Amazing Math Trick

234X234+1234-875=??? Trick! Trick!

The 7-11-13 trick!

This trick makes you look like your brain is a mega fast calculator! Ask a friend to write down ANY three digit number such as 231 or 884. Ask them to multiply the number by x7 x 11 x 13 ...but even if your friend has used a calculator, you will have written down the answer ages ago! It's fiendish! THE SECRET: all you do is write out the starting number twice! So 231 will become 231231 and 884 will become 884884. You don't believe it? Well try it on this calculator and see for yourself! You work this calculator by clicking the mouse on the buttons. Go on, put in ANY three digit number then x7 x11 x 13 and see what you get!

It's harder to do. 747474 then divide it by three.The 3367 trick:      This trick is similar to the 7-11-13 trick.g. 249158 This one takes practice. but unlike the others. it's very hard to see how it's done! . 74 x 3367 To work out the final answer you have to imagine the original number written out three times e. but it looks far more miraculous! Get a friend to pick any 2 digit number e.g.

the answer will ALWAYS divide by 9. 7-3-1-8 Even though you haven't seen any numbers. you can say what the missing digit is! EIGHT THE SECRET This great trick relies on the power of 9. then when you add the digits up. This is the number that was crossed out! . 7x318 Your friend then reads out what digits are left . e. In the example we had 7+3+1+8 = 19 All you do now is see what you have to add on to your answer to get the next number that divides by nine! The next number to divide by 9 after 19 is 27.g.g. he then reads out the digits that are left.g.. You add them up. they will also divide by 9. 7+8+3+4+1 = 23 . So you need to add on EIGHT. e.g.g. When your friend crosses a digit out. If a number divides by nine.. 78341 . or cover your eyes in some way so that you can't see what your friend is writing. After your friend has added up the digits and subtracted them. and then subtract the answer from the first number. If you check our example 7+8+3+1+8 = 27 which does divide by nine..e. e.23 = 78318 Your friend then crosses out ONE digit from the answer.. 78341 Ask the friend to add up the digits.The MISSING DIGIT trick!              Here it is! Go and hide in a cupboard. (It can be any digit except a zero) e. Ask a friend to secretly write down ANY number (at least four digits long).

If the answer is not right. 1999. For example. Add only the last two digits of your birth year 12. Subtract 554 6. you followed the directions incorrectly or lied about your birthday. Divide by 2 7. Add 692 10.              . Add your birth date 8. Subtract 333 4. Subtract 32940 to get your birthday! The answer's format is: month/day/year. Multiply by 8 5.Birthday Trick  This math trick will determine your birthday. click on the calculator button. Add 18 to your birth month 2. Just follow the steps with a calculator and press equal after each step. Multiply by 25 3. 1. Multiply by 5 9. an answer of 123199 means that you were born on December 31. Multiply by 20 11. Go ahead and try the trick without cheating! For a simple. online JavaScript calculator.

The "24" Mystery!      A Murderous Math fan called OBAID pointed out that if you square ANY prime number bigger then 3. therefore the whole expression must be divisible by 24. 112 = 121 then 121 . the answer always divides by 24! E. WHY? If you understand algebra. Either n or (3n+1) must be even. (6n-1)2 = 36n-12n+1. So (6n-1)2 -1 = 36n-12n. This factories to 12n(3n+1). (6n+1)2 = 36n+12n+1. This factories to 12n(3n-1). So (6n+1)2 -1 = 36n+12n. (and you've read The Phantom X ) then you'll know that all prime numbers can be written as (6n+1) or (6n-1). therefore the whole expression must be divisible by 24.1 = 120 and yes 120 does divide by 24. . then subtract 1.g. Either n or (3n-1) must be even.

. Square it. but they must not tell you what it is. if you want to try the trick with the prime number 2801. here's what to push: 2801 * 2801 = + 17 = / 12 = .. .. you can still tell them: There will be a remainder of 6.. Ask your friends to pick any prime number bigger than 5. you can amaze your friends with a prime prediction.) Add 17 Divide by 12 Without knowing which prime number your friends picked.The Prime Number Trick      Using prime numbers. (In other words multiply the prime number by itself.     For example.and that's the answer! Now find a new prime number and try it.

The second two digits are your age !!!        This is the only year it will ever work.  Multiply this number by 2.  If you have already had your birthday this year . 6. .THE AMAZING MATH TRICK OF 1999           1. .  Multiply it by 50.  First of all. 5. . . . 4. You should now have a three digit number: The first digit of this was your original number (i. how many times you want to go out to eat each week).e. If you have NOT had your birthday yet this year . Last step: Subtract the four digit year that you were born. so spread the fun around while it lasts .  Add 5. pick the number of days a week that you   would like to eat out. 2. . . add 1748. 3.  add 1749.

Phone Number Trick  Here is a math trick so unbelievable that it will stump you. (you won't be able to do this one in your head) 2. Personally I would like to know who came up with this and why that person is not running the country. Grab a calculator. 8. Add 1 5. Add the last 4 digits of your phone number 7. Multiply by 80 4. Key in the first three digits of your phone number (NOT the area code) 3. 1. Add the last 4 digits of your phone number again. Subtract 250 9. Multiply by 250 6. Divide number by 2 Do you recognize the answer ?????? .

Add the number in your family and subtract your age. Write down the number on one side of a piece of paper. Add your age minus the number in family. .Joker’s Math Trick 1  complete this amazing Math Trick just follow the instruction below and complete the steps. Multiply it by 5. You'll be surprised with the results! All you'll need is a pen or pencil and some paper! Pick a number between 1 and 100.           . Pick another different number between 1 and 100. Divide the number by 10 rounding to the nearest decimal. Write down the number on the other side of the piece of paper. Multiply by 1998. Divide the number by 10 rounding to the nearest decimal.

Slap yourself around the head while repeating: "I'm a stupid person who wastes too much time on junk like this.Joker’s Math Trick 2         Take the first 2 digits of your home phone number and add them to the last 2 digits of your phone number. Now fold the second page. Find a bin/drawer and place the sheets in it.. Multiply by 365. Place them side by side."   ..sheet one in your left hand and sheet two in your right hand. Write the number on a new sheet of paper. Now pick up the two sheets . Fold the first page in half. Now using both your hands.

5 squared shortcut Trick 1             Here is a really quick way to square any number with a 5 on the end Lets take   Ok. by the original first number. adding 1 to the 4. 5. so we get 4 + 1 = 5 Then multiply this answer. giving you and    Forget about the for the moment and do this: Always add 1. 4 5 X 4 = 20 So what you have is 20 and Everyone knows = 25 right? Well it does. Put the two answers together and that's the answer! 2025 . This is what makes it easy. so what you have to do is split up the numbers.

put all the numbers together. Give it a try with another number.5 squared shortcut Trick 2             This works for any number ending in but when the numbers get over 100 it tends to get a little trickier with the multiplication. it isn't difficult. which was 8 9 X 8 =72 Now. Try . 72 and   = 25 . forget about the Add 1 to 8  8+1=9 Multiply 9 by the first number. Split the numbers apart: 8 and Again.

Squaring a 2-digit number beginning with 5                   Take a 2-digit number beginning with 5.    See the pattern? For 53 × 53. Square the second digit: this is the last part of the answer. The first part of the answer is 33   3 3 _ _ 8 × 8 = 64 (square second digit). . 25 + 8 = 33 (25 plus second digit). Square the first digit. The last part of the answer is 64    _ _ 6 4 So 58 × 58 = 3364. Add this number to the second number to find the first part of the answer. multiply 5 × 5 = 25 (square the first digit). multiply 5 × 5 = 25 (square the first digit). 25 + 3 = 28 (25 plus second digit). The last part of the answer is 09    _ _ 0 9 So 53 × 53 = 2809.    Example: If the number is 58. The first part of the answer is 28   2 8 _ _ 3 × 3 = 9 (square second digit).

3 × 4 = 12 (first digit times next number). 6 × 7 = 42 (first digit times next number): 4 2 _ _. The last part of the answer is always 25: _ _ 2 5. Multiply the first digit by the next consecutive number. The last part of the answer is always 25: _ _ 2 5.    Example: If the number is 35. The product is the first two digits: XX _ _. 1 2 _ _ The last part of the answer is always 25: _ _ 2 5. .Squaring a 2-digit number ending in 5             Choose a 2-digit number ending in 5. So 35 × 35 = 1225. So 65 × 65 = 4225.    See the pattern? For 65 × 65.

Squaring numbers made up of sixes       Choose a a number made up of sixes. The square is made up of: one fewer 4 than there are repeating 6's 3 same number of 5's as 4's 6            Example: If the number to be squared is 666 The square of the number has:  4's (one less than digits      in number)           4 4  3                             3  5's (same number as 4's)        5 5  6                                   6 So 666 × 3666333 = 443556.    See the pattern? If the number to be squared is 66666 The square of the number has:  4's (one less than digits       in number)           4 4 4 4  3                                 3  5's (same number as 4's)            5 5 5 5  6                                           6 So 66666 × 66666 = 4444355556. .

Try this: Take 15 x 13 for an example.  With this trick. without the use of a calculator. you will be able to multiply any two numbers from 11 to 19 in your head quickly. Then draw the shape of Africa mentally so it covers the 15 and the 3 from the 13 below. Those covered numbers are all you need. I will assume that you know your multiplication table reasonably well up to 10x10. That is It! Wasn't that easy? Practice it on paper first!         . First add 15 + 3 = 18 Add a zero behind it (multiply by 10) to get 180. Always place the larger number of the two on top in your mind. Multiply the covered lower 3 x the single digit above it the "5" (3x5= 15) Add 180 + 15 = 195.Multiply Up to 20X20 In Your Head   In just FIVE minutes you should learn to quickly multiply up to 20x20 in your head.

you only put the "ones" digit in the hole and carry the "tens" digit from the addition. That's it! 11 x 54=594 The only thing tricky to remember is that if the result of the addition is greater than 9. 5+7=12 .The 11 Rule        You likely all know the 10 rule (to multiply by 10. 5__7 . Notice the hole between them! Add the 5 and the 4 together (5+4=9) Put the resulting 9 in the hole 594. 11 x 57 = 627 Practice it on paper first! . Separate the two digits in you mind (5__4)... For example 11 x 57 .. just add a 0 behind the number) but do you know the 11 rule? It is as easy! You should be able to do this one in you head for any two digit number. Practice it on paper first! To multiply any two digit number by 11: For this example we will use 54... put the 2 in the hole and add the 1 from the 12 to the 5 in to get 6 for a result of 627 ....

READ it from the two fingers on the left of the folded down finger and the 7 fingers on the right of it.Finger Math: 9X Rule  To multiply by 9. This works for anything up to 9x10! . it would be the 4th finger and so on. (2) To multiply by 3.try this: (1) Spread your two hands out and place them on a desk or table in front of you.. (3) the answer is 27 . fold down the 3rd finger from the left.. To multiply by 4.

Write it. It is 0.Multiplication Tricks        Multiply by 11 The eleven times table has always been very easy to learn up to 9 x 11. 5 + 8 = 13. Write it. Example 1 . Example 2 . Then write down 3.5890 x 11 First number = 5. After that write down 7. Write down the last digit. add 1 into 5.425 x 11 First number = 4 4 + 2 = 6. Now it is 4. Add the second and third digits. Write down the first digit. Again and again do this. Here's a simple way of multiplying large numbers by 11 too. 8 + 9 = 17. Now we can't write 13. So. Then write down last digit. Let's try. 2 + 5 = 7 Last number = 5 The answer is 4675. Answer : 64790 . Again add 1 into 3. 9 + 0 = 9. Add the first and second digits.

The number you are thinking of now is 3! . oh I don't know. 5.Mind-Reading Number Trick    Think of a number. Add the result to your original number. Add. Divide by your original number. Square it. Subtract your original number. 6. 1. any positive integer (but keep it small so you can do computations in your head). 2. say 17. 4. 3. Divide by 6.

Be Good  Have Nice day with the Math trick .

Sign up to vote on this title
UsefulNot useful