# Search your Topic HERE....

Search

LIC AAO 2016
Study Materials
IBPS Specialist
Officers Study
Materials
IBPS PO V
Interview
Experiences

Want to share anything with us ?
You can reach us at

Shortcuts in

Gr8AmbitionZ @ Gmail.com

Multiplications

Connect with US

Thursday, December 22, 2011
Aptitude, Multiplication
Shortcuts, Multiplications,
Shortcuts, Shortcuts for Bank
Exams

English
Vocabulary
From
THE HINDU

- IBPS RRB IVInterview
Experiences

Banking
Awareness
Quick Reference
Guide
For
IBPS PO 2015

NOTE  :  These  techniques  are
for  Mental  Maths.  You  should
do  calculations  in  your  mind

Complete
General
Awareness
Material For
IBPS PO And
Clerks 2015

only.

avoid

using

Pen/Pencil and Paper.

Popular Posts
Multiplication using multiples

Banking
Awareness For
IBPS PO And
Clerks 2015

IBPS PO V
Preliminary
Online Exam
2015
Last Minute Tips

IBPS PO V Study
Plan
2015
NICL AO 2015
Reviews
And
Study Materials
Home

Multiplication using multiples
Assume  that  we  should  find  out  the
result of 12X15.
12 x 15   (Here  we  can  write  this  15
as 5x3)
=  12 x 5 x 3 (now 12x5 becomes 60)
=  60 x 3 (For this you just calculate
3x6, that is 18 and add one Zero to
it. that is 180)
=  180 (see, how simple it is?)

Home

T He Union Railway Minister
Suresh Prabhu Today (25th February 2016)
Presented The Railway Budget Of The Year
2016-17 In Lok Sabha. This I...
Highlights Of Union Budget
F Inance Minister Arun Jaitley
Today (29th February 2016) Presented The
Union Budget For The Year 2016-17 . This

Multiplication by distribution
Assume  that  we  should  find  out  the
result of 12x17
12 x 17   (Here  we  can  divide  this  17
as  10+7.  here,  multiplying  12  with
17  is  same  as  multiplying  12  with
10  and  7  separately  and  then
so, we can write it as
= (12 x 10) + (12 x 7)
=  120
+ 84
=
204

Union Budget
2015
January 2015
Current Affairs

Highlights Of Rail Budget 2016-

Is His 3rd Union Budget. ...
Current Affairs 2016
F Riends, Here You Can Get
Complete Current Affairs For
All Competitive Exams Like Banking, SSC,
PSC, UPSC, RRB Etc. Every Month, Our Ex...
Upcoming Bank Exam
IBPS SO V Online Exam Results
Out IBPS PO V Marks Of Interview
Qualified Candidates Out Karnataka Bank
Officers (Scale I) Online Exam C...
LIC AAO Online Exam 2016
Model Practice Paper - Part I
H I Friends, I Am Shravan
Again. Today A Local News Paper
Published Model Practice Paper Of LIC
AAO Online Exam 2016 . Here I Am Sharing

Multiplication
by  "giving Reasoning
and
English
Aptitude
T...

G.K.

Computers

taking"
IBPS Clerks IV
IBPS Specialist Officers V
12 x 47  (Here
little  difficult
for2016
Interview
2016 its Current
Affairs
Online Exam 2016 Results Out
Experiences And
us
to
calculate
F Riends, The Institute Of
Tips 2015
the  multiplication  of  12  and  47
Banking Personnel Selection (IBPS) Has
SBI Asso. Clerks
Practice Tests
2015

SBI Asso Clerks
2015 Study Plan

mentally.  so  just  check  for  the

Released The Results Of IBPS Specialist

ROUNDED  number  nearer  to  47.

Officers V Online Exam 2016. Th...

Yes it is 50. so.....
= 12 x (50 ­ 3)

Economic Survey 2015-16
Highlights
A Head Of The Union Budget

=  (12  x  50)  ­  (12  x  3)    (we  have
discussed this rule earlier)
= 600 ­ 36

(29th February 2016), The Finance Minister

= 564

Tabled The Economic Survey ...

Arun Jaitley Today (26th February 2016)

December 2014
Current Affairs
Sports 2014

IBPS Clerks IV
Online Exam
Study Materials
2014
SBI Clerks
Interview
Special 2014

= 564

Tabled The Economic Survey ...
Union Budget 2016-17
Highlights - Live Updates

Multiplication by 5
*  If  we  have  to  multiply  a  number
with  5,  just  divide  the  number
with  2  and  then  multiply  the
result  with  10.  Confused?  Its  very
simple step actually....
428  x  5      (Now  just  divide  the
number with 2)
=  428  x  1/2  =  214  (Now  multiply  it
with  10.  I  mean  just  add  a  zero  at
the end :P)
= 214 x 10
= 2140 (This is our result)

Version Of Union Budget 2016 Highlights
From Here F Inance Minister Arun Jaitley
Has Been Presenting His Third ...
28th February 2016 - Important
National Affairs Today (28th
February 2016)  Is National Science Day .
On This Day, The Nation Pays Tributes To
The Legacy Of The Gre...
LIC AAO Online Exam 2016
Model Practice Paper - Part II

United India
Insurance AO
Exam Special
2014
: Important :
Banking
Awareness
June November 2014
For IBPS Clerks
IV
SBI Associates
PO Study
Materials And
Preparation
Plan

Descriptive Test
Study Material
For SBI
Associates PO
Marketing
Study Material
For SBI
Associates PO
Exams

Whats the logic behind this step?

H I Friends, I Am Shravan

Very simple.

Again. Yesterday, I Shared The Part I Model

* Lets say the number is X.

Practice Paper Of LIC AAO Online Exam

* Now we are dividing the number with
2.  so here X becomes X/2.

* And then we are multiplying it with 10.

Blog Archive

So it will become 10x / 2

March (11)

* Now cancel it with 2. so it becomes 10x

February (138)

/ 2 = 5X = 5 multiplied by X. Thats it ;)

January (149)
December (171)
November (179)

Multiplication by 10  ­­­­­­­­­­­­  just

October (181)

move  the  decimal  point  one  place

September (193)

to the right

August (210)

16 x 10
= 160
5.9 = 159
169.93 = 169.3   (Need  an  explnation
for this too??? :P)

July (155)

Multiplication  by  50  ­­­­­­  divide
with 2 and then multiply by 100
Well,  this  is  also  same  process  as
we  did  for  5.  Here  we  should  add
an extra zero. Thats it

March (201)

18 x 50
= (18/2)  = 9

June (105)
May (138)
April (206)

February (269)
January (247)
December (160)
November (136)

Exams

SSC CGL Study
Materials And
Previous Papers

November (136)

= (18/2)  = 9
= 9 x 100
= 900

October (170)
September (172)
August (188)
July (175)

Bank Interview
Tips

Multiplication  by  100  ­­­­­­­­  move
the  decimal  point  two  places  to
the right

IBPS PO 2014
Special

June (138)
May (130)
April (91)

45 x 100
= 4500

March (102)
February (183)

IBPS RRB CWEIII
Materials
RBI Assistants
Online Exam
2014 Study
Materials

Officers 2014
Study Materials
Useful Tips
Current Affairs
2014

SBI Clerks 2014
Study Materials

January (187)
December (145)

Multiplication  by  500­­­­­­­­  divide
with two and multiply with 1000
21 x 500
= 21/2 x 1000
= 10.5 x 1000
= 10500

November (99)
October (109)
September (87)
August (80)
July (97)
June (114)
May (87)

Multiplication  by  25  ­­­­­­­­­­  use

April (83)

the analogy Rs 1 = 4 x 25 Paise

March (83)

25 x 14 (just divide the 14 as 10+4)
= (25 x 10) + (25 x 4)
= 250 + 100 ­­­>  Rs2.50 + Rs1
= 350

February (65)
January (102)
December (87)
November (38)

Postal / Sorting
Assistants Exam
2014 Study
Materials

IBPS PO, Clerks,
SO Exams
Syllabus And
Study Plan 201415
AP Forest
Officers Exam
Syllabus And

Hey one more thing. Here you can
use  another  technique  too.  Which
we  have  used  for  multiplication

October (114)
September (63)
August (89)
July (46)

with 5.

June (48)

Multiplication

by

25

­­­­­­­­­­­

Divide by 4 and multiply by 100
36 x 25
= (36/4) x 100
= 9 x 100
= 900
Multiplication  by  11  (if  sum  of

May (60)
April (33)
March (2)
February (34)
January (13)

Syllabus And
Preparation
Plan

SBI Specialist
Officers
Syallabus And
Study Materials
IBPS RRB Job
For The Year
2014

Panchayat
Secretary Exam
Special

IBPS IT Officers
Study Materials

VRO VRA Exams
Study Materials,
Bits
BSNL TTA Exam
Syllabus And
Preparation
Plan

LIC AAO
Previous Papers
And Study
Materials
IBPS Clerks II
Interview
Experiences
Math Speed
Improvement
Tests

IBPS Specialist

Multiplication  by  11  (if  sum  of
digits is less than 10)
72 x 11
= 7+2 =9, it is Less than 10. so,
= place this term 9 between 7 &2
= 792 (That's the answer)

Multiplication  by  11  (if  sum  of
digits is greater than 10)
87 x 11
=>  8 + 7 = 15
because  here  15  is  greater  than  10,  first
use 5 and then add 1 to the first term 8,
which gives you the answer
= 957
Multiplication  of  numbers  ending
in  5  with  the  same  first  terms
(square of a number)
25 x 25
first term = (2 + 1) x 2 = 6
last term = 25
answer = 625 ­­­> square of 25
75 x 75
first term = (7 + 1) x 7 = 56
last term = 25
answer = 5625 ­­­> 75 squared

Liked  this  Post?  Read  more  Shortcuts
Here >>

December (10)
January (1)

Protected

IBPS Specialist
Officers
Interview
Experiences
SBI PO Study
Materials

RBI Assistants
Study Materials
Motivational
Articles

You might also like:

Nobel Prize for
Economics 2012 ­
Alvin Roth and
Lloyd ...

Computer
Knowledge MCQs

13th October 2015
­ Important Current

+4   Recommend this on Google

Community
1

  Recommend  1

⤤ Share
Sort by Oldest

Join the discussion…
Anonymous
•   4 years ago

4 years ago

not clear the meaning of last
term.if we take an example of
75*75 than 7+1*7=56 than if
we take a last term ie. 75 than
the answer is 5675 but that is
wrong .right answer is 5625
plz clear it

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

venkI >

Anonymous
•   a year ago

75*75=?
(7+1)*5=56
5*5=25
so ans is 5625 is u got
r not..??

△  ▽

Share ›
Bhupati

> venkI
•   a year
ago

dear U r wrong
(7+1)*5=40
not 56

△  ▽

Share ›
rohit

>
Bhupati
•   10
months
ago

(7+1)*7=56
5*5=25
so its
5625

△  ▽

Share ›
Raju
Rs

>
rohit
•   10
months
ago

It's not

It's not
like that
the
correct
procedure
is
(75*75)..
Last
digits
multiply
5*5=25
then
after
7*8=56...
U can
do same
procedure
to 15,
25,
etc....

△  ▽

Share ›
Vikaashh singh
•   4 years ago

Look if we need to find square
of any no ending with 5 like
175*175
write 25 at the unit and tenth
place blindfoldly then for the
later part just find 17*(17+1)=
17*18=306. so the ans will be
30625 rather 30675.
The correct ans is 30625, you
can check it out.
other example 195*195=
19*20=380 & 25 at ones &
tenth place so ans is 38025.
It's handy concept for finding
square of the no ending with 5.
Hope you concept is clear
now:)
1 △

• Reply • Share ›

The Back Bencher
Teachers  •  4 years ago

@ Anonymous : The last term

is not 75. Its 25 (5 X 5). Please
do check it...
1 △

• Reply • Share ›

Anonymous
•   4 years ago

thnks....!! its helpful..! :)

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

soniya  •  4 years ago

thanks a lot :)
1 △

• Reply • Share ›

Anonymous
•   4 years ago

can u plz tell how to find cube
roots apart frm factor method

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

The Back Bencher
Teachers  •  4 years ago

We are going to post the
procedure in a few days
Friend. Keep Checking :)

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

Atul shelke  •  4 years ago

Awsum work.Thank u so
much

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

manikanta  •  3 years ago

last term will be always 25 only
75*75=
f.t=(7+1)*7=56
L.T=25(fix for all)
1 △

• Reply • Share ›

Raj Hasa  •  3 years ago

thanks for all the stuff
provuded by this webpage
.....................

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

Anonymous
•   3 years ago

3 years ago

very useful
1 △

• Reply • Share ›

Anonymous
•   3 years ago

Really gud nd usefull

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

Anonymous
•   3 years ago

Thanks a lot for providing such
a useful website for us......

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

Anonymous
•   3 years ago

gud tricks.......
super like.......

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

Anonymous
•   3 years ago

THANKS ..REALLY GUD
TRICKS ......APPRECIABLE
WORK.......

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

Anonymous
•   3 years ago

its really good

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

Raj  •  3 years ago

Great work..thanks...

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

Anonymous
•   3 years ago

Thanking for all of u, who are
involved in this creation.
Thanks again. I didn't open my
institute books to prepare for
IBPS as you have provided all
subjects.

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

thenmozhi  •  3 years ago

re ­exam is going to tough ah

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

tina Ingle  •  3 years ago

another method:multiplication
of no. ending in 5with same
first term
25*25
first term is 2
next number is 3
2*3=6
squre of 5=25
so ans is 625
more e.g.35*35=1225
45*45=2025
115*115=12125

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

sweta > tina Ingle
•   a year ago

Nice
But plz explain 115
×115.....?

△  ▽

Share ›
meenu >
sweta
•   a year
ago

first multiply
11*11
then have
square of 5
then combine
both the result

△  ▽

Share ›
pankaj singh >
tina Ingle
•   a year ago

WRONG
115*115=13225 i.e.
(11+1)*12=132and
5*5=25 so answer is
13225

△  ▽

△  ▽

Share ›

Nish > tina Ingle
•   10 months ago

115*115=13225

△  ▽

Share ›

Shiv RK  •  3 years ago

Thanks for the update Tina
Good Day

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

tina Ingle  •  3 years ago

another method:multiplication
of number ending in 5 with
same first term
25*25
2 is first term and 5 is second
term
cosecutive no. of first term is 3
multiply both no.2*3=6
squre of second term =25
so ans is 625
more e.g.35*35=1225
45*45=2025

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

Aman Meena
•   3 years ago

any short cut for 45*55

△  ▽

• Reply • Share ›

Peehu > Aman
Meena
•   2 years ago

45*55
45/2*110 (55+55)
instead of 110 we can
write 100+10, so....
22.5*(100+10)
22.5*100 + 22.5*10
2250+225
=2475

△  ▽

Share ›
Gowtam

> Peehu
•   a year
ago

Hai
friendzzzz...
Another
Shortcut
Method for
Multiply 45*55:
1st Step:
Check the
Conditions
(i) Unit Digit is 5
(ex:25,35,45...)
(ii) Difference of
Tens in digits
are 1.(ex:25*35,
3~2=1; 45*55,
4~5=1...)
2nd Step:
number by 1 is
5+1 = 6, then
multiply 6 by 4
(6*4) = 24

Older Post

Home

Shiv RK

Join
Gr8AmbitionZ

Gr8AmbitionZ

Join this site

Gr8AmbitionZ
245,491 likes

Join this site
Connect

Members (5311)  More
»

Like Page

Share

Be the first of your friends to like this

7,918 have me in circles

View all

Categories

Gr8AmbitionZ.com - All
Rights Reserved.