20 views

Uploaded by Usman Saleh Zada

save

- task4unitplan-kerrieemigschoen
- ansys-example0240
- math- more fact families 7-2
- Mastering First Grade Skills Standard E Book PDF
- New LP Template
- Aptitude
- addition subtraction lesson
- teaching work sample
- lesson plan form lbs 400
- hmcdaniel-math for sub-project
- Simple Tricks
- Math Weekly Lesson Plan
- RPT MT THN 1-Sem1
- sorico math grade k q4 units of study 2013-2014
- CCSSI Math Standards 2
- Math
- 2nd Grade Unit 1
- Vedic Maths
- evidence of student learning
- MATH Lesson Plan Sample for Demo Teaching
- Vedic Maths1
- Vedic mathematics1
- [savefile]060606104234_Vedic_Maths
- Vedic_Maths
- property definition
- Math g2 m1 Full Module
- Majesty and Glory (TTBB)
- PNUG_May2012_4D
- 3 lesson plans
- 3034Chap4.pdf
- sodk
- Sop Tumbang Anak Ok
- Daftar Isi
- carbonaceous gold ores.docx
- rda-akg.ppt
- CHAPTER 11.docx
- Fake
- Julio Tesis Maestria 2015
- Rptlra Sap
- A LA CRIADA
- HISTORIA DE LAS REDES SOCIALES.docx
- MAKALAH Kep Jiwa
- Prediksi Barcelona vs Deportivo Alaves 19 Agustus 2018
- huffington post
- Percussion l - (Versión Facilitada)
- guiaa
- Bab 3
- a
- Khutbah Ramadhan
- Judul Referat
- usa-football-playbook.pdf
- 888
- Data Tilik Hb
- 2017420_14828_DIP+-+Artigo.+Um+Estado+para+o+Cosmopolitismo.+Frederic+Vandenberghe..pdf
- Charla de Conciencia
- caso practico Centro de Cultura Tecnológica.docx
- hojas-pentagramadas-en-blanco.pdf
- Prosem Putri
- PU GMI NOV 2 2014
- Meinert Spanish
- Lecturer Required
- Murree
- Study Plan -- Screening Test
- Cover Letter
- BOK_Paper

You are on page 1of 21

Long Division

Add and subtract Whole Numbers And Decimals

Find each sum or Different:

1. 5,208 + 6,199 = 11407 STEP: Line up the digits by place value and add.

3. 504.06 – 98.006 = 406.054 STEP 1: Line up the digits by place value or line up decimal point STEP 2: Subtract. Regroup if necessary. Place the decimal point in

the answer

**5. 62,508 + 23,725 = 86233
**

STEP : Line up the digits by place value and add.

7. 62.34 – 14.3 = 48.04

STEP 1: Line up the digits by place value or line up decimal point STEP 2: Subtract. Regroup if necessary. Place the decimal point in the answer

9. 16.3 + 8.9 + 7.12 = 32.32

STEP 1: Line up the digits by place value or line up decimal point

STEP 2: Add. Regroup if necessary. Place the decimal point in The answer

**11. £50.00 - £29.73 = £20.27
**

STEP 1: Line up the digits by place value or line up decimal point STEP 2: Subtract. Regroup if necessary. Place the decimal point in The answer

**13. 18.429 +23.7 = 42.429
**

STEP: Line up the digits by place value and add.

15. 52.46 – 36.45 = 16.01

STEP 1: Line up the digits by place value or line up decimal point STEP 2: Subtract. Regroup if necessary. Place the decimal point in The answer

17. 15.8 + 20.9 + 75.3 = 112

STEP 1: Line up the digits by place value or line up decimal point STEP 2: Add. Regroup if necessary. Place the decimal point in The answer

19. 85.62 – 43.09 = 42.53

STEP 1: Line up the digits by place value or line up decimal point STEP 2: Subtract. Regroup if necessary. Place the decimal point in The answer

**21. 603.4 + 23.84 = 627.24
**

STEP 1: Line up the digits by place value or line up decimal point STEP 2: Add. Regroup if necessary. Place the decimal point in The answer

**23. 408 – 290 = 118
**

STEP: Line up the digits by place value and subtract.

Algebra. Patterns Find the next two likely numbers in each sequence

25. 15.3, 14.4, 13.5, 12.6, 11.7 27. 1.3, 1.8. 2.3, 2.8, 3.3, 3.8

Test Prep

29. What is the sum of 8,900 + 9,003? Ans: 8900 + 9003 = 17903 30. Adam made a deposit of $280. His balance is now $630.42. What was his balance before the deposit? A 16,905 B 17,000 C 17,905 D 18,905

**Estimate Product and Quotients
**

1. 56 x 29 Round both factors to the nearest 10. 56 X29 50 x30 1500 3. 861 x 72 Round both factors to the nearest 10. 861 x72 860 x70 60200 5.49 x 71 Round both factors to the nearest 10.

49 x71

50 x70 3500

7 .85.264 ÷ 91 85.264 ÷ 91 90 ÷90

Solution: A reasonable estimate of 85.264 ÷ 91 is 1. 9. 521 x 926 Round both factors to the nearest 10. 521 x926 520 x920 478,400

11. 91,263 ÷ 450 91,263 ÷ 450 91,000 ÷ 500

Solution: A reasonable estimate of 91,263 ÷ 450 is 182.

13. 203 x 114 Round both factors to the nearest 10. 203 x114 200 x110 22,000

15.4,926 ÷ 75 4,926 ÷ 75 4,900 ÷ 70

Solution: A reasonable estimate of 4,926 ÷ 75 is 70

17. 924 x 156 Round both factors to the nearest 10. 924 x156 920 x150 138,000

19. 332 ÷ 18 332 ÷ 18 350 ÷ 10

Solution: A reasonable estimate for 332 ÷ 18 is 35.

21. 188 x 38 188 x38 190 x40 7,600

23. 5,863 ÷ 42 5,863 ÷ 42 5,850 ÷ 50

Solution: A reasonable estimate for 5,863 ÷ 42 is 117.

Test prep 25. Which of the following not be a reasonable estimate of 53 x 89? A 4,000 B 4,500 Ans: D 40,000 C 5,400 D 40,000

27. Lashayne needs 526 rools for a dinner she is hosting. Rolls come 24 to a package. Lashayne thought she needs 40 packages. Is this reasonable? Explain. No, this isn’t reasonable because Lashayne needs only 536 rolls and there are 24 rolls in a package. If we multiply 40 x 24 it becomes 960 which are in excess to her need. Therefore, lashayne only needs 22 packages so that it fulfills her need of 526 rolls.

**Multiply Whole Numbers
**

1. 15 x62 First we estimate the product. 15 x 62 10 x 60 = 1200

Since both factors are rounded up, the estimated product is an overestimate. Step 1: multiply by the ones digit. Regroup if necessary. 15 x 2 = 30 Step 2: multiply by the tens Digit. Regroup if necessary. 15 x 62 = 930 Step 3: Add the partial products. 15 x 62 = 30 + 960 = 990 Since 900 is close to 12,00 and less than 12,00, the answer is reasonable.

4. 38 X 46 First we estimate the product. 38 x 46 40 x 50 = 2,000

Since both factors are rounded up, the estimated product is an overestimate. Step 1: multiply by the ones digit. Regroup if necessary. 38 x 6 = 228

Step 2: multiply by the tens Digit. Regroup if necessary. 38 x 46 = 17, 48 Step 3: Add the partial products. 38 x 46 = 17,48 + 228 = 19,76 Since 19,76 is close to 2,000 and less 2,000, the answer is reasonable.

7. 592 x 65 First we estimate the product. 592 x 65 600 x 70 = 42,000

Step 1: multiply by the ones digit. Regroup if necessary. 592 x 5 = 2960 Step 2: multiply by the tens Digit. Regroup if necessary. 592 x 65 = 38,480 Step 3: Add the partial products. 592 x 65 = 38,480 + 2960 = 41,440 Since 41,440 are close to 42,000 and less than 42,000, the answer is reasonable.

10. 193 x 397 First we estimate the product. 193 x 397 200 x 400 = 80,000

Step 1: multiply by the ones digit. Regroup if necessary. 193 x 7 = 1351 Step 2: multiply by the tens digit. Regroup if necessary. 193 x 397 = 76,621

Step 3: Add the partial products. 193 x 397 = 76,621 + 1351 = 77,972 Since 77,972 is close and less than 80,000 so the answer is reasonable.

12. 31 x40 First we estimate the product. 31 x 40 40 x 40 = 1600

Step 1: multiply by the ones digit. Regroup if necessary. 31 x 0 = 0 Step 2: multiply by the tens digit. Regroup if necessary. 31 x 40 = 1240 Step 3: Add the partial products. 31 x 40 = 1240 + 0 = 1240 Since 1240 is less close and less than 1600 hence the answer is reasonable. 16. 700 x35 First we estimate the product. 700 x 35 700 x 40 = 28,000

Step 1: multiply by the ones digit. Regroup if necessary. 700 x 5 = 3500 Step 2: multiply by the tens digit. Regroup if necessary. 700 x 35 = 24,500 Step 3: Add the partial products. 700 x 35 = 24,500 + 3500 = 28,000 Since the 28,000 is equal to our estimated product, therefore the answer is reasonable.

18. 960 x100 First we estimate the product. 960 x 100 1000 x 100 = 100,000

Step 1: multiply by the ones digit. Regroup if necessary. 960 x 0 = 0 Step 2: multiply by the tens digit. Regroup if necessary. 960 x 100 = 96,000 Step 3: Add the partial products. 960 x 100 = 96,000 + 0 = 96,000 Since 96,000 is less than 100,000 and close to it, hence our answer is reasonable. Test prep 22. Which of the following is the product of 524 x 130? A 6, 812 B 16,144 Ans: D 68,120 23. The old theatre has 38 rows of 115 seats each. The new theatre will have 36 rows of 16 seats. Will the old or the new theatre have more seats? How many more? Explain how you got your answer. If we multiply 38 with 15 the product is 570, and if we multiply 36 with 16 the product is 576. It means that the new theatre have 6 more seats than the older one. C 68, 020 D 68,120

**Divide by one Digit Divisions
**

1. 8 √

STEP1: 50 8√

STEP2: 5

8√ 40

5 STEP3: 56

8√ 40

52 48 4 Check: 56 x 8 + 4 = 452

4.

6√

STEP1:

50 6√

STEP2: 4

6√

24 8

STEP3: 41

6√

24 8 6 2 Check: 41 x 6 + 2 = 248

7. 5 √

STEP1:

110 5√ STEP2: 11 5√ 55

1 STEP3:

112 5√ 55

13 10 3 CHECK: 112 x 5 + 3 = 563

10. 3 √ STEP1:

300 3√

STEP2:

304 3√

**90 12 12 Check: 304 x 3 = 912 13. 5 √ STEP1:
**

5 5√

STEP2:

5 5√ 25

**.704 Check: 5 x 5 + .704 = 25.704 16. 4 √ STEP1:
**

14075 4√

STEP 2: 14

4√ 56 37 STEP 3:

149

4√ 56 37 36

1 STEP4: 1494

4√ 56 37 36

**17 16 1 STEP 5: 14944
**

4√ 56 37 36

17 16 19 16 3 19. 7 √ STEP 1:

4 7√ 28 35 STEP 2: 459 7√ 28 35 35

64 63 STEP3:

4592 7√ 28 35 35

64 63

18 14 4 Test Prep 22. What is the remainder of 6 √ A0 B1 Ans: A 0 23. On Monday, Zoe began reading a book from page 1.On Friday, she had read up to page 180. If she read the same Number of pages each day, how many Pages did she read on Wednesday? Ans: She read 36 pages on Wednesday. C3 D6

**Divide by Two Divisor
**

1. 149 2 6√ 12 2

24 6√ 12 29 24 5

Check: 24 x 6 + 5 = 149

2. 567 6 83 √ 498 69 Check: 83 x 6 + 69 = 567

3. 2512 4 53 √ 212 392

47 53 √ 212 392 371 21 Check: 53 x 47 + 21 = 2512

38 4. 12√ 36 99 96 3 Check: 12 x 38 + 3 = 459

7. 49√

5 49√ 245 31

56 49√ 245 318 294 24 Check: 49 x 56 + 24 = 2768

10. 61√

9 61√ 549 48

97 61√ 549 487 427 60

979 61√ 549 487 427 607 549 58 Check: 979 x 61 + 58 = 59777 13. 30√ 3 30√ 90 6

32 30√ 90 60 60 0

14. 40√

4 40√ 160 0

15. 25√ 3 25√ 75 50

32 25√ 75 50 50 0

Algebra . Function Find each missing value y. 16. Rule: y = x + 45 x y 17. Rule: y = 1,890 + x x y 2 1,888 5 1,885 6 1,884 855 810 2,790 2,745 8,640 8,595

Test Prep 18. Which is the correct answer to 25,897 + 46? A 541 R11 B 562 ANS: D 563 19. A school bought 2,619 new books. If each of 25 classsrooms is to receive about the same number of books, about how many books will each classroom receives? ANS: Each classroom will receive about 105 books. C 562 R45 D 563

Facts about the Eiffel Tower 1. How many times was the Eiffel tower repainted between 1889 to 1989? ANS: Eiffel Tower was repainted 14 times between 1889 to 1989.

2. Paul walks to the top of the Eiffel Tower. He takes two stairs at a time. How many steps does Paul take to get to the top? ANS: Paul take 832 steps to get to the top. 3. Jerome wanted to find the height of each step, so he divided 1665 by 324. Why was jerome’s answer incorrect?

ANS:

4. A group of students visiting Pariswill ride minivans to the Eiffel Tower. There are 100 students in the group. The group can select minivans that seat 6 or 9 students. Which size van would you recommend? Why?

ANS: I would recommend a van which can carry 9 students at a time, for it will minimize the time and as well as expenditure.

- task4unitplan-kerrieemigschoenUploaded byapi-250597149
- ansys-example0240Uploaded byAndersonL88
- math- more fact families 7-2Uploaded byapi-313976131
- Mastering First Grade Skills Standard E Book PDFUploaded bykhamismuhammad
- New LP TemplateUploaded byTasia Starling Scruggs
- AptitudeUploaded byvsasaank
- addition subtraction lessonUploaded byapi-309263913
- teaching work sampleUploaded byapi-308842171
- lesson plan form lbs 400Uploaded byapi-273341828
- hmcdaniel-math for sub-projectUploaded byapi-288278295
- Simple TricksUploaded byRaghu Raj
- Math Weekly Lesson PlanUploaded byesmeralda0385
- RPT MT THN 1-Sem1Uploaded bysharida157
- sorico math grade k q4 units of study 2013-2014Uploaded byapi-233707670
- CCSSI Math Standards 2Uploaded byestabloid1169
- MathUploaded byTabrez Ahmed
- 2nd Grade Unit 1Uploaded byCassandra Martin
- Vedic MathsUploaded byapi-3748867
- evidence of student learningUploaded byapi-316958999
- MATH Lesson Plan Sample for Demo TeachingUploaded byGilane Rodriguez
- Vedic Maths1Uploaded bykvdheerajkumar
- Vedic mathematics1Uploaded byLeo Godwric
- [savefile]060606104234_Vedic_MathsUploaded byDeepak Srivastava
- Vedic_MathsUploaded byPurvesh Panchal
- property definitionUploaded byapi-314809600
- Math g2 m1 Full ModuleUploaded byRivka Share
- Majesty and Glory (TTBB)Uploaded byShawn Sherwood
- PNUG_May2012_4DUploaded byDavid Mettler
- 3 lesson plansUploaded byapi-317770553
- 3034Chap4.pdfUploaded byPi