0 Up votes0 Down votes

23 views43 pagesVikram Devatha - Vedic Addition.pdf

Sep 07, 2015

© © All Rights Reserved

PDF, TXT or read online from Scribd

Vikram Devatha - Vedic Addition.pdf

© All Rights Reserved

23 views

Vikram Devatha - Vedic Addition.pdf

© All Rights Reserved

- RULES IN THE ORDER OF OPERATIONS.docx
- Series
- National Grade 2 Assessment - 2008 - Mathematics P2
- curriculummap web
- Prg 410 Week 2 Assignment
- Introducing Mathematics
- adding decimals
- Arithmetic Sequence.2k19
- Mu Lit Plying & Dividing Integers
- Cbse Class 5 Maths Sample Paper Er4
- MS Excel Analytics and Management Reporting
- For More Information on Primes See Http
- Talk on Academic Imperialism
- Directions for Multiplying Numbers (3rd Grade Math Level)
- 10050s
- Method of Multiplication
- Grade 2 Maths Questions
- g8m1l2- multiplying exponents 3
- final probabilities faith
- Interferometer Fabry Perot

You are on page 1of 43

First Edition

Vikram Devatha

Vedic Addition

This work is licensed under the Creative Commons Attribution 4.0 International

License. To view a copy of this license, visit http://creativecommons.org/licenses/by/

4.0/.

All Things Vedic

Auroville Collaborative

Saracon, Auroville, TN 605111, INDIA.

Tel: +91-413-2622571

Web: www.allthingsvedic.in

ii

iii

Preface

Vedic Mathematics is a system of mathematics that allows

problems to be solved quickly and efficiently. It is based on the

work of Sri Bharathi Krishna Thirthaji Maharaja (1884 1964),

who devised the system from a close study of the Vedas. The

Vedas are ancient scriptures of India that deal with many

subjects. It is based on 16 sutras (aphorisms) from the Vedas

that provide a principle or a rule of working to solve a problem.

These sutras may be ancient in origin, but are still relevant to

modern day mathematics.

Vedic Math provides many different methods to solve any given

problem. The choice of method depends on the conditions that

the given problem satisfies. This is very much like planting a

tree the choice of which tree to plant has to depend on the

nature of the soil and the environment. It is impossible to plant

the same tree everywhere without considering the

surroundings. Vedic math works in a similar manner.

Conventional mathematics generally provides a single method

to solve a mathematical problem. This method is applied

blindly whenever the student comes across the problem.

However, in vedic math, the student chooses which method to

employ. In multiplication, for instance, there are almost five

depends entirely on what the student is comfortable with.

Learning such a system of mathematics at an early age can

greatly help in dispelling fears of mathematics in children and

can even make it more fun. Vedic math also allows us to

develop the ability of lateral thinking, enabling us be faster at

calculations and even to rely less on the calculator. !

!

This series of books is an attempt to present the material in a

modular fashion. Each book focusses on one specific arithmetic

operation - addition, subtraction, multiplication and division.

These books can be read in any order, but it is recommended

that addition and subtraction be read before multiplication and

division. This particular book is related to addition only, and

subsequent books will cover the other arithmetical operations.

Some of the vedic methods apply to specific sets of numbers,

while others are general methods and can be used in all cases.

How to use this book

Each chapter introduces one or two ideas, and takes you from

the simple to the more advanced methods. At times, you will be

posed a question, and I suggest that you pause, think and

arrive at an answer before continuing.

Content has been optimized for the iPad. There are essentially

two kinds of interactivity available in the iPad version:

screencasts and buttons.

A screencast is a digital recording of computer screen output,

explaining the Vedic Math techniques, along with an audio

narration. Screencasts are natively available on an iPad, and in

some versions of the pdf. If the screencasts do not play on your

computer or tablet, these are also available on

www.youtube.com/VedicAddition for reference. At times, it is

easier to explain orally, than in written words. Hence, each

method is illustrated using a screencast, as well as a written

explanation.

Prerequisites

No prior knowledge of Vedic Math is necessary to read and

understand the material I have presented in this book. I start

with the basics, and proceed to the more advanced techniques

of Vedic Math. It will be helpful to know the addition tables till

20+20 to fully grasp the techniques presented in this book.

buttons do not work in your version of this eBook, all solutions

are provided in Chapter 6 as well.

Note for the teacher

If you plan on using this material in your classes, I would

suggest a minimum of two hours on each chapter. Supplement

the exercises presented in this book with your own. Though not

essential, I would suggest that the students understand the

concept of negative sign, before being introduced to Vedic

Math.

Some notes

Some notes

Number tables

Patterns in numbers

Ever seen a pattern in nature, such as the recurring phases of

the moon, and wondered at the beauty of nature? These

patterns exist in numbers too. Patterns such as the Fibonacci

Numbers and the Golden Mean are well known examples.

Learning how to recognize these patterns and using them to

solve problems is what Vedic Math is all about.

There are two kinds of number tables that are essential for

mathematics addition & subtraction tables and multiplication

& division tables. Today, schools generally advocate addition

tables till 10 + 10, and multiplication tables until 12 x 12. For

Vedic Math, you only need to know the tables up to 5 x 5.

Tables of higher numbers are not required. However,

knowledge of tables till 20 x 20 and 16 x 16 will be useful.

Answers in parts

The number line is a straight line with zero at the center and

extending to infinity on either side. Numbers to the left of zero

are negative while those to the right are positive. Zero, a

number discovered in ancient India, is neither positive nor

negative.

3

side (LHS), middle (mid) and the right hand side (RHS). Each

of these are obtained using different methods. For example,

998 x 992 = 990 / 016

Here the answer to the problem 998 x 992 has been obtained

mentally in two steps one giving the left hand side of the

answer (990) and the second giving the right hand side (016).

The method used will be discussed in a later chapter.

Bases

Negative numbers are used extensively in Vedic Mathematics.

You will notice that in the above diagram, the negative sign is

placed above the digit rather than to its left as in conventional

math e.g. -3 has been written as 3. Similarly, 9 will be written

9, -32 as 32

, 10 as either 10 or 10 (since 0 = 0).

Base. Examples of standard bases are 10, 100, 1000, 10000

and so on i.e. numbers start with a 1 and followed by zeroes.

Multiplication and division with these numbers are very simple

the decimal point is shifted, either to the right or to the left

7

be any number, such as 50, 500, 5000, 25, 250, 2500 and so

on. More on this later.

Hundreds column

Units column

4 5 7

9 8 6

+ 3 4 5

Place value

Place-value notation, or positional-notation is a way of

representing numbers. The value of a digit, depends on its

place or position in the number. Beginning with the ones place

at the right, each place value is multiplied by increasing

powers of 10. Place value for the number 24.759 is shown

below

2 4 . 7 5 9

Tens

Units

Decimal

Tenths

Hundredths Thousandths

To the left of the decimal point, digits to the right have smaller

place value than those to the left by a factor of 10. However,

to the right of the decimal point, digits to the left have higher

place value than those to the right.

Columns

Tens column

Direction

In conventional math, most arithmetic operations are

performed Right to Left, i.e. starting with the Units column,

and moving leftward to the Tens column, Hundreds column

and so on. For instance, while adding 2 numbers, the Units

column are added first, then the tens and so on. While

subtracting numbers, again the units column is subtracted

first, then the tens. Direction of operation is Right to Left.

In Vedic Math, arithmetical operations are performed Left to

Right. In so doing, digits with a higher Place Value are

processed first, and rightfully so, as they have a larger value.

interchangeably. For instance, while adding the numbers, we

will refer to columns.

8

Carryover

Unlike conventional math, carryover in Vedic Math can be

made either to the left or to the right. When a digit is to be

carried over, it is written in small case. For instance, in the

following number, the 2 is a carry-over which is added to the

5.

4 6 = 7 4 6

Conventional method

Conventional method

Before we study the Vedic Math techniques of addition, let us

review the method most commonly used today. Add the

following numbers:

3 8 9

4 2 5

+ 6 7 0

It is likely that you started the addition from the Units column.

The main elements in this method of addition are:

1. Addition starts with the rightmost column, usually the Units

column, unless there are decimals.

2. The carry over is added on top of the column to the left.

3. All the columns are added, and the answer is given from the

left.

Although the conventional method can be applied to all cases

of addition, it is not an efficient method.

starts with the decimal digits which have even lower place

value. In day-to-day situations, it is far more important to sum

the columns with the higher place value i.e. the hundreds

column, or the thousands column rather than the units

column.

Carryovers

3

4

+ 6

1 4

8

2

7

8

9

5

0

4

Addition begins

with the units

column

however the final answer is given starting with the leftmost

digit. This becomes a problem if a paper and pen are not

available, since you will need to remember the digits in

reverse order while giving the answer. This makes mental

addition cumbersome.

In the following chapters, you will learn the vedic techniques of

addition that will overcome the problems that arise with

conventional addition. With practice, you will perfect these new

techniques.

Units column, and in cases with decimal figures, addition

11

Column-less method

Column-less addition

Add the following numbers in the method that you are familiar

with.

4 5 7

9 8 6

+ 3 9 5

Example 1

Watch the screencast below to see the column-less method of

adding these numbers. This can also be viewed at http://

youtu.be/JmZQdFCLqvQ

(7+6+5), and then moved to the Tens column (5+8+9).

Sometimes, having to start from the units column may not be a

such a great idea. There may be cases where you need to start

from the Leftmost column (since that column has the highest

place value). In the following chapter, you will learn a method of

adding numbers from the Leftmost column. For now, let us see

if it is possible to add numbers starting from any column.

13

Step 1

Step 2

4

9

+ 3

16

5

8

9

22

7

6

5

18

the column of your choice. Lets add numbers in Column 2, then

Column 1 and lastly Column 3.

Adding digits in Column 2, 5+8+9 gives 22, written as a small

2 and a big 2.

Adding digits in Column 1, 4+9+3 gives 16, written as a small

1 and a big 6.

Step 2: All the small digits are carried over to the previous

column, 1 is carried over to the 2 giving 3, 2 and 6 give 8, and

the 1 is carried over 0 to give 1. The answer is 1838.

Example 2

In some cases, there will be multiple carryovers. Try adding the

following numbers using the column-less method.

2 6 7

7 7 8

+ 5 5 9

You will see that you will need to carryover twice to arrive at the

final answer.

1 and a big 8.

14

Watch the screencast below to see the solution. This can also

be viewed at http://youtu.be/BvyKC3SEfog

2

7

+ 5

14

6

7

5

18

7

8

9

24

Step 2

Step 3

Step 1

the column of your choice.

Adding digits in Column 2, 6+7+5 gives 18, written as a small

1 and a big 8. Adding digits in Column 1, 2+7+5 gives 14,

written as a small 1 and a big 4. Adding digits in Column 3,

7+8+9 gives 24, written as a small 2 and a big 4.

Step 2: All the small digits are carried over to the previous

column, 2 is carried over to the 8 giving 10. This is written as a

small 1 and a big 0. The existing 1 to the left of the 8 is

carried over to the Hundreds column giving 5, and the 1 with

the 4 is carried over to the Thousands column, 0+1 giving 1.

Step 3: The small 1 is carried over the 5, giving 6. The final

answer is 1606.

15

Two-digit method

Two-Digit Method

In this chapter, you will learn a method of adding numbers

quickly and efficiently. You will see that numbers dont have to

be added from the right to the left only, which is most likely what

you are accustomed to. Lets review two points from before.

Right to Left.

In Vedic Math, arithmetical operations are performed Left to

Right. Digits with a higher Place Value are processed first, and

rightfully so, as they have a larger value.

Let us examine this more closely with Addition. Add these two

sets of numbers.

Place value

Place-value notation, or positional-notation is a way of

representing numbers. The value of a digit, depends on its

place or position in the number. Beginning with the ones place

at the right, each place value is multiplied by increasing

powers of 10.

To the left of the decimal point, digits to the right have smaller

place value than those to the left by a factor of 10. However,

to the right of the decimal point, digits to the left have higher

place value than those to the right.

2 5 6

+ 8 9 4

6 3 8

+ 1 9 4

Direction

In conventional math, most arithmetic operations are

performed Right to Left, i.e. starting with the Units column,

and moving leftward to the Tens column, Hundreds column

and so on. For instance, while adding numbers, the Units

column are added first, then the Tens column, then the

Hundreds. While subtracting numbers, again the Units column

It is likely that you added the above numbers from the Right to

the Left, i.e. starting with the Units column in both cases. Now

see if you can find a way to add these numbers from the Left to

the Right. i.e. start adding from the Hundreds column in both

cases!

17

Example 1

In the following example, we add 769 and 583, from the Left to

Right i.e. we start with the Hundreds column, or the leftmost

column, and move column by column, to the right.

Watch the screencast below for an explanation. This can also

be viewed at http://youtu.be/qSd_glxGfDo

7

+ 5

1 3

Step i

Step iii

Step ii

Step iv

6

8

5

Step v

9

3

2

Step vi

The process is broken down into 6 steps, shown in roman

numerals.

Step i: Start by adding the Hundreds column, 7+5 to get 12.

This is written as a 1 in the preceding column (thousands

column), and the 2 is carried over to the subsequent column

(tens column).

Step ii: The 2 and the 6 in the tens column are combined as

26. Add 26 and 8 to get 34.

Step iii: 34 written as a 3 in the preceding column (the

Hundreds column), and the 4 is carried over to the subsequent

column (Units column).

Step iv: The 4 and 9 are combined as 49. Add 49 and 3 to get

52

18

and the 2 is carried over to the subsequent column.

Step vi: Since there is no column to the right of the units

column, the 2 from the 52 is written in the units column.

Read the above steps again carefully, and apply this method to

add the following 325 and 948. The steps are explained in the

next page, but spend a few minutes trying to figure this out

yourself, before continuing.

Example 2

Were you able to add 325 and 948 from Left to Right? These

numbers are again added Left to Right i.e. we start with the

leftmost column, and move to the right. Watch the screencast

below for an explanation. This is also available at http://

youtu.be/3mNpth3NwQ0

3 2 5

+ 9 4 8

Hint: start writing your answer one column ahead.

19

3

+ 9

1 2

Step i

Step iii

Step ii

Step iv

2

4

7

Step v

5

8

3

and the 3 is carried over to the subsequent column.

Step vi: Since there is no column to the right of the units

column, the 3 is written in the units column.

Example 3

Step vi

Try adding 4658 and 7589 using this method on your own now.

Make sure you add Left to Right.

Here is the solution for this exercise:

Step i: Start by adding the hundreds column, 3+9 to get 12.

This is written as a 1 in the preceding column (Thousands

column), and the 2 is carried over to the subsequent column

(Tens column).

Step ii: The 2 that was carried over, and the 2 in the tens

column are combined as 22. Add 22 and 4 to get 26.

Step iii: 26 written as a 2 in the preceding column (the

Hundreds column), and the 6 is carried over to the subsequent

column (Units column).

4 6 5 8

+ 7 5 8 9

this out before seeing the solution.

Step iv: The 6 and 5 are combined as 65. Add 65 and 8 to get

73

20

available at http://youtu.be/GyRFgxb-gy8

Step i

4

+ 7

1 2

Step ii

Step iii

6

5

2

Step iv Step vi

Step v

5

8

4

Step viii

Step vii

8

9

7

Step ix

Step i and ii: Start by adding the leftmost column, 4+7 to get

11. This is written as a 1 in the previous column, and 1 is

carried over to the subsequent column (Tens column).

Step iii: The 1 that was carried over, and the 6 in the tens

column are combined to get 16. 16 and 5 are added to get 21.

Step iv: 21 written as a 2 in the preceding column, and the 1 is

carried over to the subsequent column.

Step v: The 1 and 5 are combined as 15. 15 and 8 are added

to get 23

Step vi: 23 is written as 2 in the previous column, and the 3 is

carried over to the subsequent column.

Step vii, viii, ix: 38 and 9 are added to get 47 the last two digits

in the answer.

21

Try the following exercises, starting from the leftmost column,

and move to the right. Answers are provided in Chapter 6.

5 1 4 3

+ 2 6 2 9

Click for solution

7 6 5 8

+ 1 2 7 9

Click for solution

6 8 0 2

+ 5 4 1 6

Click for solution

4 3 5 8

+ 7 2 0 9

Click for solution

3 0 9 2

+ 7 1 7 4

3

5

4

+ 2

0

7

2

5

2

3

6

8

7 5 6

1 2 2

9 2 3

+

4 0

Click for solution

9 3 2

+ 4 8 7 6

Click for solution

1245 + 3529 =

4427 + 1903 =

12.54 + 23.56 =

45.95 + 45.95 =

8.695 + 3.795 =

34.50 + 88.50 =

22

Example 1

You may have wondered why this technique is called the TwoDigit method of addition. It is so called because any column

that is added, must yield 2, and only 2 digits. For example, in

the following, the hundreds column sums to 3, but should be

written as 03, with the 0 in the thousands place, and the 3

carried over to the tens column. Again while adding the Units

column, 02+7 gives 9, but must be written as 09. The answer

will be incorrect otherwise.

addition.

2

+ 1

0 4

6

4

0

2 5 7

3 4 2

+ 4 3 6

2

7

9

This will result in a Reverse carryover.

You will have three digits when you sum Column 2, but in the 2digit method, you must have two, and only two digits as you

sum each Column.

The final answer in this case is 1035. How would you handle

the three digits of Column 2 to arrive at this answer?

23

this issue. This is also available at http://youtu.be/gREz1ilAMcY

2

3

+ 4

0 10

5

4

3

3

7

2

6

5

5

Hence, a zero is inserted in front of the 9, making it a 09. 0 is

written in the preceding column, and the 9 is carried over to

the Tens column.

Adding digits in Column 2, we get 95+4+3=102, three digits,

written as a small 1 and big 0 in the Hundreds column, and 2

is carried over to the Units column.

Adding digits in Column 3, 27+2+6 gives 35, written as 3 in the

tens column and 5 in the Units column.

Step 2: The small 1 in the Hundreds column needs to be

carried over to the Thousands column. 0+1=1, giving the final

answer as 1035. This is the Reverse Carryover since it moves

24

compared to the other carryovers (the 9 was carried over from

the left to the right, and so was the 2).

Example 2

The final answer in this case is 1035. How would you handle

the three digits of Column 2 to arrive at this answer?

Watch the screenshot below for an explanation, and solution of

this issue. This is also available at http://youtu.be/

1pIpNeYS8Q0

1 6 6 2

4 3 5 8

+ 3 7 8 6

given in the next page. Heres a hint: the Reverse Carryover in

the above example arises due to the Units column.

25

Step 1

Step 2

1

4

+ 3

0 9

0 9

6

3

7

7

6

5

8

10

2

8

6

6

Hence, a zero is inserted in front of the 8, making it a 08. 0 is

written in the preceding column, and the 8 is carried over to

the Hundreds column.

Adding digits in Column 2, we get 86+3+7=96, 9 is written in

the preceding column, and the 6 is carried over to the Tens

column.

Adding digits in Column 3, 66+5+8 gives 79, written as 7 in the

Hundreds column and 9 is carried over to the Units column.

over to the Hundreds column. 7+1=8, giving the final answer as

9806. This is the Reverse Carryover since the 1 is carried over

from the right to the left, i.e. in the reverse direction as

compared to the other carryovers (the 8 was carried over from

the left to the right, and so were the 6 and 9).

Although this still works, the Reverse Carryover prevents us

from arriving at the final answer mentally, and hence, a paper

and pen become necessary.

The alternative is to use the Three-Digit method of addition.

How would that work? What would be the steps? Try the

following, and formulate a Three-Digit method of addition. The

goal is to sum these numbers mentally, and avoid the Reverse

Carryover.

2 0 2

3 3 4

+ 5 6 7

digits, and is written as a small 1 and big 0 in the Tens

column, and 6 in the Units column.

26

Three-digit method

Three-Digit method

The Three-Digit method of addition is a variation of the TwoDigit method. In some cases, the Two-Digit method leads to a

Reverse Carryover in the final step, which can be avoided using

this method.

Watch the screencast below for an explanation of the ThreeDigit method. This can also be viewed at http://youtu.be/

9EdIMGNAJqc

Example 1

Let us revisit the question from the previous chapter. Were you

able to formulate the Three-Digit method for summing the

numbers below? The answer in this case is 1103. How can we

add these numbers, from left to right (starting with the

Hundreds column), and arrive at the answer mentally?

2 0 2

3 3 4

+ 5 6 7

28

2

3

+ 5

0 1 1

Step ii

Step iv

10

0

3

6

0

as 1 in the Hundreds column, 0 in the Tens column and 3 in

the Units column, giving 1103 as the final answer.

Step v

09

2

4

7

3

Did you notice how the Three-Digit method helped us avoid the

Reverse Carryover? We were able to solve the addition moving

only from the left to the right.

Here is another example.

Step vi

Example 2

Step i: Adding digits in Column 1, 2+3+5 gives 10, a two digit

number. In this method, the sum of each column must be

written as 3 digits. Hence, a zero is inserted in front of the 10,

making it a 010.

Step ii: The 0 from the 010 is written in the column before the

preceding column (Hundred-thousands column), and the 10 is

carried over the existing 0 in the Tens column, now read as

100.

Step iii and iv: Adding digits in Column 2, we get

100+3+6=109, 1 is written in the column before the preceding

column (the Thousands column), and the 09 is carried over to

the Units column.

answers are given in the next page, but try to solve this on your

own before continuing.

4 2 5 9

+ 8 7 9 3

Hint: start writing your answer two columns ahead.

29

Watch the screencast below for the solution. This can also be

viewed at http://youtu.be/N_qd2Z4kZ6o

Step i

4

+ 8

0 1 3

Step ii

Step iv Step v

Step iii

Step v

Step vi

12

29

04

2

7

0

5

9

5

9

3

2

Step vii

number. In this method, the sum of each column must be

written as 3 digits. Hence, a zero is inserted in front of the 12,

making it a 012.

Step ii and iii: The 0 from the 012 is written in the column

before the preceding column, and the 12 is carried over to the

Hundreds column, next to the the existing 2, making it 122.

Step iii, iv and v: Adding digits in Column 2, we get 122+7

giving 129. 1 is written in the column before the preceding

column, and the 29 is carried over to the Tens column next to

the 5.

30

from the leftmost column, and move to the right. Write the sum

are provided in Chapter 6.

Now try both these examples with the Two-Digit method, and

3 6 7

+ 4 3 7

1 4 5

+ 8 7 4

3 4 2 5

+ 8 2 7 8

1 3 0 4

+

3 9 8

2 5 7

1 2 8

+ 3 2 3

2 3 9

7 8 5

+

2 3

31

Common errors

Here is a list of some common errors that we make while using

the Vedic Math methods. Check if any of these apply to you.

Make sure that the sum of every column is written as 2 digits

in the Two-Digit method, and as 3 digits in the Three-Digit

method.

X Starting the answer in the same column as the column which

in the preceding column in the Two-Digit method, or the

column before the preceding column in the Three-Digit

method.

X Making an error while summing a column. At times we sum 2

may have gone wrong.

X Mistaking the Column-less methods with the Two-Digit or

there is only one method to remember, Vedic Math provides

several methods for each arithmetic operation. We must

understand each method clearly, and apply accordingly.

are not written in an organized manner, most common in real

world situations.

Are there any other kinds of errors that you seem to make

often? Share your comments.

One question that is likely to arise is, how does one decide

when to use the Three-Digit method over the Two-Digit

method? The Two-Digit method is surely easier, as there are

fewer digits to work with, but it may result in a Reverse

Carryover in some cases. Can we know in advance whether a

sum will give a Reverse Carryover? If so, then we can use the

Three-Digit method from the start, rather than having to switch

from the Two-Digit to the Three-Digit method mid way.

The answer is yes, there is a way to determine if a sum will

result in a Reverse Carryover by examining the numbers to be

added. But try to figure this out yourself, and mail me your

answer. A hint: Read up on Digital Roots presented in the

Book on Vedic Subtraction.

32

the different Vedic Math techniques when faced with a problem.

You have learnt three methods of adding numbers - the

Column-less method, the Two-Digit method and the Three-Digit

method. Should you choose any of these methods for a

particular sum, or stick with the Conventional method? Or

chuck them all and pull out the calculator?

You will find the answer to this question yourself, when you

have given the Vedic Math techniques a fair share of practice,

and attention.

Attempt some real world problems using these methods in the

following chapter.

33

One of the aims of this book is to make math easy to apply in

day-to-day situations when a calculator, or a paper and pen are

not available. This could be in the grocery store, or while paying

the bill in the restaurant, or while collecting change from the

pizza delivary guy. For the Vedic Math techniques to become

second nature, practice is necessary.

Answer the following real-world questions, using the techniques

you have learnt in the previous chapters. You will soon see, that

Units column as well, in most cases. Answers are provided in

Chapter 6.

Irresponsible clerk

John visited the medical diagnostic centre, and had a few xcrashed and she had the clerk make the bill manually. John has

a feeling the clerk has made an error while summing the

35

The Woodchucks

Concluding remarks

competition. The Iron Ladies chucked 1500 kg, a record in

itself. The data entered by the referees is given below. Did the

Woodchucks win?

learnt the Column-less method which can be used to sum any

column independently of the other columns, as well as the TwoDigit and Three-Digit methods with which you can sum

numbers from Left to Right.

All of these methods can be explained using Algebra. In fact

Algebra is the foundation on which Vedic Math can be built. If

you are familiar with Algebra, try proving the Vedic Math

techniques using Algebra.

Use these methods in your day to day situations, and you will

series, viz. Vedic Subtraction, Vedic Multiplication and Vedic

Division will assist you in doing other mental calculations in real

world situations.

36

Answers to exercises

Here are solutions to the exercises on the Two-Digit Method of

addition.

5

+ 2

0 7

1

6

7

4

3

8

3

9

2

4

+ 7

1 1

3

2

5

5

0

6

3

5

4

+ 2

1 5

0

7

2

5

5

2

3

6

8

9

7

1

9

+

1 8

5

2

2

4

4

6

2

3

0

1

8

9

7

1 4 2 7 4 6 5 + 3529 = 04774

7

+ 1

0 8

6

+ 5

1 2

6

2

9

8

4

2

5

7

3

0

1

3

8

9

7

3

+ 7

1 0

0

1

2

2

6

8

+ 4

0 5

9

8

8

9

7

6

3

7

0

2

4

6

2

6

8

4 5 4 3 2 3 7 + 1903 = 06340

13 2. 5 5 0 4 + 23.56 = 036.10

4 8 5. 0 9 8 5 + 45.95 = 091.90

8. 1 6 3 9 8 5 + 3.795 = 12.490

31 4. 2 5 0 0 + 88.50 = 123.00

38

Here are solutions to the exercises on the Three-Digit Method

of addition.

3

+ 4

0 0 8

07

1

+ 8

0 1 0

09

79

6

3

0

7

7

4

5

4

9

3

+ 8

0 1 1

11

16

69

01

16

69

+

0 0 1

4

2

7

3

3

7

2

7

0

0

9

0

06

69

2

7

09

03

+

0 1 0

01

4

7

1

2

1

+ 3

0 0 7

5

2

2

0

3

8

2

4

7

8

3

8

9

5

3

7

5

8

3

4

8

2

39

Here are solutions to the exercises on Real World problems

Irresponsible clerk

The clerk has indeed made an error. Add the balance column

starting from the left. 2+2 gives 04, with the 4 carried over to

the tens column. In the Tens column we see there is a 4 and 8,

which is greater than 10. Hence, the Hundreds digit now

becomes 5. However, the clerk has mentioned the Total

Balance as 443, which is a mistake.

The Woodchucks

Summing the Hundreds column, we get 14. The 4 is carried

over tot he Tens column. Summing the Tens column, we get

42+7+4+1 which exceeds 50. Hence, it is clear the

Woodchucks have won!

40

References

References

Glover, J., T. (2002) Vedic Mathematics For Schools, Book 1,

Motilal Banarsidass Publishers Pvt. Ltd., New Delhi.

Glover, J., T. (2003) Vedic Mathematics For Schools, Book 2,

Motilal Banarsidass Publishers Pvt. Ltd., New Delhi.

Glover, J., T. (2003) Vedic Mathematics For Schools, Book 3,

Motilal Banarsidass Publishers Pvt. Ltd., New Delhi. 14

Gupta, A. (2006) The Power of Vedic Maths For Admission

Test, Professional & Competitive Examinations, Jaico

Publishing House, India.

Jagadguru Swami Bharathi Krishna Thirthaji Maharaja (1992)

Vedic Mathematics, Motilal Banarsidass Publishers Pvt. Ltd.,

New Delhi.

xlii

- RULES IN THE ORDER OF OPERATIONS.docxUploaded byHope Lee
- SeriesUploaded bySàçhîñVishwakarma
- National Grade 2 Assessment - 2008 - Mathematics P2Uploaded byharold balram
- curriculummap webUploaded byapi-310735836
- Prg 410 Week 2 AssignmentUploaded bycoursehomework
- Introducing MathematicsUploaded byMahobe
- adding decimalsUploaded byapi-300868069
- Arithmetic Sequence.2k19Uploaded byRobby Diaz
- Mu Lit Plying & Dividing IntegersUploaded byMr. Aulisio
- Cbse Class 5 Maths Sample Paper Er4Uploaded bySandeep Somaiya
- MS Excel Analytics and Management ReportingUploaded byAnonymous d1D3yC
- For More Information on Primes See HttpUploaded bySAGAR_LIBERATION
- Talk on Academic ImperialismUploaded byCipriano Armenteros
- Directions for Multiplying Numbers (3rd Grade Math Level)Uploaded bySaile Mizam
- 10050sUploaded byOkta Chandra Ridzikianto
- Method of MultiplicationUploaded byrohini1997
- Grade 2 Maths QuestionsUploaded byKevin
- g8m1l2- multiplying exponents 3Uploaded byapi-276774049
- final probabilities faithUploaded byapi-364803211
- Interferometer Fabry PerotUploaded byAZIZAH
- Epistemic Justification and Operational SymbolismUploaded bySettemontiErma1
- Computer Science 37 Lecture 7Uploaded byAlexander Taylor
- Handling OperatorsUploaded byETL LABS
- Chapter 4 Fractions and Percentages _ Essential Mathematics for the Australian Curriculum Year 7Uploaded byLino
- gc-tipsUploaded bynicolas_urdaneta
- Crypt LogicUploaded byLakshya Garg
- sabya-ppadderUploaded byYermakov Vadim Ivanovich
- Introduction to BinaryUploaded byMartin John
- Laboratory Exercise 1Uploaded byEdward Javier Patiño
- 5 1 math - the language of scienceUploaded byapi-272358521

- The Path of Purification (Visuddhimagga)Uploaded byBuddhist Publication Society
- 3 Hacks for Speed Reading - Jim KwikUploaded bymaile4scribd
- Tarpana SanskritUploaded bynavinnaithani
- 19649507 Saints and PsychopathsUploaded byAnser Mehmood
- SELinux and AppArmor: An Introductory ComparisonUploaded byAli Ahmad
- Zabbix Product BrochureUploaded byFulgencio Muniz
- HP ArcSight Logger Quick Start Downloadable.pdfUploaded bymaile4scribd
- Logger QuickStart VM 5.5Uploaded byDavid Valenzuela Jr
- Tech Lead Skills for DevelopersUploaded bymaile4scribd
- Python Reference FinalUploaded bySanthan Salai
- bro001-togaf-in-pictures.pdfUploaded bymaile4scribd
- 2015_005_001_434965.pdfUploaded bymaile4scribd
- Logger_RelNotes_6.2_P1Uploaded bymaile4scribd
- All EFF’d Up _ Yasha LevineUploaded bymaile4scribd
- The Aeneid JohnDrydenUploaded bymaile4scribd
- Oracle.brainDumps.1z0 808.v2015!10!08.by.minnie.58qUploaded bymaile4scribd
- Oracle.actualTests.1z0 808.v2016!09!07.by.tarkan.65qUploaded bymaile4scribd
- Oracle.Testking.1z0-808.v2016-09-27.by.Sain.55qUploaded bymaile4scribd
- Isaca Cisa Success GuideUploaded byAlan Gaines
- CSSLP Exam PricingUploaded bymaile4scribd
- TED OverviewUploaded bymaile4scribd
- Theoretical Computer Science Cheat SheetUploaded byקђเɭเקק
- ImpofAlgorithms_TopcoderUploaded bymaile4scribd
- SearchingaGraph-TopCodersUploaded bymaile4scribd
- Recognizing&RepresentingaGraph TopCodersUploaded bymaile4scribd
- golang-140118232950Uploaded bymaile4scribd
- Riding the ParadoxesUploaded bymaile4scribd
- VID Global Migration Datasheet WebUploaded byTIm Isk
- Dhanda - Book ReviewUploaded bymaile4scribd

- Ethics Meta EthicsUploaded byMags Kas
- Connection StatusUploaded byニップ
- Behaviorist Theory on Language AcquisitionUploaded bySiti Ruqaiyah Abdul Rahman
- Tu Pte ExerciseUploaded byMaruko Chan
- 2012 School MemorandumUploaded byana timogan
- fase 4 ingles unadUploaded byÁngel Angel
- Literary TheoryUploaded byfatfat987
- Structural InteroperabilityUploaded bytabio 85
- Civil - Concrete Foundation Drawing ChecklistUploaded byZafar
- Sosa - Judgment and Agency (Part III)Uploaded byRubén Jiménez
- The Death of a First BornUploaded byMinipura Asiriya
- Huawei - Configuring Downlink Enhanced L2Uploaded byMikhail Berezovskiy
- Peningkatan Fasilitas Apron Bandara Husein Sastranegara - Fuad.pdfUploaded byfuad hasan
- The BijaUploaded byKamakshi Kripa Kendra
- Chapter 1 Databases and Database UsersUploaded byachaparala4499
- Zigbee DevelUploaded byJayan
- Nurses_Sample_636749397425547067Uploaded bySaurav Negi
- The Last Days of the Holy ProphetUploaded byMohammed Hussain
- The Magic Cafe Forums - Mind Reading by Kenton KnepperUploaded byHendri Alam
- ManualUploaded bypatrickman288
- How-To 89 CA-signed PxGridISEnode CAsigned PxGridclientUploaded byacehussain
- Honeywell Vista 21ip Programming GuideUploaded byAlarm Grid Home Security and Alarm Monitoring
- (V & G) 7 Lesson PlansUploaded byImran Maqsood
- Notifier Win-rar Com[2]Uploaded byAkshit Agarwal
- Colin Marshall - Spinoza on Destroying Passions With ReasonUploaded byHernan Camilo
- Make KeyloggerUploaded byArun Sharma
- unit plan overviewUploaded byapi-283392025
- 2007 the House on Mango[1]Uploaded byanoviembre2013
- Writing in College, Part 4 _ Writing Program _ the University of ChicagoUploaded bycdcdiver
- English Grade 8Uploaded byRica Esclada

## Much more than documents.

Discover everything Scribd has to offer, including books and audiobooks from major publishers.

Cancel anytime.