original number. oh I don't know. 4. 2. The number you are thinking of now is 3!
. 1. any positive integer (but keep it small so you can do computations in your head). Square it. Subtract your original number. 5. 6. 3. Divide by 6.Mind-Reading Number Trick
Think of a number.

Be Good
Have Nice day with the Math trick
.