This action might not be possible to undo. Are you sure you want to continue?

Welcome to Scribd! Start your free trial and access books, documents and more.Find out more

in digit i.e. the last numbers are 5. Also, the beginning numbers are same. You will understand this as you see some examples. 25 x 25 = 6 | 25 (This one's easy, right?) Explanation: As you see both the ending numbers are 5 and also they are beginning with 2. So we have satisfied both the rules. Now how do we get 625. The first step is that you write down 25 on the right hand side. Why we do so? Do not think about that. Just write 25 on the right hand side. Then we take the number on the left hand side (of 25), in this case 2. And we multiply it with the next higher digit number i.e. 3. Therefore we get the answer 2 x 3 = 6, which we write down on the right hand side. So we finally get the answer as 625. 45 x 45 = 20 | 25 Explanation: As this one satisfies the rule too. Both the left numbers are same - 4, and the ending numbers are 5. So without thinking the first thing we do is write 25 on the right hand side. Then we take the left hand number 4 and multiply it with 5, hence we get 4 x 5 = 20 (the left side of our answer). 135 x 135 = 182 | 25 (slightly tough) Explanation: Both the rule has been satisfied. We write down 25 on the right hand side. We multiple 13 with the next higher number and get 13 x 14 = 182. And there we have our answer 18225. Easy right? Slight Modification to the Number 5 method Rule: The ending number should add up to 10. Infact in the above case too the ending number 5 + 5 added upto 10. And the left hand side number should be same. This is very similar, so lets look at some example. 23 x 27 = 6 | 21 (I am sure that,not everyone finds this simple). Explanation: Ending numbers 3 + 7 add upto 10. So the first rule is satisfied. And both the number on left hand side are same i.e. 2. First thing you do is, you multiply 3 x 7 = 21. And then like earlier you multiply 2 with the next higher digit number i.e. 3. And we get 2 x 3 = 6 on the left hand side. Final answer is 621. 62 x 68 = 42 | 16 Explanation: Both the rule have been satisfied. We multiply 8 x 2 as the add upto 10 and we get the left hand side of the answer 16. Then we multiply 6 with the next higher digit number 7 and get 6 x 7 = 42 Fun with number 11 Now we try the tricks which can make calculation by 11 easy. We will also learn how to multiply by 22, 33, 44, 55, 66, etc. As it is nothing but

We add 4 + 1 and get 5 In the above case if we need to multiply by 22. Even 11 x 11. When multiplying by 9 we subtract one from the original number and write it down on the left hand side. The first part is 0 + 2 = 2. 2. In this case you multiply the end answer by 2 and get the exact same answer. Hence we first multiply the main number with 312 with 2 and get 312 x 2 = 624. then we took 2+4 and got 6. second number of our answer and so on. the first number of our answer. 11 x 4. Fun with number 9 Part A (Original number and the number of 9 is same. Starting from the digit’s place add two consecutive digit. We just repeat the process twice. And then multiply the same number with 22. Then we subtract each number on the left hand side from 9 and write it down on the right hand site (this will become clearer with the examples that . 312 x 22 = 624 (312 x2) x 11 = 06240 = 0 +6/6 + 2/4 + 2/0 + 4 = 6864 Explanation: Here we are trying to multiply with 22. for example 234 x 999 but we cannot use this method for 234 x 9999 or 234 x 99) Rules: As usual there is a left hand part of the answer and the right hand part of the answer. as you see we broke the number by taking each consecutive number and added them. Then we first multiply by 2 and then by 11. 11 x 3. Steps involved: 1. Examples 342 x 11 = 03420 = 0+3 /4 + 3/2 + 4/0 + 2 = 3762 Explanation: We added 0 at the end and the beginning of 342 and got 03420. 11 x 5. Now. Similarly we can calculate any number into any multiple of 11.11 x 2. To multiply a number by 11 put a 0 in the beginning and at the end of the number. we again get 4 + 9 + 1 we write down 4 and carry forward 1. 4932 x 11 = 049320 = 0 + 4/4 + 9/3 +9/3 + 2/0+2 = 54252 Explanation: In this case when we add 3 + 9 we write down 2 and carry forward 1. 312 x 22 = 03120 x 11 x 2 = (0+3 / 3 + 1 /2 + 1 /0 + 2) x 2 = 3432 x 2 = 6864 Explanation: This is the exact same sum as above. 11 x 6 respectively. Rest of the steps remain the same. Remember to go from right to left.

but we did so from the left hand side of our answer and not the original number.e 234 . for example 234 x 99999) Rules: Similar to above method.) 383 x 9999 will become 0383 x 9999 = 0382 | 9617 Explanation:It is simple. This is a common mistake I have found and would advice you to remember this crucial point. Here is how its done. 383 x 999999 will become 000383 x 999999 = 000382 | 999617 Explanation: In this case we had 3 extra 9's. In simple words. I am sure by now you get the idea.0 = 9.0 = 9.1 = 233. for example 234 x 9. But now here is the question what if the number of 9's are more than the number which we going to multiply. we imagine the number to be 0383.3 = 6 and so on. So we imagine 3 extra 0's in front of 383.follow). then 9 .1 = 000382. then again 9 . Then we take each individual number and subtract that number from 9 in the order .9 get 0.3 = 6 and so one. So we subtract 9 . But make sure the number of 9's are more and not less or equal. Therefore our first case will be 000383 . for example. Subtract one from it and get 0382. 234 x 999 = 233 | 766 Explanation: We subtract one from 234 and write it down on the left hand side i. then we subtract 9 . we should subtract individually from 233 and not from 234. And like before we subtract 9 .e 766 Common Mistake: As you see from the above example we subtract 9 from each individual number. then 9 .0 = 9 and again 9 . we subtract 1 from 948224243 and get 948224242 . Then as usual we calculate 9 .3 = 6. we get the right part of our answer i. but just imagine 0's in front of the original number.left to right. 273 x 99999 ( we cannot do this as of now) Part B (Original number is less then the number of 9's.3 = 6 and again 9 . Most of the calculator cannot perform calculation more than 12 digits and I doubt even your mobile phones can do that. then 9 .0 and get 9. which becomes the left part of the answer. Part C (Original number is more then the number of 9's. Then we subtract 9 . 948224243 x 999999999 = 948224242 | 051775757 Explanation: Wow! I can beat the calculator.4 = 5. then 9 . Hence. this method is tough to undestand so pay close attention to this one) .8 and so on.2 = 7.

2 or we add + 1.e.e. increase it by 1 i. 9x9 9 – 1 [ We assume the base as 10 ] 9–1 8 /1 Steps involved:We select the base as 10. increase it by 1 i. 9 –2+1=8 Add & Subtract Method Rules: This method is based on selecting a proper base and then using the Vedic maths method to calculate. 112 x 9 = 100/8 Steps involved: From the number 112 we choose 11. Subtract that from 47 and we get 42 (47 . increase it by 1 i.e.Rules:I will directly goto the example in this case. Subtract that from 14 and we get 12. Next we subtract 4 from 10 and get 6 i. 10 – 7 = 3. Next we subtract 7 from 10 and get 3 i. . See the example of different bases and make sure you use your wits to choose a proper base while calculation. 112 x 99 = 110/88 Steps involved: From the number 112 we choose 1.e.e. 12 or we can say we add + 1 (11 + 1).e. Subtract that from 112 and we get 100 (112 . Selecting a proper base is one of the most important things in this method. 3 or we add + 1 (2 + 1). In this case the difference is -1. increase it by 1 i. So we write -1 on the right on side of this number. increase it by 1 i. as the rules will confuse you at this level. 5.12). 2 or we can say we add + 1 (1 + 1). Subtract that from 24 and we get 21 (24 -3). 10 – 4 = 6. it’s pretty easy. Next we subtract 4 from 10 and and get 6 i. 14 x 9 = 12 | 6 Explanation: From the number 14 we choose 1(the number in the ten's digit).5). 47 x 9 = 42/3 Steps involved: From the number 47 we choose 4(ten's digit).2). The method is confusing but once a person gets a hang of it. 10 – 4 = 6. It works in the following manner. Next we subtract 99 from 12 and then add 1 i. Then we check the difference for each number as compared to 10. 24 x 9 = 21/6 Explanation: From the number 24 we choose 2(ten's digit).e. which makes major calculations very simple.e. Subtract that from 112 and we get 110 (112 .e. 99 – 12 + 1 = 88. Next we subtract 9 from 2 and then add 1 i.e.

Then we check the difference for each number as compared to 10. Then we multiply the right hand side. In this case +1 x +2. And the final answer as 132.Then we multiply the right hand side. In this case we would subtract -2 from the number 9 or we subtract -1 from the number 8 and then we get the answer as 7. So we write +1 & +2 on the right on side of these numbers respectively. In this case we would add +2 from the number 11 or we add +1 from the number 12 and then we get the answer as 13. And the final answer as 81. So we get 2 as the answer. Then we do cross addition/subtraction. In this case we would subtract -1 from the number 9 and then we get the answer as 8. isn't it? 91 x 91 [ We assume the base as 100 ] 91 – 9 91 – 9 82/81 Steps involved:We select the base as 100. In this case the difference is -1 & -2. And the final answer as 72. . 11 x 12 [ We assume the base as 10 ] 11 + 1 12 + 2 13 /2 Steps involved:We select the base as 10. So we get 1 as the answer. 9 x 8 [ We assume the base as 10 ] 9–1 8–2 7 /2 Steps involved:We select the base as 10. In this case the difference is +1 & +2. It is simple. Then we check the difference for each number as compared to 10. So we write -1 & -2 on the right on side of these numbers respectively. So we get 2 as the answer. In this case -1 x -2. In this case -1 x -1. Then we do cross addition/subtraction. Then we do cross addition/subtraction. Then we multiply the right hand side.

We will move on to slightly complex task tomorrow. You may practice higher numbers like 120 x 102 or 105 x 108. Selecting a proper base is one of the most important things in this method. So we write -2 & -75 on the right on side of these numbers respectively. So we get 150 as . In this case -9 x -9. In this case we would subtract -9 from the number 91 and then we get the answer as 82. So we write -9 & -9 on the right on side of these numbers respectively. but by now you should be used to doing these simple calculation mentally. So we get 81 as the answer. Then we multiply the right hand side. Then we check the difference for each number as compared to 100. See the example of different bases and make sure you use your wits to choose a proper base while calculation. Solution is not given. we have moved on to higger numbers too. 25 x 98 [ We assume the base as 100 ] 25 – 75 98 – 2 24/50 Steps involved:We select the base as 100. But remember so far our base has only been 10 & 100.Then we check the difference for each number as compared to 100. Importance of choosing the RIGHT BASE. In this case the difference is -9 & -9. In this case the difference is -2 & -75. Then we do cross addition/subtraction. In this case -2 x -75. Then we multiply the right hand side. which makes major calculations very simple. And the final answer as 8281. Now. It works in the following manner. 888 x 998 [ We assume the base as 1000 ] 888 – 112 998 – 002 886/224 598 x 998 [ We assume the base as 1000 ] 598 – 402 998 – 002 596/804 Add & Subtract Method Rules: This method is based on selecting a proper base and then using the Vedic maths method to calculate. You may check the next few examples.

In this case +2 x -2.the answer. both the numbers were either positive or negative. And we get the answer 96 It is slightly confusing but you will get the hang of it pretty soon. Then we check the difference for each number as compared to 100. In this case the difference is +8 & -3. But since the base is 100 we can only use 2 up to 2 digit and we will carry forward 1 to the left hand side Then we do cross addition/subtraction. Then we check the difference for each number as compared to 10. So we write +8 & -3 on the right on side of these numbers respectively. In this case we would subtract -2 from the number 25 or we subtract -75 from the number 98 and then we get the answer as 23 but due to carry forward we add 1 and the answer turns out to be 24. Then we multiply the right hand side. In this case we would subtract -2 from the number 12 or we add +2 from the number 8 and then we get the answer as 10. So we get -4 as the answer. So far we have looked at numbers where after addition/subtraction from the base. Then we do cross addition/subtraction. Then we multiply the right hand side. However since the we have – 4 on the right hand side we subtract it from the base and -1 from the left hand side. In this case we would subtract -3 . In this case +8 x -3. Now lets consider the other way round. Then we do cross addition/subtraction. 108 x 97 [ We assume the base as 100 ] 108 + 8 97 – 3 105/-24 = 104/76 Steps involved:We select the base as 100. 12 x 8 [ We assume the base as 10 ] 12 + 2 8–2 10/-4 = 96 Steps involved:We select the base as 10. And the final answer as 2450. So we write +2 & -2 on the right on side of these numbers respectively. So we get -24 as the answer. In this case the difference is +2 & -2.

lets try some different base. And we get the answer as 10476 We have also been using the base such as 10. Play close attention to the difference as it will help you master this method. So we write +3 & +3 on the right on side of . Then we check the difference for each number as compared to 50. In this case -1 x -1. So we divide 48 by 2 And we get the answer 2401. So we write -1 & -1 on the right on side of these numbers respectively.e 100/2 ] 46 – 4 46 – 4 42/16 21/16 23 x 23 (BASE AS 20 i. Similar Example: 46 x 46 [ We assume the base as 50 i. In this case the difference is +3 & +3. Then we check the difference for each number as compared to 20. However since we have – 24 on the right hand side we subtract it from the base and -1 from the left hand side.e. But since the base is 50 which is nothing but 100/2. Then we multiply the right hand side. In this case we would subtract -1 from the number 49 or we subtract -1 from the number 49 (same thing in this case) and then we get the answer as 48.from the number 108 or we add +8 from the number 97 and then we get the answer as 105. So we get 1 as the answer. Now. In this case the difference is -1 & -1. Then we do cross addition/subtraction. 49 x 49 [ We assume the base as 50 ] 49 – 1 49 – 1 48/01 24/01 Steps involved:We select the base as 50. 10 x 2) 23 + 3 23 + 3 26/9 52/9 Steps involved:We select the base as 20. 100 & 1000.

But since the base is 20 which is nothing but 100/5. In this case +3 x +3. And that’s why we just write one number on the right hand side i. Then we multiply the right hand side. The whole idea is if the basic base or main base is a multiple or division of 100 then we will have 2 digits on the left hand side.e. NOTE: We write 9 as the answer and not 09 as the answer because here the base is 10 x 2. Then we do cross addition/subtraction. So we write +3 & +3 on the right on side of these numbers respectively. That means the underlying base still remains 10. In this case we would subtract +3 from the number 23 or we add +3 from the number 23 (same thing in this case) and then we get the answer as 26. But since the base is 20 which is nothing but 10 x 2. Therefore we add 20 to right hand side and get the answer as 29 . So we get 9 as the answer. rest we carry forward to the left hand side after doing the division.20 Now whenever we get answer in decimal form after division we transfer it to the right hand side by adding it. Then we multiply the right hand side. In this case we would subtract +3 from the number 23 or we add +3 from the number 23 (same thing in this case) and then we get the answer as 26.20/09 5/29 Steps involved:We select the base as 20. So we divide 26 by 5 and get the answer 5. 9 Then we do cross addition/subtraction. NOTE: We write the base as 09 as our basic base or main base is 100/5. 23 x 23 (BASE AS 20 i. In this case the difference is +3 & +3. In this case +3 x +3.e. Then we check the difference for each number as compared to 20. So we multiply the base 26 x 2. And we get the answer 529. So we get 9 as the answer. And when the basic base of main base is a multiple of 10 then we take only one digit on the left hand side. 100/5) [ Notice the above sum has the same numbers] 23 + 3 23 + 3 26/09 5.these numbers respectively.

Just remember the following diagram when you multiplying 2 digit number with a 2 digit number.e. if the base is 10 there will be 1 digit on the right hand side.And we get the final answer as 529. if the base is 1000 there will be 3 digits on the right hand side and so on. Remember to always divide the left hand side or multiply it first. GOLDEN RULES FOR ADD SUBTRACT METHOD. Conventional Calculation 54 x 84 216 4320 4536 By simply Calculation 54 x 84 40/52/16 40/53/6 45/3/6 Steps involved: . Choose the base according to your common sense so that the calculation becomes easy. However. The reason we are learning this method is because it is not possible to do all calculation using the add and subtract method. Then your answer will be 22/-6. You carry forward -2 to the left hand side. since you know by subtraction of 24 by 3 will give you 21 and you will be able to carry 30 to the left hand side and then you will be able to get your answer easily. And then you subtract. And the extra digit you carry over to the left hand side. Rules: This method simplifies our normal method of multiplication. Basic Multiplication But Mentally and Faster. This will give you the answer 21/4. If your answer is something like 24/-26 (with your base being 10). you can do it directly too. 30 – 26 = 4. And then minus right hand side (if negative) or carry forward from left hand side (if positive). if required. i. There are many other methods involved but this is simple and easy. If the base is 100 there will be 2 digits on the right hand side.

Our final answer is 945. 5 x 2 + 3 x 7 (the cross). Write down 35 as our answer Then we multiply 5 x 2 and add it with 3 x 7 i. 5 x 4 + 8 x 4 (the cross).We follow conventional method but we try to skip the extra work to reduce time and effort.e. Write down 40 as our answer. Write down 16 as our answer Then we multiply 5 x 4 and add it with 8 x 4 i.e. 67 x 4 This is 67 x 04 0/24/28 0/26/8 2/6/8 . So we get 53 in the centre. So we get 4 in centre and on the left hand side we get the answer 9. Then we multiply the left hand side number 2 x 3 (straight line). Then we carry forward 5 from 53 to the left hand side as we again will have only one digit in the centre. Then we carry forward 3 from 34 to the left hand side as we again will have only one digit in the centre. So we get 3 in centre and on the left hand side we get the answer 45 Our final answer is 4536 27 x 35 6/31/35 6/34/5 9/4/5 Steps involved: First we multiply the right hand side number 5 x 7 (straight line). So we get 34 in the centre. Write down 6 as our answer. We get 31 as our answer. Then we carry forward 1 from 16 to the left hand side as we will have only one digit. We get 52 as our answer. Then we carry forward 3 from 35 to the left hand side as we will have only one digit. First we multiply the right hand side number 4 x 4 (straight line). Then we multiply the left hand side number 5 x 8 (straight line).

4. And we get the answer 31. We get 24 as our answer. Then we multiply 4 x 5 and add it with 2 x 2 i. 5. Write down 0 as our answer. if we want to multiply a 3 digit number with a 3 digit number we keep in mind the following diagram. We get 22 as our answer. . Then we multiply the left hand side number 3 x 4 (straight line). Now. Our final answer is 268. We get 24 as our answer.Steps involved: First we multiply the right hand side number 7 x 4 (straight line).e. 3 x 2 + 4 x 4 (the second cross). Write down 28 as our answer Then we multiply 4 x 6 and add it with 0 x 7 i. Then we multiply the left hand side number 6 x 0 (straight line). So we get 26 in the centre. 3 x 5 + 4 x 2 + 4 x 2 (the star). Then we multiply 3 x 2 and add it with 4 x 4 i.e. 4 x 5 + 2 x 2 (the first cross). First we multiply the right hand side number 2 x 5 (straight line). So we get 6 in centre and on the left hand side we get the answer 2. Then we carry forward 2 from 26 to the left hand side as we again will have only one digit in the centre.e. 6. Write down 12 as our answer. Then we carry forward 1 from 10 to the left hand side as we will have only one digit. Write down 10 as our answer 2. Next we multiple 3 x 5 add it to 4 x 2 and again add that to 4 x 2 i. 342 x 425 12/22/31/24/10 12/22/31/25/0 12/22/33/5/0 12/25/3/5/0 14/5/3/5/0 Steps involved: 1.e.We keep carrying on each number to the left hand side and we leave one number in each case and hence we get the number 14/5/3/5/0 . 3. Then we carry forward 2 from 28 to the left hand side as we will have only one digit. 5 x 2 + 0 x 7 (the cross).

862 x 35 we can add a 0 to 35 and then solve as following 862 x 035 0/24/58/36/10 0/24/58/37/0 0/24/61/7/0 0/30/1/7/0 3/0/1/7/0 Steps involved: 1. Then we carry forward 1 from 10 to the left hand side as we will have only one digit. Let’s learn square using the add and subtract method.We keep carrying on each number to the left hand side and we leave one number in each case and hence we get the number 3/0/1/7/0 Our final answer is 30170. First we multiply the right hand side number 2 x 5 (straight line). Then we multiply the left hand side number 8 x 0 (straight line). This method is nothing but the above method in a more simplified manner for calculating squares. Write down 10 as our answer 2. 4.e. 3.1. Taking the base 10 7–3 7–3 (7-3)/ (-3 x -3) = 49 . 6 x 5 + 3 x 2 (the first cross). Our final answer is 145350. We get 36 as our answer.e. . 5. 7 x 7 = (7-3)/3 x 3 = 4/9 By subtract and add method. 6. Then we multiply 6 x 5 and add it with 3 x 2 i. In this method we again choose a base. We get 24 as our answer.e. Write down 0 as our answer. Then we multiply 3 x 8 and add it with 0 x 6 i. 3 x 8 + 0 x 6 (the second cross). And we get the answer 58. 8 x 5 + 0 x 2 + 6 x 3 (the star). Next we multiple 8 x 5 add it to 0 x 2 and again add that to 6 x 3 i.

Square the units digit. 97 x 97 = (100 -3)(100-3) = 10000 – 600 + 9 108 x 108 = (100 + 8) (100 + 8) = 10000 + 1600 + 64 29 x 29 = (30 – 1) (30 – 1) = 900 -60 + 1 = 841 49 x 49 = (50 -1) (50 – 1) = 2500 – 100 + 1 = 2401 78 x 78 = (80 – 2) (80 – 2) = 6400 – 320 + 4 = 6084 Let’s try a different method to find squares now: Method: 1. Therefore we multiply 40 x 5 = 200 and the carry forward 2 from left hand side to right hand side as the base is 10) Squares using the formula: (a + b) (a + b) = a2 + 2ab + b2 (a . Tens digit x units digit x 2 . Square the units digit.9 2. Therefore divide by 40 by 2) 45 x 45 = (45 – 5)/5 x 5 = 40/25 = 200/25 = 202/5 (The base is taken as 50 (10 x 5). We get 4 2. Square the units digit . 2. We get 16 3.12 3. Square of tens digit . Square of tens digit Examples 42 x 42 = 16/16/4 = 1764 (we carry forward 1 from the centre calculation to the left hand side) Method: 1.Look at the following examples 12 x 12 = (12 + 2)/2 x 2 = 14/ 4 14 x 14 = (14 + 4)/4 x 4 = 18/16 = 19/6 (remember the base is 10) 91 x 91 = (91 – 9)/9 x 9 = 82/81 95 x 95 = (95 – 5)/5 x 5 = 90/25 108 x 108 = (108 + 8)/8 x 8 =116/64 988 x 988 = (988 – 12)/12 x 12 = 976/144 (The base is 1000.b) (a . 45 x 45 = (45 – 5)/5 x 5= 40/25 = 20/25 (The base is taken as 50 (100/2). Tens digit x units digit x 2. 23 x 23 = 4/12/9 = 5/2/9 (we carry forward 1 from the centre calculation to the left hand side) Method: 1.2ab + b2 This is simple enough to understand. Therefore we do not need to carry 1 of 144 on the left hand side. Square of tens digit is 16.4 . Tens digit x units digit x 2 3.b) = a2 .

So basically . And doing the required calculation for the base 10. but depending on the base calculation will differ. First we double the excess number from the base 10 and add to the original number i. Therefore answer is = 19/29/7 = 21/9/7. Steps involved 1.24 3.excess from original number from 10 x excess from the left number which we got in step 1.10 = 3. Square of tens digit – 36 73 x 73 = 49/42/9 =53/2/9 26 x 26 = 4/24/36= 6/7/6 (We carry forward 3 to 24. 4. That makes it 27. Then we subtract 13 from base. 13. Thus we get 6 on the extreme left.4 2. Square the units digit . Consider base 10 Cube for 13 13 = (13 + 3 x 2)/(9 x 3)/3 x 3 x 3 = 19/27/27 (But since the base is 10 only one number will remain in each left hand side. We put down 7 and carry forward to the left 2. which we multiply with 9 ( the excess number of the left hand side number minus the base i.62 x 62 = 36/24/4=38/4/4 Method: 1. Cube for 15 15 = (15 + 5 x 2)/(15x5)/5 x 5 x 5 = 25/75/125 =25/87/5 =33/7/5 . We get 3 x 9 = 27.e. we get the answer 2197. Tens digit x units digit x 2 . 3. And our answer is 676) 34 x 34 = 9 / 24 / 16 = 1156 42 x 42 = 16/16/4 = 1764 63 x 63 = 36/36/9 = 3969 This topic may be tricky so give close attention to this one. Then 3 x 2(double the excess) + 13 (original number) = 19 2.Not exactly. Then we take the cube of the unit digit of the original number. get 3. We again follow the base system .e. 19 -10 ).

52 = (52 + 2 x 2)/(2 x 6)/08 = 56/12/08 = 14/06/08 104 = (100 + 3 x 4)/3 x 4 x 4/4 x 4 x 4 = 112/48/64 .e. 97 = (97 – 2 x 3)/(-3 x -9)/-3 x -3 x -3 = 91/27/-27 =91/26/73 Steps involved 1.) So basically. -3 x -9 = 27.10 = 5. Then 5 x 2 + 15 (original number) = 25 2. which we multiply with -9 ( the excess number of the left hand side number minus the base i.). get -3.e. 100 . In similar manner.Steps involved 1. Then -3 x 2 -3 (original number) = -9 2. Then we take the cube of the unit digit of the original number. So basically. Then we subtract 97 from base. 100 . First we double the excess number from the base 100 and subtract to the original number i. First we double the excess number from the base 10 and add to the original number i. 15. And doing the required calculation for the base 100. which we multiply with 15 ( the excess number of the left hand side number minus the base i. 15 x 5 = 75. 4.e. And doing the required calculation for the base 10. 25 -10. 3. get 5. we get the answer 912673. Then we take the cube of 100 – 97. Then we subtract 15 from base.91. 3.e.97 = -3. 4. we get the answer 3375.

- Problem Set 3 Solutions
- Exercise 12.16
- C4.2 P82 Quantifier
- FinalReview SequencesSeries Answers
- 62226765 Power Point Buku Bengkel Matematik Tambahan Spm (1)
- CS 110items-Exam 1
- Final Workshop 9th Grade
- Sslc Maths 5 Model Question Papers English Medium.
- Math C170 FinalExam Practice 52
- Solving cubic equations
- Methods of Mathematical Proof
- real number system
- Bazele matematice ale calculatoarelor
- Cls Jeead-14-15 Xi Mat Target-4 Set-1 Chapter-14
- AAAI_sub_318_proofs
- sguts07
- IIT JAM 2012 Paper Mathematics
- Dummit & Foote chapter 2 selected solutions
- Addition of Natural Numbers
- MTH603 - Numerical Analysis FAQs for Midterm Exam Preparation Spring 2013
- Different i Ability
- short ques maths
- Apmo2012 Sol
- Functions
- 1997 Cayle y Solution
- Meg Sh 120112
- Mcq Class Vii
- Exponent
- triangles
- Jee 2008

Are you sure?

This action might not be possible to undo. Are you sure you want to continue?

We've moved you to where you read on your other device.

Get the full title to continue

Get the full title to continue listening from where you left off, or restart the preview.

scribd