You are on page 1of 14

# 5/3/2014

## 3 Step Multiplication Trick - A shortcut method

By: Ramandeep Singh on Tuesday,

Total Pageviews
6123781
FACE BOOK PRE P PAGE
IBPS Exam Preparation
Like 8,283

Search
IB PS B OOKS

Help me to Share!
C OA C HING
Tw eet 0 Like

HOM E

M Y NOT E S

PRE P D VD

ONLINE T E S T S
12

S H ORT C U T S

B OOKS

T OP

## Free GRE Mock Test Series

shiksha.com/GRE-Mock-Test

Online Test Series For GMAT Exam. 5000+ Practice Question. Join Now !

1/14

5/3/2014

## Important 2014. Sbi Bank Po Solved Papers

the series of providing

## quantitative shortcuts and

tricks, today I come up with multiplication trick. While doing multiplication of a two digit number with another two digit number, we take at least 6 steps. Try yourself. Multiply 62 with 32. Now let's do this with a trick

www.IBPStoday.com

STEP 1
First step is same as conventional method, here we multiply 2 with 2.

Ramandeep Singh
Follow

POPULAR POST S
Download Postal Assistants / 1 Sorting Assistants Exam Paper held on 27-04-2014 SBI PO Previous Papers - Download PDF SBI PO Study Plan with Study Material Download Postal Assistant / Sorting Assistant Exam Previous Papers IBPS PO III - Banks not allotted as
2/14

STEP 2
4

This is an interesting step. Now multiply last digit first value and first digit of second value and vicehttp://www.bankexamstoday.com/2013/08/multiplication-trick-shortcut.html

5/3/2014

## 3 Step Multiplication Trick - A shortcut method | Bank Exams Today

versa. Then we add outcomes. But we need the last number that is 8 here.

## per Preference List

STEP 3
This is the last step, in this step we do multiplication ten's digit of both value and add the remainder from previous calculation. That's it, we completed the calculation in 3 steps instead of six steps.

We can use this method for multiplication of three or even four digit numbers but time management is really important in IBPS exam and other recruitment exams so for longer calculations, estimation is the best trick. I will post an article about how to do
http://www.bankexamstoday.com/2013/08/multiplication-trick-shortcut.html 3/14

5/3/2014

Step Multiplication Trick - A shortcut method | Bank Exams Today post an article about how 3 to do

long calculations using estimation and result is 95% accurate which is enough to arrive at answer. Update 06-09-2013 As two of the readers namely Rahul and Ansh have requested me to use this technique in longer calculations multiplications. I am updating this article.

MULTIPLICATION OF 3
DIGIT NUMBERS
In this example I will multiply 432 with 346. Now the 3 step multiplication method will become 5 step. This method can be used for 4 and even 5 digit numbers but as in bank exams there is lack of time available for calculations I recommend you to use approximation for long calculations.

STEP 1

http://www.bankexamstoday.com/2013/08/multiplication-trick-shortcut.html

4/14

5/3/2014

## 3 Step Multiplication Trick - A shortcut method | Bank Exams Today

STEP 2

STEP 3

STEP 4
http://www.bankexamstoday.com/2013/08/multiplication-trick-shortcut.html 5/14

5/3/2014

## 3 Step Multiplication Trick - A shortcut method | Bank Exams Today

STEP 5

In case you find any difficulty to understand the above multiplication method then ask your question in the comments. I will try to answer every query asap.
Like Share 8,283 people like this.

http://www.bankexamstoday.com/2013/08/multiplication-trick-shortcut.html

Get Bank

6/14

5/3/2014

Get Bank

## Exams Study Notes HERE

CONNECT WITH ME

MUST READ PREVIOUS ARTICLES :10 Fast Maths Tricks and Shortcuts How to Score High Marks in Quantitative Aptitude Section of Bank exams Strategies Quantitative GMAT Test Time and Work to crack

section of

## Shortcuts and Tricks

http://www.bankexamstoday.com/2013/08/multiplication-trick-shortcut.html

Probability

Shortcuts

7/14

5/3/2014

Shortcuts with

Questions

## quant , study material

1.

PRAISY
October 12, 2013 at 12:06 PM

Thank you for this sooperb tricks..I tried for 3 digit to 2 digit numbers. But i din get the answer. Help me in this regard ..

2.

RAMAN2572
October 12, 2013 at 12:06 PM

In IBPS you won't have time to make such calculations. Use estimation technique

http://www.bankexamstoday.com/2013/08/multiplication-trick-shortcut.html

8/14

5/3/2014

## 3 Step Multiplication Trick - A shortcut method | Bank Exams Today

3.

DIVYA
October 12, 2013 at 12:06 PM

HII...FOR 3 DIGIT NUMBER HOW CAN WE REMEMBER THESE MANY STEPS TO BE MANDATORY FOLLOWED??

4.

RAMAN2572
October 12, 2013 at 12:07 PM

## Yes it will be applicable

5.

RAGHU
October 12, 2013 at 12:07 PM

Dear Raman, I am very happy and thankful for these nice tricks..but please also give a trick to "multiply 2 digit number with 3 digit number(and more)"..weather this trick is applicable for those multiplication?

6.

RAMAN2572
October 12, 2013 at 12:14 PM

## Please look at above examples. I did that.

7.

RAMAN2572
9/14

http://www.bankexamstoday.com/2013/08/multiplication-trick-shortcut.html

5/3/2014

## October 12, 2013 at 2:03 PM

8.

RAHUL
October 12, 2013 at 2:03 PM

veere u said u will post an article on LONG MULTIPLICATION CALCULTION by ESTIMATION..i am waiting..please post quicky..paper sir te hai..kamm kharaab ho jaana

9.

LOVEJEET SINGH
October 12, 2013 at 6:21 PM

sir when we take 3 digits multiply with 4 digits its is not gonna be solved....

10.

INBA RAJ
October 12, 2013 at 8:12 PM

http://www.bankexamstoday.com/2013/08/multiplication-trick-shortcut.html

10/14

5/3/2014

## 3 Step Multiplication Trick - A shortcut method | Bank Exams Today

Nice

11.

ANONYMOUS
November 10, 2013 at 8:35 AM

if you like to multiply 3 digit no with 2 digit number you have to add a zero before 2 digit number ex. 132x079

12.

Anok Hhh
November 11, 2013 at 10:03 PM

i like 2 digit short cut answers i learnt from that examples. thank you for that but 3 digit confuse,

Ramandeep Singh
November 11, 2013 at 11:07 PM

13.

## Amit Kumar Sonu

November 23, 2013 at 1:00 PM

## pls sove here example 55*65

http://www.bankexamstoday.com/2013/08/multiplication-trick-shortcut.html 11/14

5/3/2014

## 3 Step Multiplication Trick - A shortcut method | Bank Exams Today

14.

ANONYMOUS
November 28, 2013 at 4:35 PM

## Sir pls help solving this nos. 55*65 as asked by MR.amit

15.

ANONYMOUS
December 1, 2013 at 10:29 AM

50*60+5*5+60*5+50*5=3575

16.

ANONYMOUS
December 10, 2013 at 2:13 PM

## thanks for tricks

17.

ANONYMOUS
December 11, 2013 at 3:49 PM

does the above trick, told by anonymous, is specific???? coz it does not work for 91*76

18.

ANONYMOUS
December 11, 2013 at 3:51 PM

is there anyone who can tell about multiplication of 4 digit no with 3 digit no

http://www.bankexamstoday.com/2013/08/multiplication-trick-shortcut.html

12/14

5/3/2014

## 3 Step Multiplication Trick - A shortcut method | Bank Exams Today

19.

ANONYMOUS
February 20, 2014 at 9:43 PM

## Thank u so much..i was very much confused..now set..

20.

Sanajy Banerjee
March 2, 2014 at 1:10 AM

all first 18 people are dumbasses... dont try...u peoplewont get through its so easily explained.. no one can spoonfeed you all

Publish

Preview

Thanks for commenting. It's very difficult to answer every query here, it's better to post your query on IBPSToday.com

http://www.bankexamstoday.com/2013/08/multiplication-trick-shortcut.html

13/14

5/3/2014

Ol d er Post

HOME