Table of Contents
Foreword .......................................................................................................................................Page 1 Quotations............................................................................................................................................... 5 Introduction - Bring Out The Human Calculator In You ..............................................................6 "Can I Really Become A Human Calculator?" ................................................................................ 7 How To Become A Better Math Student ......................................................................................... 8 Strategy #1.............................................................................................................................................10 Strategy #2............................................................................................................................................ 13 Strategy #3............................................................................................................................................ 15 Strategy #4............................................................................................................................................ 18 Strategy #5............................................................................................................................................ 20 Strategy #6............................................................................................................................................22 Strategy #7............................................................................................................................................24 Strategy #8 ............................................................................................................................................26 Strategy #9............................................................................................................................................ 26 Thoughts For Maximizing Powerful Techniques ............................................................................27 Number Games ...................................................................................................................................28 Who Is Scott Flansburg? .....................................................................................................................30

By

Scott Flansburg

FOREWORD

Is math really that important in our day to day life? After all we do have calculators to do math for us, right? Having calculators, small enough to carry in our shirt pocket, is not a good reason to discount the advantage of knowing how to do math in our head on a daily basis. We have become lazy in our daily routine as new inventions have been developed. By using the strategies in this course you will begin to have an overwhelming feeling of how easy and fun math can be. If you are a student, whether it be elementary, middle school, high school or college, you will be able to apply the strategies taught in this course to your life each and everyday. After a couple hours of practice with these strategies you will have a whole new way of looking at math and it will no doubt change the way you look at figures for the rest of your life. Your confidence to study and excell in all subjects after applying our strategies will be dramatically increased. If you are a parent, you will see a more confident child which is something every concerned parent wishes for. If you are not a parent read through this next example on your own, it will prove a strong point, that even the toughest of math problems can be made easy if it is approached differently. Parents should consider this: Turn to the Squaring-Strategy #5 section of this workbook and read through it once, (that is all it takes). Call your child over, and ask him the answer to the following question: What is the square of 45? (or what is 45x45) I know what you are saying. "I don' t know what the answer is ". Relax, once you have read and mastered the Squaring-Strategies, you will feel like a math genius. Now back to your child. When you ask him "to square 45" he will look at you either in confusion, embarrassment, or will more than likely shrug his shoulders and want to hide from you. Remember, our system stimulates creative thinking. At this point your child might try every excuse in the book to avoid having to answer your question. But be persistent. Even very good math students have trouble squaring numbers with calculators. Imagine how confident they will be when they see they can square numbers in their head! Almost 99.9% of the time your child will have trouble with "squaring 45" regardless of age. But ask him to work out the equation using our strategy. Work it out with him verbally at first. Here it is again: 1

025. or on how successful we feel we would be making one decision or another. which is 4+1=5. 2 . It is because of confidence in ourselves and the increased self esteem which comes with confidence that allows us to accomplish virtually anything we want. Practice. "I never would have thought I could do that. Practice.025! Without doubt at this point you and/or your child will be smiling. I would like to touch on this last statement concerning confidence and self esteem. which is the last part of the answer. He will ask "how did you know how to figure this problem out?" Explain it to him. He will now know that 45 2 is 2. making the total answer 2. Explain this to your child and write the equation down on a piece of paper like this: Now tell your child in order to get the first part of the answer he will need to add 1 to the first digit of the number to be squared. So what else can I do now that I thought I couldn't do before? " Automatic confidence builder. Add the answer to the number 25. Confidence and self esteem are the two best tools you or your child can have to live a more successful life. are faced with making decisions which are directly related to our skill level (or confidence) in one way or another. Add this to the equation on the paper like this: Now ask your child to multiply 4x5 to get 20. students and adults alike. Next: Practice. Almost everyday. We base our decisions on past experience. He will have the same thought running through his mind as most people do when they are taught this method.What is the square of 45? After reading the strategy you will know that all squared numbers which end in '5' have an answer which will end in '25'.

standing on its own. the child is standing. and if you tell yourself you are not going to handle it well. Our children's ' confidence in themselves plays a great deal in determining whether they feel they will be a success or a failure. "Oh honey look at Joey. Mother or father happily see the child wobbling on its unsturdy legs and "out comes the camera" and cheers from the proud parents encouraging the child to stand. what do you think the chances are for you to be successful? Not very good at all! With confidence and high self-esteem. we simply tried to stand again and again. We should remember our past successes and look at our short comings as an opportunity to learn to improve on whatever it was that made us fail. But at the time it was a gigantic accomplishment. or your child is presented with a problem. However. I don't think it's a good idea for you to stand now. " Not so impressive. not only as children but as adults as well. something is lost in many of us. talking.Here is an example we can all relate to: Imagine watching a 1 year old baby. As we grow older our parents are not as excited about seeing us walk. We should tell our children they are doing well. Learning new things is no longer worth getting "out the camera " for. whether it be a math problem or another problem of day to day life. Granted the first time the child attempts to stand isn't pretty but the effect is the same. You will almost never hear a parent say. For one reason or another the child reaches up to the edge of the couch and pulls itself up. we are not afraid to fail because we know if we do fall short of success we will learn from that experience and will handle the situation differently in the future. look Joey is standing . We. You can stand! Go for it!" The child's face beams with joy knowing it has accomplished something even as small as standing for the first time. there comes a day when the child is crawling across the floor and suddenly becomes aware of the couch. Joey you can t stand. Can you imagine a mother talking to her husband about their 16 year old son. although it should be. 3 . walking. If you. Virtually every decision is made for the child. talking and driving! Sometime between learning to stand and learning to drive. running. As a parent we should encourage our children to strive for the next rung on the ladder. he's trying to stand. we just kept trying and the cheers from our parents supplied encouragement. etc. is it? But does Joey still need positive reinforcement of his accomplishments? He sure does! You see. When we fell backwards onto the carpet. The child needs it's mother or father to help it eat. with encouragement from our parents. Wait until you are 3 or 4 years old when your legs are much stronger. "Honey. Soon we would be running. Why is this important? It is positive reinforcement that all of us need. On the contrary! The parents are cheering the child on! " ' You can do it. The child will now see the world from a new perspective! The child has conquered a challenge all of us have faced at one time or another. as children knew little of failure. and offer encouragement when they aren't doing so well. . stop trying. We were too young to know that we would have to walk someday." and so on. dress and sleep. This child can do virtually nothing on it's own (other than what babies do best). when we were young we were encouraged by our parents in almost all that we did. . .

"I have been noticing how nice you have been looking lately. If we are to have the future of this country which we all want and deserve we have to begin planning and acting now. Write down the accomplishment and refer back to it when you are feeling down. Think for a moment of the look on a small child's face when they stand for the first time.Social success helps breed academic success. they will not feel good about themselves. If you are a parent. You should compliment the good and work at improving the bad. As parents we should not assume that by not telling our children they have been bad that they should automatically feel good.If we are successful we store that feeling of accomplishment in our subconscious and use that positive thought in the future. If they are not told that they achieve something good. get involved with your child. taking pictures and hugging them. Isn't it a look of enormous accomplishment? They know they have accomplished something great! They feel it and others around them are smiling. For example. "Mom. I have these quotes in my office so I will see them each day. Think of what you did to make the situation a success and avoid failure. Let them know they are special at least once a day. Try cutting them out and hang them in your office or in your room. 4 . On a daily basis you should ask them what they did that day. Read them everyday and I guarantee you will feel better and be better! . relish it. I really appreciate you helping me with my homework." or "thank you for helping me this weekend in the yard" If you are a child say the same thing to your friends. classmates and parents. cheering. and it shouldn't! Each time you accomplish something successfully. For example." or "Thank you for listening to me today" Lack of communication plays a big part in losing self esteem for youngsters. I have provided you with some quotes I feel are very important in my own personal success and I would like to share them with you. Why does that feeling ever have to stop? It doesn't. As parents and students we have to create an environment for desire to learn more and apply that added knowledge each day. What was good about the day and what was bad. Try to say at least one positive thing to each of your children every day.

IT IS NOT A GOAL BUT RATHER A DREAM! SUCCESS BEGINS WITH THE BELIEF THAT YOU CAN BE SUCCESSFUL ALL THE TIME! .WHETHER YOU THINK YOU CAN OR CANNOT BECOME SUCCESSFUL. YOU WILL BE RIGHT! SETTING GOALS AND MAKING CERTAIN YOU REACH THEM WILL MAKE YOU RICH! NO EXCUSES! YOU DETERMINE WHETHER OR NOT YOU WILL BE A SUCCESS TODAY! IMAGINE YOURSELF ACHIEVING YOUR GOALS EACH DAY. THINK OF WHO WILL BENEFIT FROM THEM WHEN YOU ARE SUCCESSFUL! IF A GOAL IS NOT IN WRITING AND IS NOT BELIEVED IN 100%. AND IF IT IS NOT READ EACH DAY.

Students and adults alike who feel they are "poor at mathematics" often perform below their true ability level in other scholastic courses and in the work place. • Ability to do mental calculations quickly. The "pay back" will be the following: • Experiencing a great deal of success with math and working with numbers. The "payment" for this system is your own time and practice of our strategies. • Skill in applying the knowledge of order of operations and properties of numbers. Our system will not make each person who studies it a genius. • Application of a real understanding of place values.. however. by avoiding math. 6 . • Skill in changing data into mentally manageable forms.BRING OUT THE HUMAN CALCULATOR IN YOU INTRODUCTION The primary goal for this program is to motivate.One topic that cannot be replace by a calculator is the development and understanding of what numbers are. . You will be acquiring a more healthy self concept and attitude towards numbers and higher mathematics. • Seeing that your success is a reality due to your own efforts.. • . those who practice the strategies will look at math and all other courses of study in a more enjoyable and more confident light. and most importantly the confidence of seeing that you are a success in a field that was a wall of stalled success only a short time ago. • Quick and accurate recall of basic facts.

You have surely heard the statement that the average person uses only 10% of their brains capability. Use it more.Q. or has a 140 I. It can store things like a computer. use only 1-2% more of their brains capable functions than does the average person. Having either of these things happen to us would be tragic and we would be considered disabled by many standards. We simply have to file the number in our memory under the category in which the telephone number falls. As you get more and more comfortable with our strategies you will soon see how your brain will produce the answers almost as quickly as you can verbalize the problem. Your brain is probably the one organ of our body that is used the least in regards to its capabilities. For example. It takes practice. However we will encourage you to make a clear picture of the problem and then work out the problem in your head. so when applying the strategies of our system we will ask that you visualize the numbers as you add."Can I really become a human calculator?" We are asked this question constantly. Reading is a good stimulation for the brain.'s. but it will happen. subtract and multiply them in your head. Can you think how your life would change if you used only 10% of any other organ in your body? How about using only 10% of our eyes capabilities? We would surely be considered legally blind. Using the strategies in our system are very good stimulation not to mention the scholastic and employment benefits you will create for yourself. the answer is 'yes'. 7 . It is nearly impossible not to visualize the numbers even if you try not to. or those with measured higher I. or higher must use 50% of their brain? Not at all!! In fact some of the smartest people. It is true. The brain is a very interesting part of our bodies. you just don't know it! The equipment you need is your brain and desire. Then would it be true to assume that someone who is considered a genius. So what are we to assume from only being able to use only 10% of our brains capable functions? Simple.Q. In fact you have all the equipment you need to become a human calculator now. also allows us to imagine. How about using only 10% of our legs capabilities? This would require us to use a wheelchair or a cane. when we learn a new telephone number we do not have to continually repeat the number over and over until we have to use it. When we learn something our brain simply files the information away and waits for a signal to bring the information up. We should always do more to use our brain. Our brain.

there are other strategies you should add to your arsenal of math weaponry. you should have a good understanding of certain math symbols. 8 .503! They will be amazed. You will have a much higher confidence level that will help you achieve higher levels of math. Example: a = 20 | b = 30. means 'a' equals 20 when 'b' There are three factors which will improve your math ability and further do away with 'mathfobia'. you will be able to add. For example. Once you have a good understanding of our strategies you will look at math differently. However. They may say "O.K. There is such a huge wall of 'phobia' associated with math problems at an early age and it grows up with us into adulthood. and you will be right! But practice you must. what is 87 cubed?" You will look at them without batting an eye and answer 658. • Strategies • Practice • Memory The strategies taught in our system will create a good base of self confidence and a willingness to learn other mathematical systems like calculus and algebra. Example: 10/5=2 A vertical line like '|' equals 30. When we see a math problem we tend to pull out a calculator or avoid the problem all together.How to become a better math student After a bit of practice you will master all of the strategies in this system and you alone will become a far better student than simply using more study time doing the conventional way of math. You must practice! However practicing our strategies can be very entertaining and have a socially rewarding aspect to them as well. multiply and subtract columns of numbers in your head! After practicing our cube root strategy have someone ask you to cube a number. means 'when' or 'if'. Practice is vital You cannot expect to read these strategies and forget about them and then hope to simply pull them out of memory at will. Once you learn our strategies. smarty. as thousands of students and adults have. Here are some easy ones: means to add means to subtract means to multiply means to divide means to multiply (5) (4) means 5x4 means to divide one figure by another.

when someone tells me they have a bad memory. critical thinking can be taught and must be taught.Memory helps! Memory is so natural to humans but we make such a big deal of it. . once our students look at the strategies they seem a bit let down that there is not a mammoth formulation required to master them. 9 . In fact. I tell them. Fortunately.Creativity cannot be taught. It is simply a matter of assessing what we are wanting to memorize with something we already have memorized. The memorization of our strategies is vital. if that is the case try to forget something they already know! It can't be done. there isn't a massive formulation and this makes memorizing the strategies that much easier. Our brain is very capable of retaining every bit of information we ask it to. For example. however. recall and replay every bit of information we put into our brain. but very easy. We can retain.

falls into the hundreds column.00 minus almost . is in the thousands column.DISTRIBUTIVE PROPERTY OF NUMBERS STRATEGY #1 This strategy makes all our other strategies much easier to understand and operate. but the whole purpose of the program is to teach you strategies which will do away with having to use the calculator you 'buy' and using the calculator you were born with. Let's convert '2.400' to $24. falls into the tens column making it sixty. Now $24. We will assume you know this for now and move on. it's 24.25 cent would give us $23. Therefore. 10 . So now we have 2. There is nothing wrong with thinking this.76. your brain. falls into the ones column making it seven. but let 's try a little bit different approach. The number 2. Look at the following problem: 24 x 99 = ? At first you may be thinking. making it two hundred. so subtract the penny back out. The number 6. we know that the number 3. Let ' s go through this explanation. our answer is 2.75 but don ' t forget the penny you added to the .267 This number has four digits. representing three thousand. Distributive Property of Numbers is simply the understanding of numbers. It sounds tough but let's look at the problem another way. Look again at the problem above. Any analogy you can use to make math easier should be used.376. Isn't this like having $24.24 cent to round it to a quarter. (.25 cent? Sure it is. Knowing the value of each column in which the numbers fall is extremely important in all of our strategies.00 and '24' to . Isn't 99 real close to 100? What if we used this strategy.400-24.400. Knowing the value of the column which each number falls into is very important.01 cent) and you get $23.24 cent.00 minus . " Give me a calculator". and the last digit 7. Referring to the above number. Now 24x1 is easy. It still can be a bit difficult to work this strategy mentally. 3. 99 is really 100 minus 1 isn't it? So now we have: 24x100 minus 24x1 = ? Getting the answer to 24x100 simply takes adding two zeros to the first number to give us 2. Let's go through some of the obvious relations of numbers.

three digit numbers like: Now 100 is a great number to get familiar with. confidence rather than calculation should be a chief objective of school mathematics and our nations economic future depends on the strength in mathematics education. . far too many minority children leave school without acquiring the mathematical power necessary for productive lives. 11 . As long as you remember that half of 100 is 50 and half of 50 is 25. our children must learn a different kind of mathematics for the future from what was adequate in the past. You can use it in mental manipulation a great deal.According to the National Research Council. all children can learn mathematics.This may seem like a long way around to get an answer but by practicing this strategy you will be able to do this same type of problem in your head with four. 1989: mathematics is the discipline for science and technology. you can work many problems in your head very quickly.

adding the cost of two items. This seems a very difficult way to get your answer but when you are working with numbers like.400 be? Right.. so if 24x100 is 2. What if we had a problem like: 24x52 Make '24' your "base number" (the number you will use as a foundation to build your answer upon) and use '52' as your "manipulation number. which is half of 100. and you want the answer in seconds. etc. Now we have to add 24x2 because 52 is really '50+2 '.200.200) and we get 1.Let 's try another one.. 1. the '2' is now a '4' and the '4' is now an '8'.28. . But remember. this strategy is very handy and it will make you feel like a genius. 1986) 12 . .400. giving us an answer of '48'. The easiest way to find the answer to 24x2 is to just double each number. (Kirsch and Jungeblut. and we started with 24x52. Now add '8' to 24x50 (or 1. when in reality we are bringing out the Human Calculator in you! . " 52 is very close to 50. that is only 24x50. what would 24x50. . or half of 2.It is proven that fewer than 40% of young adults can carry out a simple restaurant calculation such as a 15% tip.

our new base number.ADDITION STRATEGY #2 Addition is the basic key to mathematics. giving you 620. add the last number of this column which is 1(100) to our base number to give us 600. Now go to the ones column and the first number is 5 which we know is 5. so practice! It is fun and you will see results quickly. This strategy may seem slow at first but remember. With this strategy you will only have to write down your answer when you are finished adding. you will realize the place values of numbers better and have your answer quicker. By using this strategy. add the 5 to our base number of 670 which will give us 675. this strategy will teach you to start with the far left column and work to the right. The next number is 4 and added to our base number gives us 679. Now we are building on our base number of 600 so move on to the tens column starting with 2 (which represents 20) and add it to the base number of 600. With this strategy mastered you will see how easily the other strategies can be to learn. and finally we add the last number of the equation which is 5 to find our new base number and answer is 685! You need to practice keeping the base number in your head at all times and simply add to it as you work your way through the equation. Not only is this very impressive but you will soon discover getting the right answer is much faster! This may seem a bit slow at first but the end result. after practicing this valuable strategy is a more confident math student. Now add the next number which is 2. Look at the following example: The hundreds column is the underlined number. this strategy starts in the hundreds column by adding the 2 and the 1 (which is 200+100) which gives you 300. 13 . or 20 which gives you 640. the bold numbers are the tens column and the right most numbers are the ones column. Below are some examples to show you a strategy that will work equations from left to right. Now add the next number which is 2(200) to your base number of 300 (this is the number you are building on or adding to until we arrive at our answer) which gives you 500. the next number is 1 which makes our base number 680. To begin. or 10 which gives us a new base number of 670. or 20 which gives you 660 and the next number which is 1. you have been taught a different way all these years and now you are learning a new and much faster way to do math and this is a great strategy to learn with. Instead of starting with the ones column and carrying to the tens column and then to the hundreds. All the other math strategies will be much easier to work once you have this strategy mastered. And the next number 2. Finally.

try doing some of the four digit numbers. Once you have completed each equation. go back and check your answers by working them out.After you have tried the three digit numbers. Do not write out your work. Try not to use a calculator. but try to work the equations in your head and write only your answer. ADDITION 14 .

2 to give us a total of 46. 5. teachers. and coworkers. The first strategy begins from the right with the one's column and moves to the far left to the hundreds column (in this case) in a crisscross fashion. giving us 24+5+16. We write the 6 as the next digit in our answer (writing from right to left) and carry the 1 to be used in Fig. Let 's try one slowly. 362. plus the 1 we carried from Fig. giving us 30.multiply 6x8 an add it to 5x2. 4. and adding the 4 that we carried from Fig. In Fig. There are many strategies to use to break down a problem making it easier for you. giving us 48+10. Do not let the explanation fool you. Write the 2 as the next digit in the answer and carry the 6 to Fig. making it 8+8.MULTIPLICATION STRATEGY #3 This strategy is a fun one because people think multiplication is so difficult and when it is mastered you can amaze your friends.664. or 58. 4. giving us a total of 36. or 16. In Fig. 1 1x4 equals 4: we write the 4 as the right most digit in our answer. Write the 6 as the next digit in the answer and carry the 4 to Fig. Write 36 and there you will have the answer. Try these next problems on your own: (Write the work down as you work through this equation. or a total of 45. Next in Fig. The mental process goes as follows: Refer to Fig. Below are some of the easier strategies to try. 3. it is a much easier strategy than it may sound. 2 we cross multiply 2x4 and add it to 1x8. 3 we will multiply 6x4 and add it to 5x1 and then add 2x8. and adding the 6 which we carried from Fig. Multiplication is the most fascinating of all operations to explore with numbers because you can do so much more with this process mentally.) 15 . 3 will give us 62. (Write the work down as we work through this equation). 5 multiply 6x5. 4. In Fig.

000. It sounds a little tough but once you practice this strategy you will see how quickly you can do it in your head. which will give you 358.400.000. but realize that you are multiplying 600x500.900. which is 600x4. Finally we multiply the 2x8 (20x80) giving us 1. Remember to keep track in your head of the base number.000. .000. which is 10.600 and that brings our base number to 362.060. which at this point is 300.000) which will give you a new base number of 38. 16 . Now multiply the 600x80 which is 8. or 6x5 and just add 4 zeros: which would give you 300. which is the hundreds column.000.000 and add it to the base number (300. multiply the 6x5. The next step is to multiply the 6x4. Then multiply 1x4 (which is 1x4) giving us 4 and add that to our base number to give us a new base number which is also our answer of 362. Starting from the left. Mathematics is the most dominant.980 and then multiply 8x1 (80x1) giving us 80 and add that to our base number which gives us 361. Try these next examples on your own.Second only to English. Even higher education.660. Now we multiply 2x4 (20x4) giving us 80 which we to add to our base giving us 360. math credits account for nearly one-third of the total devoted to science and engineering. The teaching of math involves 25 million students including 10 million secondary students and 3 million college students. add this to the base number. you start from the left side of the problem and work your way back to the right or ones column. Math courses account for 20 percent of all school instruction and 10 percent of all course credits in higher education. add this to our base which is now 360.664. Now multiply 500x20. Next multiply the 5x1 (500x1) giving us 500 and add it to the base giving us 360. Let's use the example below to illustrate how this strategy works.The second multiplication strategy is much quicker in finding the answer with a little practice. most expensive and most influential subject taught in schools today. Math also accounts for nearly two thirds of total precollege instructional effort devoted to science. Like the addition strategy.400. giving us 2.

MULTIPLICATION 17 .

If the numbers are over 100.COMPLIMENTARY MULTIPLICATION STRATEGY #4 To teach this strategy we will be working with the following equation: To work this equation using this strategy. add the hundreds unit to the right digit of the first part of the answer. instead of subtracting the difference. Now subtract the difference of one number from the original number. just add the difference. That gives you the first part of the answer.021 18 .024 96 4 = the difference from 100 difference from 100 94 6 = the 90 = subtracting 6 from 96 or 4 from 94 4x6 multiply the difference If the difference product is over 99. Then simply multiply the two differences and put it to the right of the answer. start with how far from 100 each number is. For example: ADD The answer is 11. SUBTRACT The answer is 9.

COMPLIMENTARY MULTIPLICATION 19 .

as in the case of 88 2 . Subtract this difference from the number being squared. write this answer as the first digits in your answer. For example: Try these numbers using this new strategy. and above 51. Using this strategy you simply figure how far from 100 the number you wish to square is. so our strategy will look like this: Now to get the second part of the answer. 4 2 (or 4x4=16) The answer to 96 2 is: 9216 If the squared difference is larger than 99. how far from 100 is 96? The answer is 4. simply square the difference that the original number was from 100 and put the answer to the right of your digits you already have written down and that is your answer. For example we will be squaring 96.SQUARING STRATEGY #5 This is the easiest and quickest way to square a number under 100. so we need to determine. SQUARING 96 2 93 2 104 2 103 2 95 2 882 1062 105 2 91 2 85 2 1082 107 2 20 942 892 110 2 109 2 92 2 90 2 112 2 101 2 . simply add the hundreds unit to the second digit of the first half of the answer.

we have a very easy technique for squaring it. multiply them together (3x4). Look at the following equations to see how they are worked out using this exciting strategy: 21 . In order to get the first part of the answer simply take the first digit and add '1' to it and multiply the two numbers together. giving you 12 for the answer. To arrive at the first part of the answer you would take 3 + 1 which is 4. so we know the answer will end in '25'. For example: squaring 35 could be worked out quickly using this strategy because 35 ends in a 5. Our strategy would look like this when written out: So the answer to 35 2 is 1.225.SQUARING NUMBERS THAT END IN FIVE Whenever you have a number in which the last digit is five. First because the last digit in the number is a '5' the answer will automatically end in '25' because 5x5=25.

Memorizing this chart is easy and very useful. To figure the first part of the answer. 22 . You always use the smaller of the two numbers which the whole number falls between.616 Split the answer in half. and tell me which number when cubed ends in a 6? The answer is 6 because 6 3 =216. so in this case it would be 5. Look at the chart on the top of the page. To be able to extract the cube of a cube root you have to know the following chart from memory. Now with this bit of information let's look at this example: 56 3 = 175. Figure out these next cubed roots for yourself. just look at the whole number to the left of the comma. and notice that each answer ends in a different digit. always at the comma. In this case it is 175. Now you know the second half of the answer is '6'. Use the chart on the first three problems and try the remaining problems without the chart. to get 175 | 616. Now look at the answers to 1-9 cubed. between 125 and 216. Between what two numbers does the number 175 fit? Right.EXPLANATION OF CUBING STRATEGY #6 This strategy is good to show off with because no one would believe you could figure these equations in your head! It is also one of the easiest strategies because it is based on the memorizing of only nine numbers. The last digit in the second part of the answer is a 6. What this means is that no answer when numbers 1-9 are cubed will end in the same digit. 13 23 33 43 53 63 73 83 93 = = = = = = = = = 1 8 27 64 12 5 21 6 343 51 2 72 9 Notice the last digit in each answer shown above is underlined.

CUBED ROOTS 23 .

not the whole number which in this case is 63 not 1963. so in this example it would be 63 | 4. SV: This variable stands for "Significant Value" and will be used instead of the number of the month in question. January-0 February-3 March-3 April-6 May-1 June-4 July-6 August-2 September-5 October-O November-3 December-5 So in this example of December 28. Remember to drop off the decimal. Year: This variable requires the numbered year. Here is the formula you will need. December 28th).CALENDAR STRATEGY #7 This formulation is not only handy because you will use it virtually everyday but your friends and associates at work and school will be blown away when you ask them what is the year. do not round up the number. but sure enough you will be right using this formula. In this case it would be 28. * If the year is a leap year subtract 1 from the SV if the month is January or February 24 . The reason for this step is to calculate the number of leap years. 1963 the SV of December will be 5. Below are SV's for each month. month and date of their birth and within seconds you can tell them which day of the week it was on!! They will have to check it out. Let ' s go through each variable. Day: This variable requires the actual day of the month that you are working with. Not only is this strategy great for figuring out the calendar but uses a very simple algebra strategy! Don't be afraid. Year | 4: This variable requires the year from above divided by 4. it is very easy.

Saturday You are right the answer is Saturday. In this case there are 15-7's in 111. So what's 63 + 15 + 28 + 5? That's right 111. The reason we use 7 is that is the number of days in a week. Now translate that to a day of the week like this.Tuesday 3 .3 but remember we drop the decimal so we have 15 leap years.The fastest growing segment of our population are those that are most likely to drop out of the math pipeline. The answer is 15.Monday 2 . 1943 .Friday 6 .Sunday 1 . Now we have to divide by 7.Now let's substitute the variables for numbers to figure out this equation.Wednesday 4 . Figure how many 7's will go into 111. 0 . January 19th. 1956 April 17th. Try these dates below and see how well you can do. 1967 March 20th. So first we have to figure what 63 4 is. so you have 6 left. The 7 under a series of numbers means we will be dividing the top number by the bottom number. then see how much of a remainder you have left. but here's an easy way. So we now have this equation to work with.Thursday 5 . 25 .

35?". high demand has significantly diminished the quality of undergraduate math. demand for mathematics in colleges has doubled. By the way this is your first introduction to algebra `our way'! So from now on when you see this: Don't think of "76 minus 53. as they are essential in mastering algebra. For exampl e: To figure out this equation you should ask yourself what number added to 53 equals 76? The answer is 23. . therefore we like to solve subtraction problems as addition in reverse. ALGEBRA STRATEGY #9 Algebra is really very simple once you have a solid understanding of basic math skills. For example." This is the process we have been taught since we were children and it is simply not the best or the fastest way to get the right answer.As science and society have become more mathematical. 26 . But because the students who need further math development enter college weak in math. The correct way to get a subtraction answer is to reverse the question . Algebra is really basic math with complex mathematical terminology.SUBTRACTION STRATEGY #8 We approach math in a positive way. when someone asks "what is 74 . the first thing to think of is "what number added to 35 equals 74?" This is a much easier and faster way to get the answer.

■ Stress positive values concerning caring. Build a high moral value with your children. ask questions about their friends and school activities. etc. ■ Ask your child what they would do in the same situation as those in the daily news. ■ Show your child you are interested in their daily lives. Let them know what goes on at your job each week.Help your kids maximize their mathematical and general learning ability using these powerful techniques. ■ Praise your children's efforts not just accomplishments. Make certain it is clear of games. Let them know what you do for a living each day. go over the corrected papers with them. ■ Place a calendar of chores and family events on the refrigerator for all to see. but also make it a pleasant place to work in. 27 . ■ Create a study space for your children. ■ Subscribe to magazines that are of interest to your children. How much does your utility bill break down in daily usage? ■ Have your children teach you what they learn each day at school. ■ Hang a map of the world on the wall and have your children make a game of locating the countries on the map where news is being made each day. ■ Have at least a half hour each evening where the whole family sits and discusses the things that went on that day. ■ Involve your children in your work. ■ Build a home library and give books as gifts. What percentage of your weekly money goes for gasoline. ■ Use mathematics to solve everyday problems. ■ Have a set of encyclopedias or reference books always available for your children to use. we will never be able to attract enough young people into the science and engineering careers to retain our competitive edge into the next century. ■ Substitute fruit for candy bars as treats. truth. loving. ■ Read a book they have read and then ask them questions about it. ■ Look over your children's text books and be certain that you are aware of what they are learning. .It is safe to say that unless we improve the attractiveness of math at all levels of schooling and for all groups. ■ It is important that your children understand the mistakes they make on tests and papers. Let this be their office to do homework in. television and telephones. ethics. morals. ■ Try and have your child come to work with you one day or even a portion of the day.

placing the larger of the two numbers on top. Next. Then subtract and the answer will always have a 9 in the middle and the other two numbers will always add up to 9. ■ Add 7. For example February 14th would be punched in as 214. Tell the friend to think of a date like his or her birthday. 2. Hand a friend a calculator. 28 .GAMES TO KEEP YOUR MATH SKILLS SHARP Three Digit Reversal Pick any three digit number (do not use the same number twice) then reverse that number. ■ Multiply that number by 50. The first three or four digits of the new number is the date your friend is thinking of. ■ Add in his or her age. . Punch the 3 or 4 digit number into the calculator. The last one or two digits are your friends age. have your friend use the calculator to: ■ Multiply the number by 2. Now the magic begins! Take the calculator back and subtract 350 from the number on the screen. For example: Your number is: Reversed: Notice that 9 is in the middle and the other two numbers (1 & 8) equal 9.One of the most important stages of any learning experience is for the trainee to constantly keep in mind what it is they are not only to learn but they must have perception of knowing what this skill will do for them. December 4 would be 1204. Try these numbers Talking calculators? We all know calculators can't talk but try these number tricks on your friends and they will be convinced that calculators talk to you! 1. 3.

Multiply it by 99. What is the number? What is not necessary? . Just make sure it isn't `0'. The small number of qualified people who will be available for these jobs support the view that more women and minorities must be more fully educated if for no other reason than enlightened self interest. You should get 18 as your answer each time! Example: 89x99 = 8. What is the number? What is not necessary? Here's a hard one!! The sum of the digits adds up to 6. Add up the digits in your answer. The number is more than 3x12. higher paying jobs of the future will be in the service sectors of the economy. The number is less than 6x10. The number does not have a 3 in it. ■ ■ ■ ■ Pick any 1 or 2 digit number. The number is more than 8x7.. The number is less than 5x11.Pick A Number Any Number . The number is even. The number is not devisable by 4. The number is even.811 8 + 8 + 1 + 1 = 18 Find The Secret Number The number is less than 100.New. . The number does not have a 4 in it. The fastest growing job areas require highly skilled workers. 29 .

We are teaching reading. At first he was discouraged from using his new found methods. Scott persisted and excelled in math.WHO IS SCOTT FLANSBURG? Scott Flansburg . It was in the public schools in New York where Scott discovered a new and exciting way to work out math problems. Scott now speaks fluent Japanese. because they were not the 'right way' to do math. Scott has been featured on many national radio and television talk shows and a book on Scott's life is in the works. Scott enlisted in the United States Air Force working for Special Investigations for three years in Yokota.Industry is having to spend literally billions of dollars each year re-teaching our students due to lack of preparation by our schools. Japan. After graduation from high school. However. Scott knew he had developed something every student and adult alike could use. Fellow students began learning from Scott. .The trainee must have a good working knowledge of the theory behind what is being taught because problem solving is not possible without some understanding and appreciation of the way elements of the task work hand in hand. After he saw his fellow students scoring much higher on math tests by using his system. After leaving the Air Force Scott decided to do what he does best. which he calls 'mathfobia'. New York on December 28. teaching others to overcome their fear of math. was born in a small town of Herkimer. . writing and math all over again to young adults who are entering the work force.The Human Calculator. 1963. 30 .

Sign up to vote on this title
UsefulNot useful