This action might not be possible to undo. Are you sure you want to continue?

:

1) Multiply 2 numbers near 10:

**13 x 12 = ? 13 x 12 = 15_ (ADD) 13 x 12 = _ 6 (Multiply) 13x12=156
**

**Combine both of them How to do: ADD Multiply 13 + 2 = 15 3x2=6

2) Multiply 2 Numbers: We'll take 7 X 8 as an example. Write 7 X 8 = down on a piece of paper and draw a circle below each number to be multiplied.

Now go to the first number to be multiplied, 7. How many more do you need to make 10? the answer is three. Write 3 in the circle below the 7. Now go to the eight. What do we write in the circle below the eight? How many more to make 10? The answer is two. Write 2 in the circle below the eight. Your work should look like this.

We now take away diagonally. Take either one of the circled numbers (3 or 2) away from the number, not directly above, but diagonally above, or crossways. In other words, you either take 3 from 8 or 2 from 7. Either way, the answer is the same, 5. This is the first digit of your answer. You only take away one time, so choose the subtraction you find easier. Now you multiply the numbers in the circles. 3 times 2 is 6. This is the last digit of your answer. The answer is 56. This is how the completed sum looks.

Let's try another, 8 times 9.

How many more to make ten? The answer is 2 and 1. We write 2 and 1 in the circles below the numbers. What do we do now? We take away diagonally. 8 - 1 = 7 or 9 - 2 = 7. 7 is the first digit of your answer. Write it down. Now multiply the two circled numbers together. 2 X 1 = 2, the last digit of the answer. The answer is 72.

Does this method work for multiplying large numbers? It certainly does. Let's try it for 96 times 97.

What do we take these numbers up to? How many more to make what? One hundred. So we write 4 under 96 and 3 under 97. What do we do now? We take away diagonally. 96 minus 3 or 97 minus 4 equals 93. Write that down as the first part of your answer. What do we do next? Multiply the numbers in the circles. 4 times 3 equals 12. Write this down for the last part of the answer. The full answer is 9,312. Which method is easier, this method or the method you learnt in school? This method, definitely, don't you agree. Here is my first law of mathematics: The easier the method you use, the faster you do the problem and the less likely you are to make a mistake. Now, here are some more problems to do by yourself. if we have 98x75 , then we get : 7350 is the answer.

3) The 9 Times (Table of 9 only) 1. Hold your hands in front of you with your fingers spread out. 2. For 9 X 3 bend your third finger down. (9 X 4 would be the fourth finger etc.) 3. You have 2 fingers in front of the bent finger and 7 after the bent finger 4. Thus the answer must be 27 5. This technique works for the 9 times tables up to 10.

4) Multiply large numbers using line method: Multiply 13 x 24 For 13 draw horizontal lines for each no : For 24 draw vertical lines for each no:

Combine both of them:

So we have 2 , 10 , 12 : Then, 2 , 11 , 2 -> send 1 from 12 to 10 and add it into that number which gives us 11 ( 10 + 1). Then, 3, 1 ,2 -> send 1 from 11 to 2 and add it into that number which gives us 3 ( 2 + 1). So answer is 312.

Answer : 312. Multiply: 32x 443

- Capabilities of Indian, Chinese and Pakistani Long-range Missile
- Yamaha R1 2009 Service Manual
- Russian Weapon System
- PAK T-50 5G Russian Plane
- Aeromag December Issue
- Ｓｐｌｉｔ ｌｉｆｅｂｏｏｋ ２０１３ Notebook
- Celebs Then & Now
- Decoding Indias MMRCA Decision
- Boiling and the Lei Den Frost Effect
- Pakistans Nuclear Weapons-Proliferation And
- Gorgeous Inward Facing Home in Mexico City
- Marina Bay Sands Hotel Singapore
- Todays Day
- Design Items
- Fujitsu Tablet + Smartphone
- 15 Creative and Unusual Sleeping Bags
- Jan Lokpal Bill - India
- Cyberwar Between US and China in 2020
- Robotics and Automation
- Floor Guide - Lazona
- Iron Dome
- The 5S Methodology as a Tool
- Rihanna at BET Studios
- Purr Launch by Katy Perry
- Paris Hilton Looks Pretty in Los Angeles

Sign up to vote on this title

UsefulNot usefulhttp://home.youngester.com/

http://home.youngester.com/

- Math Tricks
- math tricks
- Math Tricks
- General Knowledge
- True Love Forbidden Love Book
- Eclipsed Moons
- No Moon, Dante by mIEKAL aND
- Elenore
- Solar Eclipses 2009
- The Return Of Sathanas - Richard S Shaver
- 2009 photodiary
- The Glory In The Heavens
- Fire From the Sky
- Trafalgar Square Spring 2011 Children's Books Catalog
- Theory of Education
- Mohammad Tijani Smaoui - The Shia's Are the Real Ahl e Sunnah
- Isaac Asimov - Quick and Easy Math (Rare)
- Earthology - Raphael
- FQE MATH VI
- Maths Tricks
- Interface Planetary Nodes
- 03 Syllabus Mathematics Ncert
- Vort Rag
- Assessment 1 - The Interview.pdf
- Solutions+to+Final Test V1 MaBNVCO08
- Error Calculation
- 2.Evolution of Computers
- SMCh1
- 3_math
- Tools for Planning
- Simple Mathematics Tricks