good for maths

Attribution Non-Commercial (BY-NC)

16 views

good for maths

Attribution Non-Commercial (BY-NC)

- Math Reflection
- The ITMA Math Tutoring Reference Guide
- 9 Fast Math Tricks to Supercharge Your Calculations
- Equal Groups
- math lesson plan noellebough 11 16 final
- Math E Quiz, POEM 9, Geri Angela Paragas
- Intro of Vaid Math
- 2019 maths homework term 1 wk 3 hmt
- first week of instruction
- g8m1l1- exponential notation
- feldhus sped841 blendedlessons
- Python Programming Examples
- Math Qrt 1 Week 5 Day 2-Mel
- GUA MentalMath Prek-3
- newsletter torch times february 9 2017 docx
- poll everywhere lesson plan
- lesson plan 2
- learning about division lesson plan
- module7-130317085737-phpapp02
- Multiplication Tips

You are on page 1of 6

Like 2.6m

maths tricks, mathematics tricks, tricks in maths, tricks for maths, tricks of maths, iit maths tricks

Result

Today's Puzzle

Discussion Board

Placement puzzles

21

V iew 10 A pril Test Result

37

23

30 O CT MATHS CHA MPIO NSHIP RESULT A pply for Part Time Job at m4maths A pply Now (5 vacancy)

203

Login

Register

Forget

Maths Tricks , shortcut tricks for maths to make calculation easy and fast To calculate reminder on dividing the number by 27 and 37

Let me explain this rule by taking examples consider number 34568276, we have to calculate the reminder on diving this number by 27 and 37 respectively. make triplets as written below starting from units place 34.........568..........276 now sum of all triplets = 34+568+276 = 878 divide it by 27 we get reminder as 14 divide it by 37 we get reminder as 27

E-mail/Mobile Password

Click to Login

A free browser that lets you do more of what you like on the web

www.google.com/chrome

Example. M4maths launched a new website for enginnering and medical exam prepration

www.iitbrain.com other examples for the clarification of the rule let the number is 2387850765 triplets are 2...387...850...765 sum of the triplets = 2+387+850+765 = 2004 on revising the steps we get 2......004 sum = 6 divide it by 27 we get reminder as 6 divide it by 37 we get reminder as 6 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (1150) No (423)

Find us on Facebook

Let me explain this rule by taking examples consider number 34568276, we have to calculate the reminder on diving this number by 7, 11, 13 respectively. make triplets as written below starting from units place 34.........568..........276 now alternate sum = 34+276 = 310 and 568 and difference of these sums = 568-310 = 258 divide it by 7 we get reminder as 6 divide it by 11 we get reminder as 5 divide it by 13 we get reminder as 11

Sy ed Sushma

Manishsir

Like 1,802 people like Manishsir.

Paramita

Example.

other examples:consider the number 4523895099854 triplet pairs are 4...523...895...099...854 alternate sums are 4+895+854=1753 and 523+099=622 difference = 1131 revise the same tripling process 1......131 so difference = 131-1 = 130 divide it by 7 we get reminder as 4 divide it by 11 we get reminder as 9 divide it by 13 we get reminder as 0 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (471) No (185)

SUSMIT

India Maharashtra Time: 00:00:34

Method:- first calculate the digit sum , then divide it by 3, the reminder in this case will be the required reminder example:- 1342568 let the number is as written above its digit sum = 29 = 11 = 2 so reminder will be 2

20

Physics Class by Manish Sir

converted by Web2PDFConvert.com

Example.

Take some others 34259677858 digit sum of the number is 64 = 10 = 1 reminder is 1 similarly let the number is 54670329845 then digit sum = 53 = 8 when we divide 8 by 3 we get reminder as 2 so answer will be 2 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (360) No (138)

Method:- first calculate the digit sum , then divide it by 3, the reminder in this case will be the required reminder example:- 1342568 let the number is as written above its digit sum = 29 = 11 = 2 so reminder will be 2

Example.

M4maths validate with

Take some others 34259677858 digit sum of the number is 64 = 10 = 1 reminder is 1 similarly let the number is 54670329845 then digit sum = 53 = 8 when we divide 8 by 3 we get reminder as 2 so answer will be 2 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (209) No (96)

vivek singh 7 Month ago I cracked my first campus TC S in November 2011...i convey my heartly thanks to all the members of m4maths community who directly or indirectly helped me to get through TC S......special thanks to admin for creating such a superb community Manish Raj 1 year ago

Method:- first calculate the digit sum , then divide it by 3, the reminder in this case will be the required reminder example:- 1342568 let the number is as written above its digit sum = 29 = 11 = 2 so reminder will be 2

dhaval pujara 2012-09-26 21:33:07 friends i am selected in TC S campus very thanks to the M4MATHS.i totally prepared from this website and i cleared all roundssss thankss ...thanks once agian... kiran 2012-07-11 03:35:29 1!+2!+3!+........+50! is divided by 5! then the remailnder is------------------? a)3 b)33 c)13 d)93... Anil

Example.

Take some others 34259677858 digit sum of the number is 64 = 10 = 1 reminder is 1 similarly let the number is 54670329845 then digit sum = 53 = 8 when we divide 8 by 3 we get reminder as 2 so answer will be 2 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (189) No (88)

Let me explain this rule by taking examples 96^2 :First calculate 100-96, it is 4 so 96^2 = (96-4)----4^2 = 9216 similarly 106^2 :First calculate 106-100, it is 6 so 106^2 = (106+6)----6^2 = 11236

"God does not care about our mathematical difficulties; He integrates empirically." Albert Einstein "Arithmetic is where numbers fly like pigeons in and out of your head." Carl Sandburg "A man whose mind has gone astray should study mathematics." Francis Bacon "As far as the laws of mathematics refer to reality, they are not certain; and as far as

Example.

An other case arises 110^2 = (110+10)----100 = (120+1)----00 = 12100 similarly 89^2 = (89-11)----121 = (78+1)----21 = 7921 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (395) No (155)

"what is the rank of MASTER in dictionary " Unsolved Asked In: tcs

Let me explain this trick by taking examples 67^2 = [6^2][7^2]+20*6*7 = 3649+840 = 4489 similarly 25^2 = [2^2][5^2]+20*2*5 = 425+200 = 625 Take one more example

converted by Web2PDFConvert.com

97^2 = [9^2][7^2]+20*9*7 = 8149+1260 = 9409 Here [] is not an operation, it is only a separation between initial 2 and last 2 digits

Example.

Here an extra case arises C onsider the following examples for that 91^2 = [9^2][1^2]+20*9*1 = 8101+180 = 8281 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (635) No (221)

" 2^89/89 what will be the remainder......" Unsolved Asked In: tcs

Multiplication of 2 two-digit numbers where the first digit of both the numbers are same and the last digit of the two numbers sum to 10 (You cant use this rule for other numbers)

Let me explain this rule by taking examples To calculate 5654: Multiply 5 by 5+1. So, 5*6 = 30. Write down 30. Multiply together the last digits: 6*4 = 24. Write down 24. The product of 56 and 54 is thus 3024.

Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example 78*72 = [7*(7+1)][8*2] = 5616 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (323) No (103)

Multiplication of two numbers that differ by 6 (This trick only works if you have memorized or can quickly calculate the squares of numbers.

If the two numbers differ by 6 then their product is the square of their average minus 9. Let me explain this rule by taking examples 10*16 = 13^2 - 9 = 160 22*28 = 25^2 - 9 = 616

Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example 997*1003 = 1000^2 - 9 = 999991 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (221) No (93)

Multiplication of two numbers that differ by 4 (This trick only works if you have memorized or can quickly calculate the squares of numbers.

If two numbers differ by 4, then their product is the square of the number in the middle (the average of the two numbers) minus 4. Let me explain this rule by taking examples 22*26 = 24^2 - 4 = 572 98*102 = 100^2 - 4 = 9996

Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example 148*152 = 150^2 - 4 = 22496 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (194) No (58)

Multiplication of two numbers that differ by 2 (This trick only works if you have memorized or can quickly calculate the squares of numbers.

When two numbers differ by 2, their product is always the square of the number in between these numbers minus 1. Let me explain this rule by taking examples 18*20 = 19^2 - 1 = 361 - 1 = 360 25*27 = 26^2 - 1 = 676 - 1 = 675

Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example 49*51 = 50^2 - 1 = 2500 - 1 = 2499 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (159) No (44)

Multiplication of 125 with any number (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

Let me explain this rule by taking examples 1. 93*125 = 93000/8 = 11625. 2. 137*125 = 137000/8 = 17125.

Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example 3786*125 = 3786000/8 = 473250. Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (210) No (87)

converted by Web2PDFConvert.com

Multiplication of 25 with any number (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

Let me explain this rule by taking examples 1. 67*25 = 6700/4 = 1675. 2. 298*25 = 29800/4 = 7450.

Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example 5923*25 = 592300/4 = 148075. Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (198) No (51)

Multiplication of 5 with any number (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

Let me explain this rule by taking examples 1. 49*5 = 490/2 = 245. 2. 453*5 = 4530/2 = 2265.

Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example 5649*5 = 56490/2 = 28245. Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (173) No (56)

Multiplication of 5 with any number (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

Let me explain this rule by taking examples 1. 49*5 = 490/2 = 245. 2. 453*5 = 4530/2 = 2265.

Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example 5649*5 = 56490/2 = 28245. Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (138) No (55)

Multiplication of 999 with any number (You can\'t use this rule for other numbers)

Let me explain this rule by taking examples 1. 51*999 = 51*(1000-1) = 51*1000-51 = 51000-51 = 50949. 2. 147*999 = 147*(1000-1) = 147000-147 = 146853.

Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example 3825*999 = 3825*(1000-1) = 3825000-3825 = 3821175 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (154) No (43)

Multiplication of 99 with any number (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

Let me explain this rule by taking examples 1. 46*99 = 46*(100-1) = 46*100-46 = 4600-46 = 4554. 2. 362*99 = 362*(100-1) = 36200-362 = 35838.

Example.

Example. Understand the rule by 1 more example 2841*99 = 2841*(100-1) = 284100-2841 = 281259 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (143) No (38)

Multiplication of 99 with any number (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

Let me explain this rule by taking examples 1. 46*99 = 46*(100-1) = 46*100-46 = 4600-46 = 4554. 2. 362*99 = 362*(100-1) = 36200-362 = 35838.

Example.

Example. Understand the rule by 1 more example 2841*99 = 2841*(100-1) = 284100-2841 = 281259 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (114) No (39)

Multiplication of 9 with any number (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

Let me explain this rule by taking examples 1. 18*9 = 18*(10-1) = 18*10-18 = 180-18 = 162.

converted by Web2PDFConvert.com

Example.

Example. Understand the rule by 1 more example 1864*9 = 1864*(10-1) = 18640-1864 = 16776 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (154) No (42)

Multiplication of 11 with any number. (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

Let me explain this rule by taking examples 1) 234163*11 = 2---2+3---3+4---4+1---1+6---6+3---3 = 2575793 Means insert the sum of 2 successive digits and put 2 terminal digits in its place 2) 45345181*11 = 4---4+5---5+3---3+4---4+5---5+1---1+8---8+1---1 = 498796991

Example.

Here an extra case arises C onsider the following examples for that 3) 473927*11 = 4+1--- (4+7-10) +1--- (7+3-10) +1--- (3+9-10) +1--- (9+2-10)--- (2+7) ---7 = 5213197 4) 584536*11 = 5+1---(5+8-10)+1---(8+4-10)---(4+5)---(5+3)---(3+6)---6 = 6429896 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (422) No (230)

Square of any 2 digit number (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

Let me explain this rule by taking examples 27^2 = (27+3)*(27-3) + 3^2 = 30*24 + 9 = 720+9 = 729 In this method, we have to make a number ending with 0, that's why; we add 3 to 27.

Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example 78^2 = (78+2)*(78-2) + 2^2 = 80*76 + 4 = 6080+4 = 6084 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (257) No (162)

Square of a 2 digit number ending with 5 (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

Let me explain this rule by taking examples 35^2 = 3*(3+1) ---25 = 1225

Example.

Other example 95^2 = 9*(9+1) ---25 = 9025 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (330) No (46)

Multiplication of 11 with any number of 3 digits. (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

Let me explain this rule by taking examples 1. 352*11 = 3---(3+5)---(5+2)---2 = 3872 Means insert the sum of first and second digits, then sum of second and third digits between the two terminal digits of the number 2. 213*11 = 2---(2+1)---(1+3)---3 = 2343

Example.

Here an extra case arises C onsider the following examples for that 1) 329*11 = 3--- (3+2) +1--- (2+9-10) ---9 = 3619 Means, if sum of two digits of the number is greater than 10, then add 1 to previous digit and subtract 10 to the associated digit. 2) 758*11 = 7+1---(7+5-10)+1---(5+8-10)---8 = 8338 Is this maths trick helpful?

Yes (223) No (50)

Multiplication of 11 with any number of 2 digits. (You cant use this rule for other numbers)

Let me explain this rule by taking examples 35*11 = 3---(3+5)---5 = 385 Means insert the sum of first and second digits between the two digits of the number 27*11 = 2---(2+7)---7 = 297

Example.

Here an extra case arises C onsider the following examples for that 39*11 = 3+1---(3+9-10)---9 = 429 Means, if sum of two digits of the number is greater than 10, then add 1 to first digit and subtract 10 to the inserted term. 78*11 = 7+1---(7+8-10)---8 = 858

converted by Web2PDFConvert.com

Yes

(245)

No

(48)

Multiplication of any two numbers, both ranging from 11 to 19. (You cant use this rule for other numbers)

Let me explain this rule by taking examples 13*19 = (13+9)*10 + (3*9) = 220 + 27 = 247 Means add first number and last digit of the second number take zero in the third place of this number then add product of last digit of the two numbers in it.

Example.

18*14 = (18+4)*10 + (8*4) = 220 + 32 = 252 Is this maths trick helpful? 113 comments abhi_siva2003 (signed in using yahoo) thanks for giving latest information on puzzles. Reply Like Monday at 3:45am Subihangkhim Bantawa Rai Academic Head IT(Information Technology) at Alfa Beta Institute Itahari-Branch, Sunsari waooo mind blowing..... Reply Like October 6 at 9:27pm Nisheeth Aloof KLS GOGTE INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY BELGAUM 08 great success! Reply Like October 6 at 9:13am Adhikari Gochhayat Utkal University very nice Reply Like October 6 at 5:09am Olive Ragunatha GMS-MAVMM polytechnic college s Reply Like October 5 at 12:12am View 108 more

Yes (514) No (109)

Privacy Policy Maths Quotes Previous Puzzles Prize Disclaimer and C opyright C ontact Us Report a problem Sitemap All rights are reserved to @m4maths.com

converted by Web2PDFConvert.com

- Math ReflectionUploaded byssooshi
- The ITMA Math Tutoring Reference GuideUploaded byBobbyOzuna
- 9 Fast Math Tricks to Supercharge Your CalculationsUploaded byDeepak Kumar
- Equal GroupsUploaded bylawhite123
- math lesson plan noellebough 11 16 finalUploaded byapi-366175670
- Math E Quiz, POEM 9, Geri Angela ParagasUploaded byJewel Queyquep
- Intro of Vaid MathUploaded byGagan Bansal
- 2019 maths homework term 1 wk 3 hmtUploaded byapi-395353190
- first week of instructionUploaded byapi-366978862
- feldhus sped841 blendedlessonsUploaded byapi-341439834
- Python Programming ExamplesUploaded bymithrajoseph
- newsletter torch times february 9 2017 docxUploaded byapi-239307679
- g8m1l1- exponential notationUploaded byapi-276774049
- Math Qrt 1 Week 5 Day 2-MelUploaded byMelinda Rafael
- poll everywhere lesson planUploaded byapi-252903131
- module7-130317085737-phpapp02Uploaded byHasan Razzaq
- GUA MentalMath Prek-3Uploaded byJoe TsEn
- lesson plan 2Uploaded byapi-340985058
- Multiplication TipsUploaded byAnshi Chawla
- learning about division lesson planUploaded byapi-273895102
- Lesson_plan_1.2.docUploaded byConrod Pitter
- Multiplying by 2-Digit NumbersUploaded byDigi-Block
- lesson plan for eslUploaded byCato Cross
- Mathcad - Cálculo viga hormigón ARYAUploaded byjplezp
- russian peasant multiplication alternative algorithm sample lessonUploaded byapi-400542088
- Year 5 Parent Plan AutumnUploaded byAnonymous z6TIpq6el
- MagicalMethodsTips.pdfUploaded byKaran Gupta
- lessonplan math 2Uploaded byapi-339056821
- d le interactive lesson multiplying integers handout 4 horizontalUploaded byapi-464597989
- planbook 4Uploaded byapi-234866210

- GTU - Jan - 2010Uploaded byAnas Mansuri
- 6500ff10Uploaded byVilkesh Patel
- SteganographyUploaded bykamaleshkasm7879
- PdsUploaded byVilkesh Patel
- Discrete Mathematics StructuresUploaded bycandid_kk
- F0DECBE9d01Uploaded byVilkesh Patel
- Design SolutionsUploaded byVilkesh Patel
- UnixUploaded byAbhishek Siroya
- Windows Speed SecretsUploaded bynperestrelo

- LCDF3 Chap 02 P2 NewUploaded byboymatter
- Pediatric Ambulatory AnesthesiaUploaded byTammy Vania
- GearUploaded bygautham_93
- Radiological Anatomy With Barium MealUploaded byjmuhilan
- Manotoc v CA.pdfUploaded byIcon Montius
- helenbenkerdiaryUploaded byapi-342750367
- CSE-Modified.pdfUploaded bybudduna
- Nx Response SimulationUploaded bynhy.mail2709
- abydoc.pdfUploaded byanon_103236507
- The Eyeopener, Feb 24, 2016Uploaded byThe Eyeopener
- Debate Censoring and Social MediaUploaded byMil Ramos
- The extracellular matrix as a scaffold.pdfUploaded byRafael Cavalcante
- Issues in Neuro - Management Decision MakingUploaded bycpmr
- NumerologyUploaded byscribd_new_account
- STRUCTURAL DESIGN.pdfUploaded byHeronijosh Dg
- roses-are-red-my-love.pdfUploaded bymarialu1980
- Jeong-Big Six Auditors and Audit Quality-The Korean EvidenceUploaded byLivia Marsa
- Informal and Formal LinkersUploaded byana
- State v. Caballero, Ariz. Ct. App. (2016)Uploaded byScribd Government Docs
- Critical Discourse Analysis and Cognitive.pdfUploaded byyesaleja
- Multi-Tenancy_and_Hosting_Guidance_For_Exchange_Server_2010_SP2.docxUploaded byDev San
- Kashmir ConflictUploaded byParrot
- MindfulMag_Five_Simple_Practices.pdfUploaded byavisan
- verbal communication in educationUploaded byapi-385089714
- 201654107-Apollo-Nashik-Plans.pdfUploaded byAaquib Mahfuz
- Theory of Cost & RevenueUploaded bynisa
- Deed of SaleUploaded byKaye
- Heritage of NabdwipUploaded byShrikant Phatak
- Internship report on HSBCUploaded bymahanamohit
- North American Literature PoemsUploaded by여자마비